California Eastern District Court
Judge:Deborah Barnes
Case #: 2:23-cv-02745
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2023
Terminated:Jun 12, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 25, 2024 2:17 AM PDT
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By
Elliot C. Wong, GOVT
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Danielle E. Lehman
Represented By
Elliot C. Wong, GOVT
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By
Elliot C. Wong, GOVT
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Subeg Singh Khaira
Represented By
Christina Sullivan Castro
Hacking Immigration Law LLC
contact info
Christina Sullivan
Hacking Immigration Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
9 9 order Minute Order Wed 06/12 9:04 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Law Clerk for Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 06/12/2024: Pursuant to plaintiff's re8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal this action has been dismissed and shall be closed. (Text Only Entry)(Van Dine, B)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 06/12 4:15 PM
Pursuant to Plaintiff's8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and {9} Minute Order this action is DISMISSED. CASE CLOSED. (Woodson, A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 06/11 10:25 AM
NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Subeg Singh Khaira. (Castro, Christina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
7 7 order Minute Order Tue 01/16 1:02 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Law Clerk for Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 01/16/2024: The parties' re6 Stipulation is granted. This matter is held in abeyance through July 24, 2024. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on July 31, 2024. (Text Only Entry)(Van Dine, B)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
6 6 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 01/12 11:48 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Temporary Abeyance by Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Danielle E. Lehman, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Wong, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
5 5 misc Designation of Counsel Thu 12/14 10:40 AM
DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Elliot C. Wong, GOVT for Ur Mendoza Jaddou,Elliot C. Wong, GOVT for Danielle E. Lehman,Elliot C. Wong, GOVT for United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Wong, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 12/12 5:58 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Subeg Singh Khaira. Ur Mendoza Jaddou served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Danielle E. Lehman served on 12/4/2023, answer due 2/2/2024; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024.(Castro, Christina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit USPS RECEIPTS
Monday, November 27, 2023
3 3 misc Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider Mon 11/27 1:39 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Related [+]
Related: [-] ader, L
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
2 2 service Summons Mon 11/27 1:38 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Danielle E. Lehman, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Christina Sullivan* *Hacking Immigration Law, LLC* *10121 Manchester Road, Suite A* *St. Louis, Missouri 63122*. Related [+]
Related: [-] ader, L
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/27 9:12 AM
COMPLAINT against Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Danielle E. Lehman, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services by Subeg Singh Khaira. Attorney Sullivan, Christina added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-11202178)(Sullivan, Christina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet