North Carolina Middle District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00373
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Nov 30, 2023 2:34 AM EST
Defendant
EDWARD JOSE BELL (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
NICOLE R. DUPRE
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/30/2023 3:07 AM EST
Friday, November 17, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT as to EDWARD JOSE BELL (1). (at) [1:23-mj-00497-LPA]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD in case as to EDWARD JOSE BELL. (at) [1:23-mj-00497-LPA]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
3 3 INDICTMENT as to EDWARD JOSE BELL (1) count(s) 1. (at)
Related: [-]