Maryland District Court
Judge:Peter J Messitte
Case #: 8:23-cv-03245
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Nov 29, 2023
Terminated:Feb 20, 2024
Last checked: Monday May 27, 2024 4:26 AM EDT
Defendant
The Laundress, LLC
Represented By
Faith Elizabeth Benn
Swanson, Martin & Bell, LLP
contact info
Michael A. McCaskey
Swanson, Martin & Bell, Llp Chicago
contact info
Patrick E Hogan
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Caitlin M. Barry
Swanson, Martin & Bell, Llp Chicago
contact info
Defendant
Conopco, Inc.
Represented By
Faith Elizabeth Benn
Swanson, Martin & Bell, LLP
contact info
Patrick E Hogan
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephanie Michelle Nixon
Represented By
Adam John Kress
Johnson Becker PLLC
contact info
Anna R. Rick
Johnson Becker PLLC
contact info
Robert Keith Jenner
Jenner Law, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Transfer Case Tue 02/20 4:37 PM
ORDER granting25 Motion to Transfer Case; directing the Clerk to transfer this case to the Southern District of New York and to close the case. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 2/20/2024. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred Out - District Tue 02/20 4:46 PM
Case transferred to District of United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Using your PACER account, you may retrieve the docket sheet and documents via the case number link. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
26 26 respm Response Mon 02/12 11:59 AM
RESPONSE re25 MOTION to Transfer Case to The Southern District of New York, or in the alternative, Stay This Matter filed by Stephanie Michelle Nixon.(Kress, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
25 25 motion Transfer Case Mon 01/29 5:41 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case to The Southern District of New York, or in the alternative, Stay This Matter by Conopco, Inc., The Laundress, LLC(Benn, Faith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion To Transfer,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Transfer
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/29 3:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Faith Elizabeth Benn on behalf of Conopco, Inc., The Laundress, LLC (Benn, Faith)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
order Order on Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/26 10:42 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting20 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Caitlin M. Barry. Directing attorney Caitlin M. Barry to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 1/26/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
order Order on Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/26 10:45 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting21 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael A. McCaskey. Directing attorney Michael A. McCaskey to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 1/26/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
21 21 motion Pro Hac Vice - Corrected Thu 01/25 2:14 PM
CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael A. McCaskey by The Laundress, LLC. The fee has already been paid.(Hogan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Pro Hac Vice - Corrected Thu 01/25 2:10 PM
CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Caitlin M. Barry by The Laundress, LLC. The fee has already been paid.(Hogan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice QC Notice - Pro Hac - Signatures Thu 01/25 10:47 AM
QC NOTICE:17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by The Laundress, LLC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice QC Notice - Pro Hac - Signatures Thu 01/25 10:46 AM
QC NOTICE:16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by The Laundress, LLC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
17 17 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/19 12:58 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Caitlin M. Barry (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11040831.) by The Laundress, LLC(Hogan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/19 12:55 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael A. McCaskey (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11040770.) by The Laundress, LLC(Hogan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 01/16 9:15 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi no longer assigned to the case. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
notice 25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Fri 12/29 9:33 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Ajmel A. Quereshi. Conopco, Inc., The Laundress, LLC or counsel for Conopco, Inc., The Laundress, LLC are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 1/12/2024. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
order Order Fri 12/29 3:54 PM
Paperless ORDER approving stipulation in ECF No. 12. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 12/29/2023. (Quereshi, Ajmel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
12 12 misc Stipulation Thu 12/28 6:56 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, and Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint at Law by Conopco, Inc., The Laundress, LLC(Hogan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/28 6:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick E Hogan on behalf of Conopco, Inc., The Laundress, LLC (Hogan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/20 12:24 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Adam John Kress. Directing attorney Adam John Kress to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/19 10:59 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Adam J. Kress (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10994452.) by Stephanie Michelle Nixon(Jenner, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/14 8:56 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anna R. Rick (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10985948.) by Stephanie Michelle Nixon(Jenner, Robert)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/14 9:53 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Anna R. Rick. Directing attorney Anna R. Rick to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 12/14/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/12 2:19 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephanie Michelle Nixon. Conopco, Inc. served on 12/5/2023, answer due 12/26/2023.(Jenner, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
4 4 order 25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order Thu 11/30 2:42 PM
Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 11/30/2023. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 11/30 2:40 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to The Laundress, LLC, Conopco, Inc. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 11/30 2:29 PM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice 25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Thu 11/30 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Ajmel A. Quereshi. Plaintiff Stephanie Michelle Nixon or counsel for Stephanie Michelle Nixon are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/14/2023. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/29 4:09 PM
COMPLAINT against Conopco, Inc. d/b/a Unilever Home & Personal Care USA, The Laundress, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10953643.), filed by Stephanie Michelle Nixon.(Jenner, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons