Alabama Southern District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00216
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Nov 30, 2023 1:25 AM CST
Defendant
Abelardo Castellon (1)
Defendant
Kainor Antoinio Nicolas Castellon (4)
Defendant
Jorge Escobar Mejia (3)
Defendant
Edgar Paredes Sanchez (2)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
George F. May
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/30/2023 1:50 AM CST
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins,Telephone Conference as to Abelardo Castellon, Edgar Paredes Sanchez, Jorge Escobar Mejia, Kainor Antoinio Nichol Castellon held on 11/14/2023 DCR Digital Audio Recording. (srd) [1:23-mj-00278-B]
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Deadlines as to Abelardo Castellon, Edgar Paredes Sanchez, Jorge Escobar Mejia, Kainor Antoinio Nichol Castellon ( Unseal deadline set for 2/12/2024) (srd) [1:23-mj-00278-B]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Abelardo Castellon (1), Edgar Paredes Sanchez (2), Jorge Escobar Mejia (3), Kainor Antoinio Nichol Castellon (4). (srd) (srd). [1:23-mj-00278-B]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (11/14/2023) Affidavit
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
Arrest of Abelardo Castellon, Edgar Paredes Sanchez, Jorge Escobar Mejia, Kainor Antoinio Nicolas Castellon in U.S. District Court Southern District of Florida (Miami). (jmr) [1:23-mj-00278-B]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
6 6 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Abelardo Castellon, Edgar Paredes Sanchez, Jorge Escobar Mejia, Kainor Antoinio Nicolas Castellon from U.S. District Court Southern District of Florida (Miami) (jmr) [1:23-mj-00278-B]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Removal of Complaint,
Att: 2 Minute Order re Abelardo Castellon,
Att: 3 WAIVER of Rule 5 & 5.1 Hearings re Abelardo Castellon,
Att: 4 Minute Order re Edgar Paredes Sanchez,
Att: 5 Waiver of Rule 5 & 5.1 Hearings re Edgar Paredes Sanchez,
Att: 6 Minute Order re Jorge Escobar Mejia,
Att: 7 Waiver of Rule 5 re Jorge Escobar Mejia,
Att: 8 Minute Order re Kainor Antoinio Nicolas,
Att: 9 Waiver of Rule 5 re Kainor Antoinio Nicolas,
Att: 10 Commitment to Another District re Abelardo Castellon,
Att: 11 Commitment to Another District re Edgar Paredes Sanchez,
Att: 12 Commitment to Another District re Jorge Escobar Mejia,,
Att: 13 Commitment to Another District re Kainor Antoinio Nicolas Castellon,
Att: 14 Notice of Criminal Transfer to Southern District of AL of Rule 5
Monday, November 27, 2023
7 7 INDICTMENT as to Abelardo Castellon (1) counts 1, 2; Edgar Paredes Sanchez (2) counts 1, 2; Jorge Escobar Mejia (3) counts 1, 2; Kainor Antoinio Nicolas Castellon (4) counts 1, 2. (cmj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Penalty Page,
Att: 2 Signed Indictment