Original Case: 2:22-cv-00298

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-04150
Typecivil / usa as party
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2023
Terminated:Feb 05, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 07, 2024 3:00 AM MST
Defendant
JOSEPH DELAROSA, an individual
Defendant
SCS ELKO, a Nevada entity
Defendant
MARLA L. MCDADE, in her individual and official capacity
Defendant
CHADWICK S. SMITH, an individual
Defendant
ELLIOT N. PARRIS, an individual
Defendant
STEVEN D. OLSON, an individual
Defendant
ADELA MORRISON, an individual
Defendant - Appellee
STEVE SISOLAK, Governor, in his official and individual capacity
Represented By
Douglas R. Rands
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Nevada
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ROBIN A. EVANS, an individual
Represented By
Jason R. Hull
Marshall, Olson & Hull
contact info
Trevor Charles Lang
Marshall, Olson & Hull
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
AARON D. FORD, an individual
Represented By
Douglas R. Rands
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Nevada
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
KRISTEN K. GODDARD-HEVENER, an individual
Represented By
Douglas R. Rands
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Nevada
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DAVIS GONZALEZ, an individual
Represented By
Abigail Dizon-Maughan
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Julianne P. Blanch
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Whitney Elizabeth McKiddy
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
KEVIN CLOCK, an individual
Represented By
Abigail Dizon-Maughan
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Julianne P. Blanch
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Whitney Elizabeth McKiddy
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
TAMMY J. CARRERA, an individual
Represented By
Rod N. Andreason
Kirton McConkie
contact info
Christopher M. Sanders
Kirton McConkie
contact info
Zachary Clyde Lindley
Kirton McConkie
contact info
Jeffrey Scott Sypolt
Law Office of Scott Sypolt
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
SALAL CREDIT UNION, a Washington entity
Represented By
William D. Holm
Jones Skelton & Hochuli
contact info
Robert R. Berk
Jones Skelton & Hochuli
contact info
Charles M. Callahan
Jones Skelton & Hochuli
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
VIRGINIA H. SIBBISON, an individual
Represented By
James D. Gilson
Dentons Durham Jones Pinegar
contact info
Cole Crowther
Dentons Durham Jones Pinegar
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ELKO BAND COLONY ENTERPRISES
Represented By
Ryan C. Bullock
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
GEORGE SKIBINE, an individual
Represented By
James D. Gilson
Dentons Durham Jones Pinegar
contact info
Cole Crowther
Dentons Durham Jones Pinegar
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DAVID D. CARRERA, an individual
Defendant - Appellee
TE-MOAK TRIBE OF WESTERN SHOSHONE INDIANS OF NEVADA, a federal corporation
Represented By
Rod N. Andreason
Kirton McConkie
contact info
Christopher M. Sanders
Kirton McConkie
contact info
Zachary Clyde Lindley
Kirton McConkie
contact info
Jeffrey Scott Sypolt
Law Office of Scott Sypolt
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
TONKON TORP, an Oregon entity
Represented By
Keith A. Call
Snow, Christensen & Martineau
contact info
Clark Steven Gardner
Snow, Christensen & Martineau
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
Amanda A. Berndt
Office of the United States Attorney
contact info
Nathan Jack
Office of the United States Attorney
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
LESLIE A. BERG-GROVE, an individual
Represented By
Stuart H. Schultz
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JUAN AREVALO, an individual
Represented By
Abigail Dizon-Maughan
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Julianne P. Blanch
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Whitney Elizabeth McKiddy
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
SUZANNA R. SANDOVAL, an individual
Represented By
Abigail Dizon-Maughan
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Julianne P. Blanch
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Whitney Elizabeth McKiddy
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
WENDALL D. HAYES, an individual
Represented By
Rod N. Andreason
Kirton McConkie
contact info
Christopher M. Sanders
Kirton McConkie
contact info
Zachary Clyde Lindley
Kirton McConkie
contact info
Jeffrey Scott Sypolt
Law Office of Scott Sypolt
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
PAUL CONABLE, an individual
Represented By
Keith A. Call
Snow, Christensen & Martineau
contact info
Clark Steven Gardner
Snow, Christensen & Martineau
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
STEVEN J. MCDADE, an individual
Represented By
Steven J. McDade
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ANGELEA MENDEZ, an individual
Represented By
Rod N. Andreason
Kirton McConkie
contact info
Christopher M. Sanders
Kirton McConkie
contact info
Zachary Clyde Lindley
Kirton McConkie
contact info
Jeffrey Scott Sypolt
Law Office of Scott Sypolt
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ALICE TYBO, an individual
Represented By
Rod N. Andreason
Kirton McConkie
contact info
Christopher M. Sanders
Kirton McConkie
contact info
Zachary Clyde Lindley
Kirton McConkie
contact info
Jeffrey Scott Sypolt
Law Office of Scott Sypolt
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DARIAN STANFORD, an individual
Represented By
Keith A. Call
Snow, Christensen & Martineau
contact info
Clark Steven Gardner
Snow, Christensen & Martineau
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JEFFREY SCOTT SYPOLT, an individual
Represented By
Rod N. Andreason
Kirton McConkie
contact info
Christopher M. Sanders
Kirton McConkie
contact info
Zachary Clyde Lindley
Kirton McConkie
contact info
Jeffrey Scott Sypolt
Law Office of Scott Sypolt
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JOSEPH HOLLEY, an individual
Represented By
Rod N. Andreason
Kirton McConkie
contact info
Christopher M. Sanders
Kirton McConkie
contact info
Zachary Clyde Lindley
Kirton McConkie
contact info
Jeffrey Scott Sypolt
Law Office of Scott Sypolt
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DUANE GARCIA, SR., an individual
Represented By
Rod N. Andreason
Kirton McConkie
contact info
Christopher M. Sanders
Kirton McConkie
contact info
Zachary Clyde Lindley
Kirton McConkie
contact info
Jeffrey Scott Sypolt
Law Office of Scott Sypolt
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
TANYA REYNOLDS, an individual
Represented By
Rod N. Andreason
Kirton McConkie
contact info
Christopher M. Sanders
Kirton McConkie
contact info
Zachary Clyde Lindley
Kirton McConkie
contact info
Jeffrey Scott Sypolt
Law Office of Scott Sypolt
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
THALIA MARIN, an individual
Represented By
Abigail Dizon-Maughan
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Julianne P. Blanch
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Whitney Elizabeth McKiddy
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ANDREA WOODS, an individual
Represented By
Rod N. Andreason
Kirton McConkie
contact info
Christopher M. Sanders
Kirton McConkie
contact info
Zachary Clyde Lindley
Kirton McConkie
contact info
Jeffrey Scott Sypolt
Law Office of Scott Sypolt
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
LARRY YEAGER, an individual
Represented By
Abigail Dizon-Maughan
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Julianne P. Blanch
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Whitney Elizabeth McKiddy
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DENTONS US LLP, a Utah entity, DBA Dentons, Durham, Jones, Pinegar P.C.
Represented By
Stephen H. Rovak
Dentons
contact info
James D. Gilson
Dentons Durham Jones Pinegar
contact info
Cole Crowther
Dentons Durham Jones Pinegar
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
J. R. DOCKSEY, an individual
Represented By
James D. Gilson
Dentons Durham Jones Pinegar
contact info
Cole Crowther
Dentons Durham Jones Pinegar
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
SAMUEL L. BIERS, an individual and Chief Tribal Judge of the Te-Moak Supreme Court
Represented By
Samuel L. Biers
contact info

GPO Feb 05 2024
[11064507] Jurisdictional Defect; Procedural termination after other judicial action; Written, unsigned, unpublished. Judges Tymkovich, Bacharach and Rossman. [23-4150]

Docket last updated: 02/07/2024 3:00 AM MST

Create an account to get the full docket for this case.