California Northern District Court
Judge:Donna M Ryu
Case #: 4:23-cv-06155
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Nov 28, 2023
Last checked: Sunday May 26, 2024 1:57 AM PDT
Defendant
Wisp, Inc.
Represented By
Garner F. Kropp
Fenwick & West LLP
contact info
Kevin Liu
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Jay L. Pomerantz
Fenwick & West
contact info
Tyler Griffin Newby
Fenwick & West LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
K. S. B.
Represented By
David S. Almeida
Almeida Law Group LLC
contact info
John R. Parker, Jr.
Almeida Law Group LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
B. C.
Represented By
David S. Almeida
Almeida Law Group LLC
contact info
John R. Parker, Jr.
Almeida Law Group LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
M. D.
Represented By
David S. Almeida
Almeida Law Group LLC
contact info
John R. Parker, Jr.
Almeida Law Group LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
A. F.
Represented By
David S. Almeida
Almeida Law Group LLC
contact info
John R. Parker, Jr.
Almeida Law Group LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
A. W.
Represented By
David S. Almeida
Almeida Law Group LLC
contact info
John R. Parker, Jr.
Almeida Law Group LLC
contact info

GPO Mar 14 2024
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 19 change in Defendant's Counsel. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/14/2024. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2024)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 07/31 11:21 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by K. S. B., B. C., M. D., A. F., A. W. (Parker, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
23 23 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 06/28 1:52 PM
ORDER: the Case Management Conference previously set on 7/3/2024 is VACATED. By no later than 7/31/2024, the parties shall file either a dismissal or a joint status report that states whether they have executed a written settlement agreement. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/28/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Joint Case Management Statement Fri 06/28 10:09 AM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by K. S. B., B. C., M. D., A. F., A. W.. (Parker, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
21 21 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Thu 06/27 9:41 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f)(2), Civil Local Rules 16-9 and 16-10(d), and Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu's Standing Order, the parties' Joint Case Management Statement was due to be filed by 6/26/24. The parties have not yet filed a Joint Case Management Statement. Therefore, they shall file a Joint Case Management Statement by no later than 5:00 p.m. P.T. on 6/28/24. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
20 20 order Stipulation and Order Thu 03/14 3:32 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 19 change in Defendant's Counsel. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/14/2024. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
19 19 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Mon 03/11 2:55 PM
STIPULATION of Change in Counsel and [Proposed] Order filed by Wisp, Inc.. (Newby, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
18 18 minutes 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Case Referred to Private ADR ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/07 2:12 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/6/2024 by Zoom Videoconference. Case referred to Private ADR. ADR deadline to be set at the next case management conference. Updated joint Case Management Conference Statement due by 6/26/2024. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/3/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Close of Fact Discovery due by 3/3/2025. Deadline to file Motion for Class Certification: 4/7/2025. Deadline to file Motions for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions: 10/10/2025. All counsel and parties may access the webinar information (public hearings) at https://cand.uscourts.gov/judges/ryu-donna-m-dmr/ . Digital Recording Time: Zoom Webinar Time 1:40-1:53. Attachment: Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/6/2024) Modified on 3/7/2024 (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Private ADR Thu 03/07 2:27 PM
CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (cmf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
17 17 oth_evt 1 - Terminate Hearings Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Fri 03/01 1:58 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference is set for 3/6/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
16 16 misc Case Management Statement Wed 02/28 4:55 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by K. S. B., B. C., M. D., A. F., A. W.. (Parker, John)
Related: [-]
15 15 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Wed 02/28 9:56 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Liu, Kevin)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 02/28 9:52 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wisp, Inc... (Liu, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
13 13 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Wed 02/14 3:43 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Parker, John)
Related: [-]
12 12 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Wed 02/14 10:58 AM
SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 2/28/2024. (kc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
11 11 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Tue 01/30 10:54 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 2/13/2024. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
10 10 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 01/29 3:53 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Wisp, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Mathew Swartz, Other Affiliate WELL Health Technologies Corporation for Wisp, Inc.. (Liu, Kevin)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/29 3:32 PM
DEFENDANT WISP, INC.S ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wisp, Inc.. (Liu, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
8 8 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 12/18 11:19 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by K. S. B., B. C., M. D., A. F., A. W... (Parker, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Wed 12/13 2:22 PM
CLERK'S FIRST NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 12/27/2023 . (jlg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 12/05 6:50 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by B. C., K. S. B., A. F., M. D., A. W.. Service waived by Wisp, Inc. waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. (Almeida, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 11/29 9:21 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/28/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/6/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 11/29 9:17 PM
Summons Issued as to Wisp, Inc.. (sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 11/29 10:30 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/13/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Parker, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against WISP, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18876874.). Filed by K.S.B.,, B.C.,, A.F.,, M.D.,, A.W.,.(Parker, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet