Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Sam A Lindsay
Referred: Renee Harris Toliver
Case #: 3:23-cv-02632
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Nov 07, 2023
Terminated:Jan 04, 2024
Last checked: Sunday May 05, 2024 6:25 AM CDT
Defendant
Union Pacific Railroad
Plaintiff
Victor Lloyd Martinez, Sr
6707 Columbia Dr
Amarillo, TX 79109


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, January 04, 2024
8 8 order Order Transferring to Another Division Thu 01/04 2:46 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER transferring case to the Amarillo Division of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas. Under the authority of Miscellaneous Order No. 6, this action is transferred to the Amarillo Division, where venue is proper. See 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a); 42 U.S.C. § 2000e-5(f)(3); In re Horseshoe Entertainment , 337 F.3d 429, 432-33 (5th Cir. 2003) (per curiam). Plaintiff sues Union Pacific Railroad, his former employer, for wrongful termination and employment discrimination. Union Pacific Railroad is located in Dalhart, Texas, within the jurisdictional boundaries of the Amarillo Division, and the events at issue also occurred in Dalhart. Plaintiff, who resides in Amarillo, has alleged no events that occurred within the Dallas Division. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 1/4/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
utility Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer (Public Entry) Thu 01/04 3:04 PM
Case copied to 2:24cv0004 Z. Transfer to Amarillo Division complete; clerk to set Related Case hyperlink, clear unnecessary flags, etc. (ldm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 01/03 2:09 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Union Pacific Railroad filed by Victor Lloyd Martinez, Sr. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ndt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 12/20 2:41 PM
ORDER granting Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Doc. 3. No process will issue pending completion of screening. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 12/20/2023) (chmb)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Wed 12/20 3:30 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Wed Dec 20 15:30:51 CST 2023 (crt)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
misc Order Receipt Fri 12/08 9:00 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Fri Dec 8 09:00:20 CST 2023 (crt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
5 5 2 pgs order Order And Notice of Deficiency Fri 12/08 8:59 AM
Order and Notice of Deficiency: Victor Martinez, Sr must address the following deficiency: (1) File an amended complaint on the form complaint for use in employment discrimination cases (Pro Se 7) and specify his legal claims in compliance with Rule 8(a) and (2) register to use the Courts electronic filing system. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 12/28/2023. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 12/7/2023) (cfk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
4 4 order Order Thu 11/30 11:57 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF JUDICIAL SCREENING AND STANDING ORDER. Judicial screening of this case is pending. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). It is therefore ORDERED that (1) service of process shall be withheld pending completion of judicial screening, (2) no motions for appointment of counsel shall be filed until the Court has completed the screening process, (3) all discovery in this case is stayed until the Court enters a scheduling order, (4) no amendments or supplements to the complaint shall be filed without prior Court approval, and (5) any motion to amend the complaint must be accompanied by a complete proposed amended complaint on the required form. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff must promptly notify the Court in writing of any change of address by filing a written Notice of Change of Address with the Clerk of the Court. Failure to provide updated address information may result in the dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute or follow court order under Fed. R. Civ. 41(b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 11/30/2023) (chmb)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Thu 11/30 11:35 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Thu Nov 30 11:35:22 CST 2023 (crt)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Thu 11/30 2:27 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Thu Nov 30 14:27:31 CST 2023 (crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
3 3 cmp Complaint Wed 11/29 4:24 PM
COMPLAINT against Union Pacific Railroad filed by Victor Martinez, Sr. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (kcr)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Wed 11/29 4:23 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (kcr)
Related: [-]
1 1 qcref Lindsay Wed 11/29 4:20 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (kcr)
Related: [-]
motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 11/29 4:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Victor Martinez, Sr. See document1 for Image. (kcr)
Related: [-]