District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Tanya S Chutkan
Case #: 1:23-cv-03528
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2023
Terminated:Feb 05, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 25, 2024 5:21 AM EDT
Defendant
JACK BRADLEY JARRETT, III
Represented By
Sara N. McDonough
Alan Lescht & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
ALAN LESCHT
Represented By
Sara N. McDonough
Alan Lescht & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
JANET THOMAS
1181 Nixon Drive #1057
Mootestown, NJ 08057

GPO Feb 03 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION re: Defendants' 10 Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Referral to Disciplinary Board. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/3/2025. (lccc)

Docket last updated: 28 minutes ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
34 34 respm Reply to opposition to motion Wed 04/16 1:53 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re31 Motion to Amend/Correct, filed by JANET THOMAS. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
33 33 8 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Wed 04/09 12:39 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re31 Motion to Amend/Correct, filed by JACK BRADLEY JARRETT, III, ALAN LESCHT.(McDonough, Sara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 03/25 10:50 AM
MINUTE ORDER: GRANTING32 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' response to Plaintiff's31 Motion to Amend Complaint is due by April 9, 2025. Plaintiff's reply is due by April 23, 2025. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/25/2025. (lccc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
32 32 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 03/24 11:14 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to31 MOTION to Amend/Correct by ALAN LESCHT, JACK BRADLEY JARRETT, III.(McDonough, Sara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 03/05 2:26 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The court granted Plaintiff leave to file her31 Motion for Leave to Amend. Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Motion is due by March 26, 2025. Plaintiff's reply is due by April 9, 2025. Until the court rules on the instant motion, any further motions for leave to file/amend will be looked upon with disfavor. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/5/2025. (lccc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
31 31 motion Amend/Correct Wed 03/05 2:21 PM
MOTION to Amend by JANET THOMAS. "LEAVE TO FILE GRANTED." Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/3/2025 (zjm)
Related: [-]
30 30 order Leave to File Denied Wed 03/05 2:20 PM
LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- JANET THOMAS - Motion. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. "LEAVE TO FILE DENIED. In light of Plaintiff's subsequent request for leave to file, received 2/28/2025, Plaintiff's request for leave to file is denied as MOOT." Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/3/2025. (zjm)
Related: [-]
29 29 order Leave to File Denied Wed 03/05 2:18 PM
LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- JANET THOMAS - Motion. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. "LEAVE TO FILE DENIED. In light of Plaintiff's subsequent request for leave to file, received 2/28/2025, Plaintiff's request for leave to file is denied as MOOT." Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/3/2025. (zjm)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 02/24 4:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER: DENYING28 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend. Courts should freely grant pro se litigants leave to amend in the absence of undue delay, bad faith, undue prejudice, repeated failure to cure deficiencies, or futility. Richardson v. United States , 193 F.3d 545, 548 (D.C. Cir. 1999). Plaintiff's proposed amendment is futile because it reasserts the same basis for jurisdiction as the original complaint, which the court already ruled failed to survive a motion to dismiss. See BEG Invs., LLC v. Alberti , 85 F. Supp. 3d 13, 23 (D.D.C. 2015). Plaintiff's amendment must address the defects identified in the court's24 Memorandum Opinion. The deadline for Plaintiff to file a motion for leave to amend is extended until March 10, 2025. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail courtesy copies of the court's24 Memorandum Opinion,25 Order, and an updated copy of the docket sheet to Plaintiff's current address of record. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/24/2025. (lccc)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
28 28 motion Amend/Correct Mon 02/24 4:15 PM
MOTION to Amend by JANET THOMAS. "LEAVE TO FILE GRANTED." signed by Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 02/21/2025 (zjm)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Leave to File Denied Mon 02/24 4:13 PM
LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- JANET THOMAS - Motion. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. "LEAVE TO FILE DENIED. In light of Plaintiff's subsequent request for leave to file, received 2/20/2025, Plaintiff's request for leave to file is denied as MOOT." Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 02/21/2025. (zjm)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Leave to File Denied Mon 02/24 4:12 PM
LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- JANET THOMAS - Motion. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. "LEAVE TO FILE DENIED. In light of Plaintiff's subsequent request for leave to file, received 2/20/2025, Plaintiff's request for leave to file is denied as MOOT." Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 02/21/2025. (zjm)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Order Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 02/03 2:19 PM
ORDER granting Defendants'10 Motion to Dismiss; denying Plaintiff's21 Motion for Referral to Disciplinary Board. This case is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint is due by March 3, 2025. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/3/2025. (lccc)
Related: [-]
24 24 6 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Mon 02/03 2:16 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION re: Defendants'10 Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiff's21 Motion for Referral to Disciplinary Board. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/3/2025. (lccc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 09/11 1:57 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's20 Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply. "The Local Rules of this Court contemplate that there ordinarily will be at most three memoranda associated with any given motion: (i) the movant's opening memorandum; (ii) the non-movant's opposition; and (iii) the movant's reply." Crummey v. Soc. Sec. Admin., 794 F. Supp. 2d 46, 62 (D.D.C. 2011) (citing LCvR 7). Here, Plaintiff is the non-movant and "when the nonmovant is deprived of the opportunity to contest matters raised for the first time in the movant's reply, the non-movant may" file a motion seeking leave to file a sur-reply brief. Id. (citing BenKotel v. Howard Univ., 319 F.3d 532, 536 (D.C. Cir. 2003)). Although sur-reply briefs are generally disfavored, district courts may exercise their discretion to grant or deny a motion to file a sur-reply brief. Id. (citation omitted). In exercising its discretion, "the district court should remain cognizant that parties proceeding without legal representation are entitled to a certain amount of solicitude in the conduct of litigation, but also that such solicitude is not limitless and pro se litigants are not relieved of their obligation to comply with the applicable rules." Id. (citing Slovinec v. Am. Univ., 520 F. Supp. 2d 107, 111 (D.D.C. 2007)). Here, Plaintiff has properly sought leave to file her sur-reply brief and it appears to address issues raised for the first time in Defendants' reply brief. Thus, the court will GRANT Plaintiff's20 Motion and consider her sur-reply brief in deciding Defendants' pending10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 09/11/2024. (lcd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
23 23 respm Reply to opposition to motion Wed 07/24 12:39 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re21 MOTION for Order filed by JANET THOMAS. (zjm)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
22 22 6 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Mon 07/15 9:45 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re21 Motion for Order filed by JACK BRADLEY JARRETT, III, ALAN LESCHT.(McDonough, Sara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, July 01, 2024
21 21 motion Motion For Order Tue 07/02 10:41 AM
MOTION for Order by JANET THOMAS. (mg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Wed 03/13 3:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court is Defendants'10 pending Motion to Dismiss, which is ripe for review. On March 8, 2024, however, before the court ruled on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Plaintiff filed a18 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff previously had the opportunity to rebut Defendants' Motion to Dismiss in her Opposition11 Brief. To the extent Plaintiff's claims survive the Motion to Dismiss stage, at that point, the court will order the parties to meet, confer, and set a briefing schedule to move the matter forward. Until then, additional dispositive motions are improper. Thus, Plaintiff's18 Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby STRICKEN as premature and improper. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 03/13/2024. (lcd)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
20 20 motion Leave to File Document Mon 03/11 3:11 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by JANET THOMAS.(zjm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Friday, March 08, 2024
19 19 respm Reply to opposition to motion Fri 03/08 5:50 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ALAN LESCHT.(McDonough, Sara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 11,
Att: 2 Exhibit 12,
Att: 3 Exhibit 13
18 18 motion Summary Judgment Fri 03/08 4:28 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by JANET THOMAS. (zjm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
17 17 misc Errata Tue 02/20 4:19 PM
ERRATA by JANET THOMAS re16 Response to motion.(zjm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 18,
Att: 2 Exhibit 20
Friday, January 26, 2024
16 16 respm Response to motion Wed 01/31 3:50 PM
RESPONSE re10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JANET THOMAS.(zjm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-4,
Att: 2 Exhibit 5-19
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
15 15 order Leave to File Denied Wed 01/24 2:38 PM
LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- JANET THOMAS - Surreply. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. "Leave to Fie DENIED. The court has requested that Plaintiff refile her response to Defendant's outstanding Motion to Dismiss. Therefore, this Surreply is denied as MOOT." Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 01/23/2024. (zjm)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 01/23 9:09 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Deadlines set. (zcll)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
14 14 order .Order Mon 01/22 12:11 PM
FOX/NEAL ORDER: Plaintiff shall file her opposition or other response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 10, no later than February 23, 2024. If Plaintiff does not respond by that date or does not fully respond to the arguments raised by Defendant, the court may treat the motion as conceded and dismiss the claims asserted. Failure to adhere to the court's Local Rules, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, or any orders of this court may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 01/22/2024. (lcd)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 01/22 12:18 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Defendants' Reply Brief is due March 8, 2024. Once the Defendants' brief is filed, briefing will be closed and no further filings will be permitted relating to the motion absent leave of court and for good cause shown. See Crummey v. Soc. Sec. Admin., 794 F. Supp. 2d 46, 62 (D.D.C. 2011) (citing LCvR 7) (noting that sur-reply briefs are disfavored as the Local Rules of this Court contemplate that there ordinarily will be at most three memoranda associated with any given motion: (i) the movant's opening memorandum; (ii) the non-movant's opposition; and (iii) the movant's reply.) The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff at her address of record. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 01/22/2024. (lcd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
13 13 motion Leave to File Document Fri 01/19 3:33 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by JANET THOMAS. (zjm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
12 12 respm Reply to opposition to motion Tue 01/16 7:36 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JACK BRADLEY JARRETT, III, ALAN LESCHT. (McDonough, Sara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
11 11 respm Response to motion Thu 01/11 1:40 PM
RESPONSE re10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JANET THOMAS. (zjm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
10 10 motion Dismiss Tue 12/26 8:49 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by JACK BRADLEY JARRETT, III, ALAN LESCHT.(McDonough, Sara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6,
Att: 9 Exhibit 7,
Att: 10 Exhibit 8,
Att: 11 Exhibit 9,
Att: 12 Exhibit 10
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
7 7 service Electronic Summons Reissued Tue 12/12 3:41 PM
SUMMONS (2) Reissued Electronically as to JACK BRADLEY JARRETT, III, ALAN LESCHT (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zjm)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
9 9 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Wed 12/13 1:51 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JACK BRADLEY JARRETT, III served on 12/4/2023, answer due 12/25/2023 (zjm)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Wed 12/13 1:48 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALAN LESCHT served on 11/30/2023, answer due 12/21/2023 (zjm)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
6 6 cmp Request for Summons to Issue Tue 12/12 3:35 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by JANET THOMAS.(zjm)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 12/12 3:35 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against JACK BRADLEY JARRETT, III, ALAN LESCHT with Jury Demand filed by JANET THOMAS. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits)(zjm)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
4 4 order .Order Mon 12/04 10:46 AM
ORDER: Advising pro se Plaintiff of their obligation to follow the FRCP, Local Rules, and orders of the court. Failure to adhere to these rules or orders may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff at their address of record (See order for further details). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/04/2023. (lcd)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
3 3 notice Pro Se Electronic Noticing Form Wed 11/29 2:09 PM
NEW Pro Se Consent To Receive Notices of Electronic Filing by JANET THOMAS (zjm)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Related Case Wed 11/29 1:59 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JANET THOMAS. Case related to Case No. 23-cv-02637-TSC. (zjm)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/29 1:49 PM
COMPLAINT against JACK BRADLEY JARRETT, III, ALAN LESCHT ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 206036) with Jury Demand filed by JANET THOMAS. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zjm)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Wed 11/29 1:52 PM
Summons (2) Issued as to JACK BRADLEY JARRETT, III, ALAN LESCHT. (zjm)
Related: [-]