Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Robert J Jonker
Referred: Phillip J Green
Case #: 1:23-cv-01246
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Nov 28, 2023
Last checked: Sunday May 26, 2024 4:54 AM EDT
defendant
Martinrea International US Inc.
Represented By
Jon Robert Steiger
Howard & Howard Attorneys Pc (bloomfield Hills)
contact info
Emily E. Bennett
Howard & Howard Attorneys Pllc (il)
contact info
defendant
Martinrea Jonesville LLC
Represented By
Jon Robert Steiger
Howard & Howard Attorneys Pc (bloomfield Hills)
contact info
Emily E. Bennett
Howard & Howard Attorneys Pllc (il)
contact info
plaintiff
Derrick McClendon
Represented By
Anthony J. Lazzaro
Lazzaro Law Firm
contact info
Lori Griffin
Lazzaro Law Firm
contact info
plaintiff
T. Darryl Arnold
Represented By
Anthony J. Lazzaro
Lazzaro Law Firm
contact info
plaintiff
Amanda Rae Brown
Represented By
Anthony J. Lazzaro
Lazzaro Law Firm
contact info
plaintiff
Cathy Ferrell
Represented By
Anthony J. Lazzaro
Lazzaro Law Firm
contact info
plaintiff
Antwan Grant, Sr.
Represented By
Anthony J. Lazzaro
Lazzaro Law Firm
contact info
plaintiff
Chris Zweydoff
Represented By
Anthony J. Lazzaro
Lazzaro Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/26/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
28 28 motion Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 12/03 10:38 AM
STIPULATION of dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(A)(1)(A)(II) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by plaintiffs T. Darryl Arnold, Amanda Rae Brown, Cathy Ferrell, Derrick McClendon, Antwan Grant, Sr, Chris Zweydoff (Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
27 27 order Notice Rescheduling Hearing Wed 10/09 12:42 PM
NOTICE rescheduling hearing that was previously set for 1/22/25 at 3:00 PM: Second Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 2/3/2025 at 02:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert J. Jonker (sjc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
26 26 order Case Management Order Thu 09/12 2:44 PM
AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 11/29/2024; status report due by 1/15/2025; status conference set for 1/22/2025 at 03:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert J. Jonker; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (sjc) Modified text on 9/12/2024 (eod)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
25 25 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 09/09 11:12 AM
JOINT MOTION for extension of time to complete discovery by plaintiffs T. Darryl Arnold, Amanda Rae Brown, Cathy Ferrell, Antwan Grant, Sr, Derrick McClendon, Chris Zweydoff; (Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
24 24 service Proof of Service Fri 08/30 2:29 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Martinrea International US Inc., Martinrea Jonesville LLC for Subpoena for Documents (Bennett, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Proof of Service
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
23 23 6 pgs order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 08/21 11:03 AM
ORDER granting STIPULATION22 with changes made by the Court to paragraphs 7, 8, and 11; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
22 22 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order (separate documents) Fri 08/16 5:56 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER For Protective Order by defendants Martinrea International US Inc., Martinrea Jonesville LLC (Bennett, Emily)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
21 21 order Case Management Order Thu 04/11 5:05 PM
FIRST CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: completion of discovery (phase one) to be completed by 9/30/2024; second Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 11/15/2024 at 3:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert J. Jonker; updated joint status report due by 11/12/2024; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
20 20 minutes Scheduling Conference - Rule 16 Thu 04/11 11:26 AM
MINUTES of Rule 16 scheduling conference held before Judge Robert J. Jonker (Court Reporter: Paul Brandell) (Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
19 19 order Notice Rescheduling Hearing Tue 03/19 11:48 AM
NOTICE rescheduling hearing that was previously set for 4/3/24; Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 4/10/2024 at 03:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert J. Jonker; (Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
18 18 order Notice Rescheduling Hearing Wed 03/13 4:13 PM
NOTICE rescheduling hearing that was previously set for 3/15/24; Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 4/3/2024 at 11:00 AM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert J. Jonker; (Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Continue Wed 03/13 11:46 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to continue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by plaintiff Derrick McClendon; (Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
16 16 misc Joint Status Report (Rule 16) Fri 03/08 11:24 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT (Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 19, 2024
notice Attorney Appearance Mon 02/19 11:45 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Lori Griffin on behalf of plaintiff Derrick McClendon (Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
15 15 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/16 2:27 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Martinrea Jonesville LLC identifying Corporate Parent Martinrea Metal Industries, Inc, Corporate Parent Martinrea Metals of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Martinrea Metal Holdings (USA), Inc., Corporate Parent Martinrea International Inc. for Martinrea Jonesville LLC (Bennett, Emily)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/16 2:24 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Martinrea International US Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Martinrea International US Holdco Inc., Corporate Parent Martinrea International Inc, Corporate Parent Martinrea International Inc, Corporate Parent Martinrea Metal Industries, Inc, Corporate Parent Martinrea Metals of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Martinrea Metal Holdings (USA), Inc. for Martinrea International US Inc. (Bennett, Emily)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 02/12 1:40 PM
SUMMONS returned executed; Martinrea Jonesville LLC served on 12/19/2023, answer due 1/9/2024 (Lazzaro, Anthony)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 02/12 1:38 PM
SUMMONS returned executed; Martinrea International US Inc. served on 12/19/2023, answer due 1/9/2024 (Lazzaro, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
11 11 5 pgs order Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Fri 02/09 3:27 PM
ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 3/15/2024 at 02:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 3/8/2024; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 02/09 1:51 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint6 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Martinrea Jonesville LLC (Bennett, Emily)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 02/09 1:49 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint6 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Martinrea International US Inc. (Bennett, Emily)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Fri 02/09 10:08 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jon Robert Steiger on behalf of defendants Martinrea International US Inc., Martinrea Jonesville LLC (Steiger, Jon)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Fri 02/09 1:43 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Emily E. Bennett on behalf of defendants Martinrea International US Inc., Martinrea Jonesville LLC (Bennett, Emily)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
8 8 order Notice of Impending Dismissal Thu 02/01 12:53 PM
NOTICE OF IMPENDING DISMISSAL as to Plaintiffs for defendants have not been served; complete service of process within 90 days after the filing of the complaint; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
7 7 respoth Response to Order to Show Cause Thu 12/14 1:07 PM
RESPONSE by plaintiffs T. Darryl Arnold, Amanda Rae Brown, Cathy Ferrell, Antwan Grant, Sr, Derrick McClendon, Chris Zweydoff to Order to Show Cause (Deadline)5 filed 11/30/2023 (Lazzaro, Anthony)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 12/14 1:05 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Martinrea International US Inc., Martinrea Jonesville LLC filed by Derrick McClendon (Lazzaro, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause (Deadline) Thu 11/30 11:21 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE regarding VENUE: Plaintiff Derrick McClendon to show cause by 12/14/2023; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 11/29 2:42 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Martinrea International US Inc., Martinrea Jonesville LLC (eod)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Wed 11/29 2:38 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Robert J. Jonker (eod)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Tue 11/28 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Filing Consent Forms by plaintiff Derrick McClendon (Lazzaro, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Darryl Arnold Consent Form,
Att: 2 Amanda Rae Brown Consent Form,
Att: 3 Cathy Ferrell Consent Form,
Att: 4 Antwan Grant, Sr. Consent Form,
Att: 5 Derrick McClendon Consent Form,
Att: 6 Chris Zweydoff Consent Form
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/28 2:35 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Martinrea International US Inc., Martinrea Jonesville LLC filed by Derrick McClendon (Lazzaro, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons to Martinrea Jonesville LLC,
Att: 3 Summons to Martinrea International US Inc.
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Tue 11/28 2:40 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Derrick McClendon in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-7225591 (Lazzaro, Anthony)
Related: [-]