Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-20294

Wyoming Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Cathleen D Parker
Case #: 2:23-ap-02016
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
Case Filed:Nov 28, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
JUSTIN RYAN BRILMAN
970 W BROADWAY, STE E PMB 454
JACKSON, WY 83001
Represented By
JUSTIN RYAN BRILMAN
contact info
Plaintiff
Guaranteed Rate, Inc.
511 W. 19th St. Ste. 100
Cheyenne, WY 82009
Represented By
Timothy L. Woznick
Crowley Fleck Pllp
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 04/11 10:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/11/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order on Motion to Stay
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
11 11 2 pgs order Stay Wed 04/09 10:05 AM
Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Stay Adversary Proceeding Pending Performance of Settlement Agreement Related [+] (dxj)
Related: [-] 10
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
10 10 motion Stay Tue 04/08 3:57 PM
Agreed Motion To Stay Adversary Proceeding Pending Performance of Settlement Agreement . Filed by Guaranteed Rate, Inc. (Woznick, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed/Unsigned Order
Thursday, January 18, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 01/18 10:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order on Generic Motion
Friday, January 12, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Generic Motion Tue 01/16 10:46 AM
Order Holding Adversary Proceeding in Abeyance Related [+] (tsm)
Related: [-] 7
Thursday, January 11, 2024
7 7 motion Generic Motion Thu 01/11 3:02 PM
Motion to Hold Adversary Proceeding in Abeyance Related [+]. Filed by JUSTIN RYAN BRILMAN (Garber, Aaron)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,6 Summons Service Executed
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Friday, December 15, 2023
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 12/15 1:17 PM
Summons Service Executed on JUSTIN RYAN BRILMAN 12/15/2023. (Woznick, Timothy)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Fri 12/15 12:58 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Guaranteed Rate, Inc. (Woznick, Timothy)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,4 Alias Summons Issued
Friday, December 08, 2023
4 4 court Alias Summons Issued Fri 12/08 1:15 PM
Alias Summons Issued on JUSTIN RYAN BRILMAN Date Issued 12/8/2023, Answer Due 1/8/2024 . (dxj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
3 3 court Summons Issued Wed 11/29 8:24 AM
Summons Issued on JUSTIN RYAN BRILMAN Date Issued 11/29/2023, Answer Due 12/29/2023 . (dcsl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 11/28 9:34 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 23-02016 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A2530321. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 35 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 11/28 9:34 PM
Adversary case 23-02016 ADVERSARY COMPLAINT - Nature of Suit (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)), (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) - by Plaintiff(s) Guaranteed Rate, Inc. against Defendant(s) JUSTIN RYAN BRILMAN. Fee Amount $350. (Woznick, Timothy)
Related: [-]