Alabama Southern District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00215
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Nov 30, 2023 1:25 AM CST
Defendant
Kevin Wayne Wilson (1)
Represented By
Peter J. Madden
Federal Defender Organization
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Katherine Chappelear
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Elizabeth P. Stepan
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/30/2023 1:49 AM CST
Friday, October 27, 2023
Set/Reset Deadlines as to Kevin Wayne Wilson Unseal deadline set for 1/29/2024 (tgw) [1:23-mj-00273-N]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Kevin Wayne Wilson (1). (tgw) (tgw). [1:23-mj-00273-N]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Att: 2 (11/17/2023) Redacted Affidavit
3 3 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Kevin Wayne Wilson. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (tgw) [1:23-mj-00273-N]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion to Seal Case as to Kevin Wayne Wilson (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/27/23. (tgw) [1:23-mj-00273-N]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson,Initial Appearance as to Kevin Wayne Wilson held on 10/30/2023. DCR Digital Audio Recording. (tgw) [1:23-mj-00273-N]
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION to Detain by USA as to Kevin Wayne Wilson. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (tgw) [1:23-mj-00273-N]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Kevin Wayne Wilson: Detention Hearing set for 11/2/2023 02:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/30/23. (tgw) [1:23-mj-00273-N]
Related: [-]
7 7 Warrant Returned Executed on 10/27/2023 as to Kevin Wayne Wilson. (fz) [1:23-mj-00273-N]
Related: [-]
8 8 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Kevin Wayne Wilson (tgw) [1:23-mj-00273-N]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL DEFENDER Peter J. Madden for Kevin Wayne Wilson appointed.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/30/23. (tgw) [1:23-mj-00273-N]
Related: [-]
10 10 Order on Initial Appearance as to Kevin Wayne Wilson Defendant informed of rights. AUSA Katherine Chappelear appeared for the Government. FPD Peter Madden appeared for the Defendant. Probable cause was found after Defendant orally waived the hearing.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/30/23. (tgw) [1:23-mj-00273-N]
Related: [-]
11 11 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Kevin Wayne Wilson (tgw) [1:23-mj-00273-N]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. Detention Hearing as to Kevin Wayne Wilson held on 11/2/2023. Detention taken under advisement; order to follow. DCR Digital Audio Recording. (tgw) [1:23-mj-00273-N]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Kevin Wayne Wilson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/2/2023. (Copy emailed to parties & USM) (tgw) [1:23-mj-00273-N]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
Case unsealed as to Kevin Wayne Wilson (tgw) [1:23-mj-00273-N]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
18 18 INDICTMENT as to Kevin Wayne Wilson counts 1, 2, 3-9, 10. (cmj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Penalty Page,
Att: 2 Signed Indictment