New Jersey District Court
Judge:Renee Marie Bumb
Referred: Sharon A King
Case #: 1:23-cv-22673
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Nov 28, 2023
Last checked: Sunday May 26, 2024 5:21 AM EDT
Defendant
CVS PHARMACY INC.
Defendant
SOLCO HEALTHCARE U S LLC
Defendant
JOHN DOES
In Re
VALSARTAN LOSARTAN AND IRBESARTAN PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Plaintiff
RITA CHRISTIANSON
Represented By
JUSTIN R. PARAFINCZUK
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 25, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 04/25 4:32 PM
Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb added. Judge Robert B. Kugler no longer assigned to case. (gxh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 11/30 2:54 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to CVS PHARMACY INC., SOLCO HEALTHCARE U S LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Thu 11/30 2:51 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action MUST be entered as 'Diversity-Product Liability' for all 2875 MDL cases; Fictitious parties to should be entered last to prevent them from appearing as named parties . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ssp, )
Related: [-]
order Case Management Order Thu 11/30 3:00 PM
For all Case Management Orders[LINK:click here] . Signed by Judge No Judge Assigned on 11/30/2023. (ssp, )
Related: [-]
mdl MDL Direct File Thu 11/30 3:12 PM
Member Case Direct File on 11/28/2023, for MDL 2875 VALSARTAN LOSARTAN AND IRBESARTAN PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. (ssp, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 11/28 1:57 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14898878) with JURY DEMAND, filed by RITA CHRISTIANSON.(PARAFINCZUK, JUSTIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 11/29 9:37 AM
Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (dmw, )
Related: [-]