Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Ada Brown
Case #: 3:23-cv-02636
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Case Filed:Nov 29, 2023
Last checked: Monday May 27, 2024 3:58 AM CDT
Defendant
Stephanie Morris
Plaintiff
Nissan Motor Acceptance Company LLC
Represented By
Andrew S Elliott
Severson & Werson
contact info
Donald Hogan Cram, III
Severson & Werson
contact info
Christopher Michael Staine
Crowe & Dunlevy
contact info
Plaintiff
Nissan Extended Services North America GP
Represented By
Andrew S Elliott
Severson & Werson
contact info
Donald Hogan Cram, III
Severson & Werson
contact info
Christopher Michael Staine
Crowe & Dunlevy
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Tue 11/26 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Bankruptcy Filing filed by Nissan Motor Acceptance Company LLC (Staine, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations Thu 08/22 1:16 PM
ORDER ACCEPTING15 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 8/22/2024) (axm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
15 15 motion Findings and Recommendations Tue 08/06 3:46 PM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should deny the Motion for Default Judgment [Dkt. No.13 ] without prejudice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 8/6/2024) (axm)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
14 14 order Order Referring Motion Mon 01/08 12:02 PM
ELECTRONIC Order Referring Motion re:13 MOTION for Default Judgment against Stephanie Morris Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 1/8/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
13 13 motion Default Judgment Fri 01/05 6:09 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Stephanie Morris filed by Nissan Motor Acceptance Company LLC (Staine, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration(s) of Allison Jank in Support of Motion for Default Judgment,
Att: 2 Declaration(s) of Jack Crowley in Support of Motion for Default Judgment,
Att: 3 Declaration(s) of Christopher M. Staine in Support of Motion for Default Judgment,
Att: 4 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
12 12 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 01/02 4:15 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Stephanie Morris. (cfk)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Tue 01/02 12:50 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Default filed by Nissan Motor Acceptance Company LLC. (Staine, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration(s) Declaration of Christopher M. Staine in Support of Request for Entry of Default as to Stephanie Morris,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Entry of Default
Monday, December 18, 2023
10 10 service Summons Returned Mon 12/18 3:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Stephanie Morris ; served on 12/8/2023. (Staine, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
9 9 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/12 12:08 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew S. Elliott. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 12/12/2023) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
8 8 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/11 5:37 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14236364) filed by Nissan Extended Services North America GP, Nissan Motor Acceptance Company LLC (Elliott, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 01, 2023
7 7 order Order Fri 12/01 11:26 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: It has come to the Court's attention that Plaintiff's Counsel Andrew S. Elliott is not admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas. Therefore, within 20 days from the date of this order, counsel for Plaintiff must either become admitted to practice in this District (See LR 83.7), or move the Court to be admitted Pro Hac Vice (See LR 83.9(b)). Failure to do so may result in sanctions being imposed for failure to comply with an order of the Court. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 12/1/2023) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 11/30 1:27 PM
Summons Issued as to Stephanie Morris. (kcr)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Abstract of Judgment Thu 11/30 9:56 AM
*** Please Disregard - Entered in Error *** Abstract of Judgment issued. Manually Signed with Raised Seal Mailed to Attorney Doug Ray. (oyh) Modified on 11/30/2023 (kcr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
5 5 qcref Brown Thu 11/30 12:33 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (kcr)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Wed 11/29 5:18 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nissan Extended Services North America, GP. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Staine, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Wed 11/29 5:16 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nissan Motor Acceptance Company LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Staine, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 11/29 5:08 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Nissan Motor Acceptance Company LLC. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-14205141) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Staine, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Sedalia Wholesale Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Durango Wholesale Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Sedalia UCC Statement,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) Durango UCC Statement,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) Sedalia Sign Lease Agreement,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) Durango Sign Lease Agreement,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) Durango Capital Loan,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) Durango Lease Agreement,
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) Durango Leased Vehicles,
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) Promissory Note,
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) Cross Agreement,
Att: 12 Exhibit(s) Sedalia Continuing Guaranty Agreement,
Att: 13 Exhibit(s) Durango Continuing Guaranty Agreement,
Att: 14 Exhibit(s) NESNA Guaranty Agreement,
Att: 15 Exhibit(s) Sept. 21 Demand Letter,
Att: 16 Exhibit(s) SOT Vehicles,
Att: 17 Exhibit(s) Durango Complaint without Exhibits,
Att: 18 Exhibit(s) Durango Order of Possession,
Att: 19 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 20 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Interested Parties,
Att: 21 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Interested Parties