New York Southern District Court
Judge:John P Cronan
Referred: Valerie Figueredo
Case #: 1:23-cv-10463
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause28:1331fl Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Case Filed:Nov 30, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday May 28, 2024 4:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Wilfredo Garcia
Represented By
Stephen D. Hans
Stephen D. Hans & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
O.E. Contracting Solutions LLC
Represented By
Stephen D. Hans
Stephen D. Hans & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos
Represented By
James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
contact info
Avraham Y. Scher
Helen F. Dalton & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Helen F. Dalton & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz
Represented By
James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
contact info
Avraham Y. Scher
Helen F. Dalton & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Helen F. Dalton & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca
Represented By
James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
contact info
Avraham Y. Scher
Helen F. Dalton & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Helen F. Dalton & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez
Represented By
James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
contact info
Avraham Y. Scher
Helen F. Dalton & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Helen F. Dalton & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez
Represented By
James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
contact info
Avraham Y. Scher
Helen F. Dalton & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Helen F. Dalton & Associates, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
40 40 service Affidavit of Service Other Tue 04/29 10:49 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of 1.Certificate of Default against Wilfredo Garcia, entered April 25, 2025; 2.Certificate of Default against O.E. Contracting Solutions LLC, entered April 25, 2025; 3.Affirmation in Support of Plaintiffs' Request for Certificate of Default as to Wilfredo Garcia; and 4.Affirmation in Support of Plaintiffs' Request for Certificate of Default as to O.E. Contracting Solutions LLC served on O.E. CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS LLC and WILFREDO GARCIA, as an individual, on 04/29/2025. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos(individually), Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz(individually), Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca(individually), Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez(individually), Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez(individually)..(Avshalumov, Roman)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
39 39 misc Clerk's Certificate of Default Fri 04/25 3:25 PM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to defendant Wilfredo Garcia. (tp)
Related: [-]
38 38 misc Clerk's Certificate of Default Fri 04/25 3:20 PM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to defendant O.E. Contracting Solutions LLC. (tp)
Related: [-]
37 37 respoth Affirmation in Support (non-motion) Fri 04/25 12:29 PM
AFFIRMATION of Roman Avshalumov in Support re:36 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,,,. Document filed by Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos(individually), Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz(individually), Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca(individually), Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez(individually), Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez(individually)..(Avshalumov, Roman)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default Fri 04/25 12:28 PM
PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos(individually), Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz(individually), Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca(individually), Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez(individually), Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez(individually)..(Avshalumov, Roman) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)
Related: [-]
35 35 respoth Affirmation in Support (non-motion) Fri 04/25 12:27 PM
AFFIRMATION of Roman Avshalumov in Support re:34 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,,,. Document filed by Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos(individually), Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz(individually), Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca(individually), Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez(individually), Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez(individually)..(Avshalumov, Roman)
Related: [-]
34 34 misc Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default Fri 04/25 12:26 PM
PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos(individually), Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz(individually), Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca(individually), Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez(individually), Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez(individually)..(Avshalumov, Roman) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default Fri 04/25 11:38 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney Roman Avshalumov. RE-FILE Document No. 30 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default 31 Affirmation in Support. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the proposed clerk's certificate of default does not list the name(s) for the party(ies) who accepted service; The clerk's certificate needs to list the order number the defendants are in default of. Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default found under the event list Proposed Orders - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct PDF that - lists the correct filed date of the complaint, lists the correct name(s) of the party(ies) who was/were served, lists the correct date the party(ies) was/were served, lists the correct filed date of the proof of service. Refile the Affirmation separately using Other Answers, Affirmation in support (non-motion). (km)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default Fri 04/25 11:40 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney Roman Avshalumov. RE-FILE Document No. 32 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default 33 Affirmation in Support. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the proposed clerk's certificate of default does not list the name(s) for the party(ies) who accepted service; The clerk's certificate needs to list the order number the defendants are in default of. Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default found under the event list Proposed Orders - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct PDF that - lists the correct filed date of the complaint, lists the correct name(s) of the party(ies) who was/were served, lists the correct date the party(ies) was/were served, lists the correct filed date of the proof of service. Refile the Affirmation using Other Answers, Affirmation in support (non-motion). (km)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
33 33 respoth Affirmation in Support (non-motion) Thu 04/24 4:36 PM
AFFIRMATION of Roman Avshalumov in Support re:32 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,,,. Document filed by Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos(individually), Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz(individually), Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca(individually), Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez(individually), Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez(individually)..(Avshalumov, Roman)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default Thu 04/24 4:35 PM
PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos(individually), Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz(individually), Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca(individually), Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez(individually), Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez(individually)..(Avshalumov, Roman) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)
Related: [-]
31 31 respoth Affirmation in Support (non-motion) Thu 04/24 4:34 PM
AFFIRMATION of Roman Avshalumov in Support re:30 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,,,. Document filed by Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos(individually), Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz(individually), Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca(individually), Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez(individually), Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez(individually)..(Avshalumov, Roman)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default Thu 04/24 4:33 PM
PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos(individually), Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz(individually), Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca(individually), Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez(individually), Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez(individually)..(Avshalumov, Roman) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
29 29 order Memo Endorsement Fri 04/11 4:38 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:27 Letter filed by Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos, Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz, Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez, Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca, Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff is directed to request a certificate of default by April 25, 2025. Plaintiff's deadline to move for default judgment will be 30 days after the entry of default, if any. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 4/11/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
28 28 service Affidavit of Service Other Thu 04/10 4:29 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of 1. Letter requesting the Court 2 weeks to file Requests for Certificates of Default against all Defendants, dated April 10, 2025. served on O.E. CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS LLC and WILFREDO GARCIA, as an individual, on 04/10/2025. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos(individually), Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz(individually), Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca(individually), Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez(individually), Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez(individually)..(Avshalumov, Roman)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Letter Thu 04/10 3:43 PM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo from Roman Avshalumov dated April 10, 2025 re: Requesting two weeks to file Requests for Certificates of Default against ALL Defendants. Document filed by Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos(individually), Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz(individually), Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca(individually), Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez(individually), Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez(individually)..(Avshalumov, Roman)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
26 26 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/17 3:23 PM
ORDER: Defendants are again advised that a corporate entity such as O.E. Contracting Solutions LLC cannot appear pro se. Defendants are warned that failure to retain counsel to represent O.E. Contracting Solutions LLC in this matter may result in the entry of a defThe Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail this order to Defendants at the address Defendants' former counsel provided at ECF No. 24.ault judgment against the corporate entity. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 3/17/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
misc Mail Order by USPS Mon 02/24 9:48 AM
Mailed a copy of25 Order, to O.E. CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS LLC at 350 Thieriot Ave, Bronx, NY 10473. (aqd)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order Mon 02/24 9:35 AM
ORDER: Defendant O.E. Contracting Solutions LLC has not updated the Court regarding its search for new counsel. Defendant O.E. Contracting Solutions LLC is directed to file a status update by March 11, 2025. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail this order to O.E. Contracting Solutions LLC at the address Defendant's former counsel provided at ECF No. 24. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 2/21/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
24 24 misc Letter Wed 12/11 11:51 AM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo from Stephen D. Hans dated December 11, 2024 re: Mailing Address for Defendant. Document filed by O.E. Contracting Solutions LLC, Wilfredo Garcia..(Hans, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 12/02 3:16 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The motion for Stephen D. Hans to withdraw as attorney is hereby GRANTED. Mr. Hans is directed to provide the Court with a mailing address for Defendant Wilfredo Garcia and to also provide a copy of this order to Mr. Garcia and O.E. Contracting Solutions LLC. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 21. Defendant O.E. Contracting Solutions LLC cannot remain unrepresented in this case as corporate entities cannot appear pro se. O.E. Contracting Solutions LLC is warned that the failure to obtain new counsel can result in a default and the entry of a default judgment. By January 3, 2025, O.E. Contracting Solutions LLC and/or Mr. Garcia is directed to inform the Court as to whether O.E. Contracting Solutions LLC has obtained new counsel to represent it in this matter. Attorney Stephen D Hans terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 12/2/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 12/02 11:58 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo: Telephone Conference held on 12/2/2024. (sjo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 10/23 1:47 PM
ORDER A telephonic conference is hereby scheduled for Monday, December 2, 2024 at 11:30 a.m. to address the motion to withdraw as attorney at ECF No. 21. Stephen D. Hans and a representative of the Defendant company with authority/supervision over this litigation are directed to appear for this conference and call Judge Figueredo's Teams conference line at the scheduled time. Please dial (646) 453-4442; access code [977 195 691#]. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 12/2/2024 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 10/23/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
21 21 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 10/21 11:56 AM
FIRST MOTION for Stephen D. Hans to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by O.E. Contracting Solutions LLC, Wilfredo Garcia..(Hans, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Declaration in Support
Thursday, August 08, 2024
20 20 order Case Management Plan Thu 08/08 1:42 PM
REPORT OF RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE AND CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: In accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) and Judge Figueredo's Individual Practices, the parties met on 8/5/24 (at least one week before the Initial Case Management Conference) and exchanged communications thereafter. The parties now submit the following report for the Court's consideration: The parties jointly propose to the Court the following discovery plan: The parties anticipate that the trial of this case will require 5-7 days. The parties do not consent to a trail before a Magistrate Judge at this time. The parties request a jury trial. Amended Pleadings due by 10/5/2024. Deposition due by 1/15/2024. Fact Discovery due by 3/5/2025. Ready for Trial by 3/12/2025. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 8/8/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
19 19 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Tue 08/06 3:25 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos(individually), Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz(individually), Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca(individually), Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez(individually), Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez(individually)..(Schillaci, Katelyn)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order Mon 07/15 2:16 PM
ORDER: Counsel for the parties are directed to confer to discuss the matters set forth in Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The parties are directed to complete the Report of Rule 26(f) Meeting and Proposed Case Management Plan, at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-valerie-figueredo, and file it on ECF by no later than Tuesday, August 6, 2024. Counsel who disagree about the dates or other terms of the proposed schedule shall submit a joint letter briefly explaining the dispute. The parties shall discuss whether they consent to conduct all proceedings, including a trial, before the undersigned Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). If all parties consent, they shall complete the Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge form available on the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-valerie-figueredo and file such form with the Court. This Order is not meant to interfere in any way with the parties' absolute right to have dispositive motions and/or a trial before a United States District Judge, but is merely an attempt at preserving scarce judicial resources and reminding the parties of their option pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 7/15/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
17 17 misc Letter Fri 07/12 2:33 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo from Katelyn Schillaci dated July 12, 2024 re: status report. Document filed by Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos(individually), Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz(individually), Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca(individually), Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez(individually), Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez(individually)..(Schillaci, Katelyn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order Tue 07/02 4:16 PM
ORDER: The Parties are directed to submit a status update on this matter by July 12, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 7/2/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 07/01 5:07 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This action is referred to the Honorable Valerie Figueredo for the following purposes: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 7/1/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
adr Mediation Conference Not Held Thu 06/20 10:01 AM
MEDIATION CONFERENCE NOT HELD Mediation Conference scheduled for 06/20/2024 was not held. Mediation Status due by 7/8/2024.(sni)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/28 3:57 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katelyn Marie Schillaci on behalf of Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos(individually), Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz(individually), Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Schillaci, Katelyn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Tue 05/07 4:01 PM
SUBSEQUENT MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 6/20/2024 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(sni)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
adr Mediation Conference Not Held Fri 05/03 10:43 AM
MEDIATION CONFERENCE NOT HELD Mediation Conference scheduled for 5/3/2024 was not held. Mediation Status due by 5/20/2024.(sge)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Fri 03/29 10:59 AM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 5/3/2024 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(sge)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 02/13 8:34 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Wilfredo Garcia served on 2/2/2024, answer due 2/23/2024. Service was accepted by Danny Duclet. Document filed by Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Avshalumov, Roman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit WILFREDO GARCIA
Thursday, February 08, 2024
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Thu 02/08 3:31 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 3/11/2024.(sge)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
11 11 misc Status Report Fri 02/02 4:09 PM
MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 2/22/2024. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 10/9/2020) (rpr)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/02 2:18 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,. Document filed by Wilfredo Garcia, O.E. Contracting Solutions LLC..(Hans, Stephen)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/02 2:13 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Wilfredo Garcia, O.E. Contracting Solutions LLC..(Hans, Stephen)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/02 2:07 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen D. Hans on behalf of Wilfredo Garcia, O.E. Contracting Solutions LLC..(Hans, Stephen)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Deleted Document Mon 02/05 8:47 AM
***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 11 STATUS REPORT. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (kj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/21 9:06 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. O.E. Contracting Solutions LLC served on 12/13/2023, answer due 1/3/2024. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty. Document filed by Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Avshalumov, Roman)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 12/01 3:31 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wilfredo Garcia, O.E. Contracting Solutions LLC..(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 12/01 1:46 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 12/01 1:46 PM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 12/01 1:47 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Fri 12/01 1:47 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Roman Mikhail Avshalumov. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez, Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz, Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos, Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez, Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Fri 12/01 1:47 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Roman Mikhail Avshalumov re: Document No. 1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Add Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez, Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz, Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos, Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez, Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca to CM ECF with the party text "on behalf of all others similarly situated". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Add Party for Pleading Fri 12/01 2:04 PM
ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos, Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez, Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz, Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez, Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca, Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez, Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz, Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca, Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez, Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos added. Party added pursuant to1 Complaint,.Document filed by Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos, Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez, Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz, Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez, Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca, Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez, Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz, Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca, Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez, Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos. Related document:1 Complaint,..(Avshalumov, Roman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/30 1:06 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Avraham Y. Scher on behalf of Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos, Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz, Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca, Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez, Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez..(Scher, Avraham)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/30 1:03 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Patrick Peter O'Donnell on behalf of Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos, Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz, Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca, Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez, Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez..(O'Donnell, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 11/30 1:00 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to O.E. CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS LLC and WILFREDO GARCIA, as an individual, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos, Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz, Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca, Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez, Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez..(Avshalumov, Roman)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 11/30 12:57 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Avshalumov, Roman)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 11/30 12:54 PM
COMPLAINT against Wilfredo Garcia, O.E. Contracting Solutions LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28631153)Document filed by Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez, Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz, Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos, Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez, Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca..(Avshalumov, Roman)
Related: [-]