Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Wendy W Berger
Referred: Laura Lothman Lambert
Case #: 3:23-cv-01392
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2023
Terminated:Mar 14, 2025
Case in other court:Third Judicial Circuit, 2023-CA-000153
Last checked: Sunday May 26, 2024 5:00 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Lauline Babineaux
Represented By
James Conor Durstein
O'Hara Law Firm, PA
contact info
Khalil Easa Farah
Farah & Farah, PA
contact info
Counter Defendant
Dairious Jones
Represented By
Christopher M. Speziok
Meldon Law, P.A.
contact info
Maria Youngblood
Meldon Law
contact info
Christopher St. Aubyn Shand
Shook Hardy & Bacon, LLP
contact info
Carey W. Meldon
Meldon Law
contact info
Aimee Tecla Canty
Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP
contact info
Defendant
Lauline Babineaux
Represented By
James Conor Durstein
O'Hara Law Firm, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Dairious Jones
Represented By
Christopher M. Speziok
Meldon Law, P.A.
contact info
Maria Youngblood
Meldon Law
contact info
Carey W. Meldon
Meldon Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, March 17, 2025
61 61 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 03/17 8:50 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
60 60 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 03/14 2:51 PM
ORDER dismissing case re 58 Joint Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the Clerk is directed to terminate all pending motions and close this case. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/14/2025. (CKS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
59 59 misc Stipulation Thu 03/13 1:34 PM
STIPULATION by Justin Babineaux. (Guter, Brian)
Related: [-]
58 58 misc Stipulation Thu 03/13 1:33 PM
STIPULATION by Lauline Babineaux. (Guter, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
57 57 1 pgs order Order Wed 03/12 10:25 AM
ORDER re 56 Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Counterclaim. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the Counterclaim (Doc. 8 ) is DISMISSED. The Clerk is directed to amend the case style accordingly. The Clerk is directed to amend the case style accordingly. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/11/2025. (CKS)
Related: [-]