Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:Nancy Joseph
Case #: 2:23-cv-01596
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause29:2601 Family & Medical Leave Act 1993
Case Filed:Nov 28, 2023
Last checked: Sunday May 26, 2024 4:21 AM CDT
Defendant
Astronautics Corporation of America
Represented By
Barry L Chaet
Beck Chaet Bamberger & Polsky Sc
contact info
Joseph M Peltz
Beck Chaet Bamberger & Polsky Sc
contact info
Plaintiff
Douglas G Turner
Represented By
Brianna M Covington
Alan C Olson & Associates Sc
contact info
Alan C Olson
Alan C Olson & Associates Sc
contact info


Docket last updated: 29 minutes ago
Monday, November 04, 2024
33 33 respm Reply (Non-Motion) Mon 11/04 1:33 PM
REPLY filed by Astronautics Corporation of America re29 Response (Non-Motion) to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Proposed Findings of Fact . (Chaet, Barry)
Related: [-]
32 32 respm Response (Non-Motion) Mon 11/04 1:27 PM
RESPONSE filed by Astronautics Corporation of America re28 Proposed Findings of Fact (Chaet, Barry)
Related: [-]
31 31 respm Reply Brief in Support of Motion Mon 11/04 1:24 PM
REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Astronautics Corporation of America re20 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Chaet, Barry)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
30 30 trial Exhibit Mon 10/21 12:59 PM
EXHIBIT Deposition Transcript of Douglas Turner by Douglas G Turner. (Bullington, Tristan)
Related: [-]
29 29 respm Response (Non-Motion) Mon 10/21 12:57 PM
RESPONSE filed by Douglas G Turner re25 Proposed Findings of Fact (Bullington, Tristan)
Related: [-]
28 28 trial Proposed Findings of Fact Mon 10/21 12:54 PM
Proposed Findings of Fact by Douglas G Turner. (Bullington, Tristan)
Related: [-]
27 27 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Mon 10/21 12:52 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by Douglas G Turner re20 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Bullington, Tristan)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/21 9:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tristan N Bullington on behalf of Douglas G Turner. Attorney(s) appearing: Tristan N. Bullington (Bullington, Tristan)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
25 25 trial Proposed Findings of Fact Fri 09/20 9:35 AM
Proposed Findings of Fact by Astronautics Corporation of America (Chaet, Barry)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Declaration Fri 09/20 9:34 AM
DECLARATION of Barry L. Chaet(Chaet, Barry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from Turner Depo Transcript,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Turner Depo Exhibits
23 23 misc Declaration Fri 09/20 9:14 AM
DECLARATION of Robert Atac(Chaet, Barry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - 8-23-23 Email,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - 9-20-23 Email
22 22 misc Declaration Fri 09/20 9:11 AM
DECLARATION of Brian Rainey(Chaet, Barry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Rainey 9-20-23 Email
21 21 respm Brief in Support of Motion Fri 09/20 9:08 AM
BRIEF in Support filed by Astronautics Corporation of America re20 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Chaet, Barry)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Summary Judgment Fri 09/20 9:07 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Astronautics Corporation of America. (Chaet, Barry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Withdrawal by Attorney Thu 06/20 12:50 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal by Brianna M Covington on behalf of Douglas G Turner.Attorney Brianna M. Covington to be termed. (Covington, Brianna)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Attorney - Notice Parties Fri 06/21 8:25 AM
Attorney Brianna M Covington terminated. (edr)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
18 18 order Protective Order Fri 05/17 3:03 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. (cc: all counsel)(edr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
17 17 misc Stipulation Thu 05/16 4:40 PM
STIPULATION for Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order by Astronautics Corporation of America.(Chaet, Barry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, February 23, 2024
16 16 order Scheduling Order Fri 02/23 2:28 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 2/23/2024. Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 3/7/2024, Amended Pleadings due by 3/14/2024, Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 5/31/2024, Defendants Expert Witness List due by 6/28/2024, Discovery due by 8/23/2024, Motions due by 9/20/2024. (cc: all counsel)(edr)
Related: [-]
15 15 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 02/23 11:20 AM
Minute Entry for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 2/23/2024, before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 3/7/2024, Amended Pleadings due by 3/14/2024, Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 5/31/2024, Defendants Expert Witness List due by 6/28/2024, Discovery due by 8/23/2024, Motions due by 9/20/2024. (Court Reporter Zoom Audio) (edr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
14 14 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Plan Tue 01/23 10:39 AM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Douglas G Turner. (Covington, Brianna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 01/09 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/23/2024 at 10:00 AM by Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. Rule 26 Discovery Plan due by 2/19/2024. (cc: all counsel)(edr)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing Via Zoom Tue 01/09 3:42 PM
ZOOM INFORMATION for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/23/2024 at 10:00 am before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. [LINK:Click here to Join ZoomGov Meeting] Meeting ID: 161 805 0551 and Password: 953386 Dial in:[LINK:+1-669-254-5252] or[LINK:+1-646-828-7666] (cc: all counsel) (edr)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/05 9:33 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Astronautics Corporation of America.(Chaet, Barry)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/11 3:09 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas G Turner. Astronautics Corporation of America served on 12/4/2023. (Covington, Brianna)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case to Magistrate Judge on Consent Mon 12/11 9:54 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/11/2023. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
9 9 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Fri 12/08 9:40 AM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Astronautics Corporation of America. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Chaet, Barry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
8 8 order Order Approving Stipulation Wed 12/06 2:53 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/6/2023 APPROVING 7 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading filed by Astronautics Corporation of America. The court FINDS that the parties have shown good cause and APPROVES their stipulation for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the defendant to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on January 12, 2024. Note: there is no document linked to this text only order. (cc: all counsel) (kgw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
7 7 misc Stipulation Tue 12/05 3:48 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by Astronautics Corporation of America.(Chaet, Barry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
notice Notice by Clerk to Counsel Re Consent to Magistrate Tue 12/05 4:02 PM
NOTICE from the clerk to defendant requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available[LINK:here] . (amb)
Related: [-]
service Warrant for Arrest in Rem Issued Tue 12/05 4:05 PM
DISREGARD. DOCKETED IN WRONG CASE. Warrant for Arrest in Rem Issued. (amb) Modified on 12/5/2023 (amb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/04 4:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M Peltz on behalf of Astronautics Corporation of America. Attorney(s) appearing: Joseph M. Peltz (Peltz, Joseph)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement Mon 12/04 4:23 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Astronautics Corporation of America. (Chaet, Barry)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/04 4:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Barry L Chaet on behalf of Astronautics Corporation of America. Attorney(s) appearing: Barry L. Chaet (Chaet, Barry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
service Summons Issued Wed 11/29 8:37 AM
Summons Issued as to Astronautics Corporation of America. (amb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
3 3 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Tue 11/28 2:18 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Douglas G Turner. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Covington, Brianna)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement Tue 11/28 2:15 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Douglas G Turner. (Covington, Brianna)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/28 11:18 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Astronautics Corporation of America by Douglas G Turner. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number BWIEDC-4549950)(Covington, Brianna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Tue 11/28 11:37 AM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available[LINK:here.] Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
Related: [-]