Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Reed C O'Connor
Case #: 4:23-cv-01204
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Nov 30, 2023
Terminated:Apr 02, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 28, 2024 3:56 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
Howmet Aerospace Inc.
Represented By
C Scott Jones
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Chase Tyler Cobb
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Mark E McDonald
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Thomas G Yoxall
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Leila Mgaloblishvili
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamiltonllp
contact info
Victor L Hou
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
RTI Advanced Forming, Inc.
Represented By
C Scott Jones
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Chase Tyler Cobb
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Mark E McDonald
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Thomas G Yoxall
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Leila Mgaloblishvili
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamiltonllp
contact info
Victor L Hou
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By
Micah Randall Prude
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Christopher J Mandernach
Williams & Connolly
contact info
Jacob Levi Burnett
Williams & Connolly LLP
contact info
Joseph G. Petrosinelli
Williams & Connolly LLP
contact info
Kimberly Broecker
Williams & Connolly
contact info
J Andrew Keyes
Williams & Connolly LLP
contact info
Sara Kernan Babineaux
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Defendant
Howmet Aerospace Inc.
Represented By
C Scott Jones
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Chase Tyler Cobb
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Mark E McDonald
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Thomas G Yoxall
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Leila Mgaloblishvili
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamiltonllp
contact info
Victor L Hou
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Defendant
RTI Advanced Forming, Inc.
Represented By
C Scott Jones
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Chase Tyler Cobb
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Mark E McDonald
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Thomas G Yoxall
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Leila Mgaloblishvili
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamiltonllp
contact info
Victor L Hou
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Mediator
ADR Provider
Represented By
Jeff Kaplan
Jams
contact info
Plaintiff
Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By
Micah Randall Prude
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Christopher J Mandernach
Williams & Connolly
contact info
Jacob Levi Burnett
Williams & Connolly LLP
contact info
Joseph G. Petrosinelli
Williams & Connolly LLP
contact info
Kimberly Broecker
Williams & Connolly
contact info
J Andrew Keyes
Williams & Connolly LLP
contact info
Sara Kernan Babineaux
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info

GPO Dec 04 2023
ORDER: Before the Court is the parties Joint Notice Regarding Proposed Briefing Schedule (ECF No. 13). Defendants shall file their opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order by December 7, 2023 at 12:00 p.m. Eastern Time. Plaintiff shall file its reply in support of its Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order by December 8, 2023. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/4/2023) (saw)

Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
97 97 misc Stipulation Tue 04/02 9:44 PM
Agreed STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Howmet Aerospace Inc., RTI Advanced Forming, Inc.. (Yoxall, Thomas)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case (Optional) Wed 04/03 9:41 AM
Civil Case Terminated per97 Stipulation of Dismissal. Pursuant to LR 79.2 and LCrR 55.2, exhibits may be claimed during the 60-day period following final disposition (to do so, follow the procedures found at[LINK:Exhibit Guide] ). The clerk will discard exhibits that remain unclaimed after the 60-day period without additional notice. (Clerk to notice any party not electronically noticed.) (bdb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
96 96 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Fri 03/29 10:27 AM
ORDER: Before the Court is the parties' Joint Status Report and Joint Motion to Amend (ECF No.95 ). The Court GRANTS the extension. Accordingly, the parties are ORDERED to file the appropriate settlement papers by no later than April 2, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/29/2024) (saw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
95 95 motion Amend/Correct Thu 03/28 7:43 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct March 29, 2024 Deadline to File Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation (Prude, Micah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order