Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-13808

Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:August B Landis
Case #: 2:23-ap-01148
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
Case Filed:Nov 29, 2023
Terminated:Apr 24, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
JESSE MONTEZ THORTON, SR., Defendant
6535 CLEAR PEAK CT.
LAS VEGAS, NV 89156
Represented By
JESSE MONTEZ THORTON, SR.
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIE JAMES WESTON, Plaintiff
6541 Clear Peak Court
Las Vegas, NV 89156
Represented By
BENJAMIN B. CHILDS, SR.
contact info
Plaintiff
AMY WESTON, Plaintiff
6541 Clear Peak Court
Las Vegas, NV 89156
Represented By
BENJAMIN B. CHILDS, SR.
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
13 13 notice Entry of Order (Adv) Wed 04/24 1:56 PM
Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment with Certificate of Service Filed by BENJAMIN B. CHILDS SR. on behalf of WILLIE JAMES WESTON Related [+](CHILDS, BENJAMIN)
Related: [-] 11 Stipulated/Agreed Order.
11 11 orderad Stipulated/Agreed Order (Adv) Wed 04/24 1:00 PM
Stipulated/Agreed Order Related [+] (arv)
Related: [-] 10 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff WILLIE JAMES WESTON.
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
10 10 adv_misc Stipulation (Adv) Tue 04/23 12:05 PM
Stipulation By WILLIE JAMES WESTON and Between Plaintiffs and Defendant STIPULATED SETTLEMENT Filed by BENJAMIN B. CHILDS SR. on behalf of WILLIE JAMES WESTON Related [+] (CHILDS, BENJAMIN)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff WILLIE JAMES WESTON, Plaintiff AMY WESTON.
Thursday, April 18, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 04/18 9:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 04/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Hearing (BNC-BK and/or ADV only)
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
8 8 court Notice of Hearing (BNC-BK and/or ADV only) Tue 04/16 12:28 PM
Notice of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 6/11/2024 at 10:00 AM at ABL Zoom Teleconference Line. Related [+] (pal)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff WILLIE JAMES WESTON, Plaintiff AMY WESTON.
7 7 court Minute Entry Continued (ADV) Tue 04/16 11:59 AM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 6/4/2024 10:00 AM. Continued. Related [+] (Hearing scheduled 06/11/2024 at 10:00 AM at ABL Zoom Teleconference Line. (pal)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by WILLIE JAMES WESTON, AMY WESTON
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
6 6 court Minute Entry Continued (ADV) Tue 04/09 11:57 AM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 04/09/2024 10:00 am. Continued. Related [+] Appearances: BENJAMIN B. CHILDS, GEORGE HAINES Scheduling Conference scheduled for 06/04/2024 at 10:00 AM at ABL Zoom Teleconference Line. (mar)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by WILLIE JAMES WESTON, AMY WESTON
Thursday, November 30, 2023
5 5 adv_misc Certificate of Service (ADV) Thu 11/30 2:14 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons, Complaint, Standard Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Packet with Certificate of Service Filed by BENJAMIN B. CHILDS SR. on behalf of AMY WESTON, WILLIE JAMES WESTON Related [+] (CHILDS, BENJAMIN)
Related: [-] 4 Summons Issued.
4 4 court Summons Issued Thu 11/30 11:55 AM
Summons Issued on JESSE MONTEZ THORTON SR. (arv)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 11/30 11:54 AM
Summons Issued on JESSE MONTEZ THORTON SR. (arv)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference) Thu 11/30 11:53 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 4/9/2024 at 10:00 AM at Remote. Related [+] (arv)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff WILLIE JAMES WESTON, Plaintiff AMY WESTON.
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/29 11:02 AM
Adversary case 23-01148 Complaint Filed by WILLIE JAMES WESTON, AMY WESTON vs. JESSE MONTEZ THORTON SR. Fee Amount $350. (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)(CHILDS, BENJAMIN)
Related: [-]