New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 3:23-cv-22686
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Nov 28, 2023
Last checked: Sunday May 26, 2024 5:25 AM EDT
Defendant
OPTUM SERVICES, INC.
Represented By
TIMOTHY MICHAEL MCCARTHY
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Defendant
UNITED HEALTHCARE
Represented By
TIMOTHY MICHAEL MCCARTHY
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Defendant
UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC.
Represented By
TIMOTHY MICHAEL MCCARTHY
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Plaintiff
JERRY MERCADO
Represented By
KATHERINE CHARBONNIER OELTJEN
Console Mattiacci Law, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
14 14 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 05/28 9:03 AM
TEXT ORDER: On February 5, 2024, Defendants filed a motion to compel arbitration and dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No.1 ). (ECF No.8 .) On March 4, 2024, the parties jointly stipulated to stay Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No.1 ) and submit the action to arbitration (ECF No.12 ), which the Court granted (ECF No.13 ). Accordingly, Defendants' pending motion (ECF No.8 ) is terminated as moot. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 5/28/2024. (jab)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
misc Pro Hac Vice Fee Received Wed 04/03 3:02 PM
Pro Hac Vice fee received for Morgan D. Hollander, Esq.: $150.00, receipt number 137849. (gxh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
13 13 order Stipulation and Order Tue 03/05 11:44 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER staying the Complaint and submitting this action to Arbitration. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 3/5/2024. (jdg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
12 12 misc Stipulation Mon 03/04 5:03 PM
STIPULATION to Stay Complaint by OPTUM SERVICES, INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE, UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC.. (MCCARTHY, TIMOTHY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/29 8:49 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Timothy M. McCarthy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 2/28/2024. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
10 10 respm Letter Rule 7.1 Tue 02/20 4:50 PM
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re8 MOTION to Compel Arbitraton and Dismiss the Complaint . (OELTJEN, KATHERINE)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/09 9:44 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by OPTUM SERVICES, INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE, UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC..(MCCARTHY, TIMOTHY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Timothy M. McCarthy,
Att: 2 Certification of Morgan D. Hollander,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 02/09 11:52 AM
Set Deadlines as to9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 3/4/2024 before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (amv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 02/06 8:25 AM
Set Deadlines as to8 MOTION to Compel Arbitraton and Dismiss the Complaint . Motion set for 3/4/2024 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (kht)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
8 8 motion Compel Arbitration Mon 02/05 12:11 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitraton and Dismiss the Complaint by OPTUM SERVICES, INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE, UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC..(MCCARTHY, TIMOTHY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration,
Att: 2 Declaration of Susan Weedman,
Att: 3 Declaration of Timothy M. McCarthy, Esq.,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Mon 02/05 10:24 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by OPTUM SERVICES, INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE, UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC. identifying UnitedHealth Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (MCCARTHY, TIMOTHY)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/05 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY MICHAEL MCCARTHY on behalf of All Defendants (MCCARTHY, TIMOTHY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 12/06 3:37 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JERRY MERCADO. UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 12/6/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (OELTJEN, KATHERINE)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 12/06 3:36 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JERRY MERCADO. UNITED HEALTHCARE waiver sent on 12/6/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (OELTJEN, KATHERINE)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 12/06 3:34 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JERRY MERCADO. OPTUM SERVICES, INC. waiver sent on 12/6/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (OELTJEN, KATHERINE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 11/28 4:48 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to OPTUM SERVICES, INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE, UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kht)
Related: [-]
1 1 40 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 11/28 3:32 PM
COMPLAINT against OPTUM SERVICES, INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE, UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14899760) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JERRY MERCADO.(OELTJEN, KATHERINE)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 11/28 4:46 PM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (kht)
Related: [-]