California Central District Court
Judge:Michael W Fitzgerald
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 8:23-cv-02209
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:2674 Federal Tort Claims Act
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2023
Last checked: Saturday May 25, 2024 2:09 AM PDT
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Jennifer R. Jacobs
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Defendant
Does
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Robert A Parris
Represented By
Robert A Parris
Robert A. Parris, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Edmund Rhee
Represented By
Stephen Allen Jamieson
Solomon Saltsman And Jamieson
contact info
Ryan Michael Kroll
Solomon Saltsman And Jamieson
contact info
Jessop Stroman
Solomon Saltsman And Jamieson
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jeffrey Heater
Terminated: 01/31/2024
Defendant
United States Postal Service
Terminated: 02/05/2024


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
52 52 misc Errata Wed 05/07 12:02 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Edmund Rhee. correcting MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,51 DECLARATION OF STEPHEN A. JAMIESON (Kroll, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
51 51 12 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Mon 05/05 11:47 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE No. 1 to Exclude EXPERT TESTIMONY FROM TONY L. STRICKLAND, M.S., PhD., FNAN, OUTSIDE THE SCOPE OF HIS EXPERTS REPORT 43 filed by Plaintiff Edmund Rhee.(Botan, Xelef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Jamieson Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Jamieson Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Jamieson Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Jamieson Declaration
50 50 notice Notice of Lodging Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Mon 05/05 10:31 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiff Edmund Rhee. (Botan, Xelef)
Related: [-]
49 49 misc Statement Mon 05/05 5:06 PM
STATEMENT Plaintiff Edmund Rhee's Proposed Statement of Case filed by Plaintiff Edmund Rhee (Kroll, Ryan)
Related: [-]
48 48 misc Statement Mon 05/05 3:38 PM
STATEMENT of the Case filed by Defendant United States of America re: Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,37 . (Alarcon, Pauline)
Related: [-]