Georgia Southern District Court
Judge:R Stan Baker
Referred: Christopher L Ray
Case #: 4:23-cv-00337
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2023
Terminated:Oct 07, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 25, 2024 5:22 AM EDT
Defendant
Effingham County School District
Represented By
Brian C. Smith
Pereira, Kirby, Kinsinger, & Nguyen
contact info
Aparesh Paul
Pereira, Kirby, Kinsinger, & Nguyen
contact info
Defendant
Yancy Ford
Represented By
Brian C. Smith
Pereira, Kirby, Kinsinger, & Nguyen
contact info
Aparesh Paul
Pereira, Kirby, Kinsinger, & Nguyen
contact info
Plaintiff
Margaret Nicole Edwards
Represented By
L. Nicole Hamilton
Law Office Of L. Nicole Hamilton
contact info
Plaintiff
Demetra Garvin
Represented By
L. Nicole Hamilton
Law Office Of L. Nicole Hamilton
contact info
Plaintiff
Takeyra McClain
Represented By
L. Nicole Hamilton
Law Office Of L. Nicole Hamilton
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, October 07, 2024
22 22 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 10/07 9:54 AM
ORDER lifting the stay currently in place; GRANTING Plaintiffs'15 construed Motion to Dismiss and DISMISSING this case WITHOUT PREJUDICE, subject to the condition that, if all or any of the Plaintiffs refile this lawsuit, costs and fees expended by Defendants in briefing the propriety of dismissal without prejudice should be assessed against the refiling Plaintiff(s). The Court DENIES as MOOT Defendants'13 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. The Clerk of Court is directed to TERMINATE16 ,17 construed Motions to Dismiss as duplicative and thus moot, and to CLOSE this case. Signed by Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker on 10/7/2024. (gmh)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave of Absence Fri 09/13 9:30 AM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Leave of Absence for the dates of: October 10, 2024, through and including October 15, 2024, and from October 17, 2024, through and including October 22, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 9/12/2024. (kjm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
20 20 motion Leave of Absence Thu 09/12 1:36 PM
MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Effingham County School District, Yancy Ford for dates of : October 10, 2024, through and including October 15, 2024, and from October 17, 2024, through and including October 22, 2024 by Effingham County School District, Yancy Ford. Responses due by 9/26/2024.(Smith, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
utility Motions Referred Thu 09/12 1:57 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:20 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Effingham County School District, Yancy Ford for dates of : October 10, 2024, through and including October 15, 2024, and from October 17, 2024, through and including October 22, 2024 (thb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
19 19 respoth Response Mon 05/13 10:41 AM
RESPONSE to17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Takeyra McClain filed by Takeyra McClain,16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Margaret Nicole Edwards filed by Margaret Nicole Edwards,15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Demetra Garvin filed by Demetra Garvin filed by Effingham County School District, Yancy Ford. (Paul, Aparesh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
18 18 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 05/07 9:21 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion to Stay proceedings. Defendants have until May 16, 2024 to respond to Plaintiffs' request for a Court Order granting dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 5/7/24. (wwp)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 05/07 9:23 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Demetra Garvin,17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Takeyra McClain,16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Margaret Nicole Edwards. Responses due by 5/16/2024. (wwp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
17 17 motion Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 05/02 11:52 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Takeyra McClain (Hamilton, L.)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 05/02 11:52 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Margaret Nicole Edwards (Hamilton, L.)
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs motion Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 05/02 11:51 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Demetra Garvin (Hamilton, L.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
14 14 motion Stay Fri 04/19 11:00 AM
MOTION to Stay Proceedings During Pendency of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Dkt. No. 13) by Effingham County School District, Yancy Ford. Responses due by 5/3/2024.(Paul, Aparesh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order granting motion to stay
utility Motions Referred Fri 04/19 11:29 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:14 MOTION to Stay Proceedings During Pendency of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Dkt. No. 13) (thb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
13 13 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Thu 04/18 12:25 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Effingham County School District, Yancy Ford. Responses due by 5/2/2024.(Paul, Aparesh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EEOC Charge (Garvin),
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of Yancy Ford
Friday, February 16, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave of Absence Fri 02/16 3:06 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Leave of Absence for attorney Brian C. Smith for the dates of April 4-9, 2024; May 23-24, 2024; and June 18- July 3, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 2/16/24. (wwp)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Fri 02/16 8:56 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge:11 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Effingham County School District, Yancy Ford for dates of : April 4-9, 2024; May 23-24, 2024; and June 18- July 3, 2024. (kjm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
11 11 motion Leave of Absence Thu 02/15 4:28 PM
MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Effingham County School District, Yancy Ford for dates of : April 4-9, 2024; May 23-24, 2024; and June 18- July 3, 2024. by Effingham County School District, Yancy Ford. Responses due by 2/29/2024.(Smith, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, February 05, 2024
notice Notice to Counsel (RSB Standing Order-Batch) Mon 02/05 9:56 AM
Notice of Standing Order regarding cases pending before District Judge R. Stan Baker. This Order is effective as of February 1, 2024.[LINK:Click Here to View] . (pmh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/01 1:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Aparesh Paul on behalf of All Defendants (Paul, Aparesh)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
8 8 14 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/29 3:21 PM
Defendants ANSWER to Complaint by Effingham County School District, Yancy Ford.(Smith, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 12/08 1:05 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Demetra Garvin. Yancy Ford waiver sent on 11/30/2023, answer due 01/29/2024. (Hamilton, L.) Modified on 12/8/2023 (thb)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 12/08 1:03 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Demetra Garvin. Effingham County School District waiver sent on 11/30/2023, answer due 01/29/2024. (Hamilton, L.) Modified on 12/8/2023 (thb)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 12/08 2:17 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Effingham County School District answer due 1/29/2024; Yancy Ford answer due 1/29/2024. (thb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
5 5 Notice to All Counsel of Record: Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form.[LINK:CLICK HERE TO READ] . (jlh)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Rule 26(f) Order Mon 11/27 4:37 PM
RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 11/27/2023. (jlh)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 11/27 4:28 PM
Summons Issued as to Effingham County School District and Yancy Ford. (jlh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons - Yancy Ford.
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/27 4:25 PM
COMPLAINT against all Defendants, filed by Demetra Garvin, Margaret Nicole Edwards, and Takeyra McClain. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Mon 11/27 4:26 PM
Filing fee: $402.00, receipt number AGASDC-3710842. (jlh)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel (CLR Forms) Mon 11/27 4:38 PM
Notice to All Counsel of Record: Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form.[LINK:CLICK HERE TO READ] . (jlh)
Related: [-]