Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Philip R Lammens
Referred: Philip R Lammens
Case #: 5:23-cv-00692
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Case Filed:Nov 30, 2023
Terminated:Jul 18, 2024
Case in other court:Fifth Judicial Circuit, 2023-CA-000501
Last checked: Tuesday May 28, 2024 4:25 AM EDT
Defendant
Mohamed Ahmed
Represented By
Jeffrey R. Benson
Luks Santaniello Petrillo & Jones, LLC
contact info
Defendant
MGA Logistics, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey R. Benson
Luks Santaniello Petrillo & Jones, LLC
contact info
Anthony J. Petrillo
Luks Santaniello Petrillo & Jones, LLC
contact info
Defendant
IIA Logistics, LLC
Mediator
Gregory P. Holder
Represented By
Gregory P. Holder
Zinober Diana & Monteverde, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Barry C. Taylor
Represented By
Joseph Alexander Lao
Lowman Law Firm
contact info
Brent M. Lowman
Lowman Law Firm
contact info
John D. McBride
Lowman Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, July 19, 2024
43 43 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 07/19 9:32 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JOS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
42 42 1 pgs order Order Thu 07/18 12:53 PM
ORDER. Pursuant to Local Rule 3.09(b) of the Middle District of Florida, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that this cause is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice subject to the right of any party to re-open the action within sixty (60) days, upon good cause shown, or to submit a stipulated form of final order or judgment. The Clerk is directed to close the case and to terminate any pending motions as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 7/18/2024. (JWM)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
41 41 notice Notice of settlement Mon 07/15 12:27 PM
NOTICE of settlement by Barry C. Taylor (Lowman, Brent)
Related: [-]
40 40 notice Notice (Other) Mon 07/15 12:25 PM
NOTICE by Barry C. Taylor Cancellation of Mediation (Lowman, Brent)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
39 39 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Thu 07/11 10:04 AM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 10/31/2024 at 9:00 a.m. before Gregory P. Holder. (Lowman, Brent)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
38 38 notice Notice (Other) Tue 06/11 12:50 PM
NOTICE by Barry C. Taylor of Cancellation of mediation (Lowman, Brent)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
37 37 respoth Reply to affirmative defenses Mon 06/10 12:09 PM
REPLY to32 Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Barry C. Taylor. (Lowman, Brent) Modified on 6/10/2024 to edit text (ELM)
Related: [-]
36 36 respoth Reply to affirmative defenses Mon 06/10 12:08 PM
REPLY to33 Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Barry C. Taylor. (Lowman, Brent) Modified on 6/10/2024 to edit text (ELM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
35 35 service Summons issued Tue 06/04 2:26 PM
SUMMONS issued as to IIA Logistics, LLC. (LSS)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
34 34 service Proposed summons Mon 06/03 3:42 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Barry C. Taylor. (Lowman, Brent)
Related: [-]
33 33 answer Answer to amended complaint Mon 06/03 1:59 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to 30 Second Amended Complaint by MGA Logistics, LLC.(Benson, Jeffrey) Modified text on 6/3/2024 (MJT)
Related: [-]
32 32 answer Answer to amended complaint Mon 06/03 1:58 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to 30 Second Amended Complaint by Mohamed Ahmed.(Benson, Jeffrey) Modified text on 6/3/2024 (MJT)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
31 31 service Proposed summons Mon 05/20 3:19 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Barry C. Taylor. (Lowman, Brent)
Related: [-]
30 30 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 05/20 3:02 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Barry C. Taylor.(Lowman, Brent)
Related: [-]
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Mon 05/20 2:11 PM
ORDER granting 28 Motion to Amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 5/20/2024. (JWM)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
28 28 motion Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Mon 05/13 1:14 PM
Second MOTION to Amend Complaint by Barry C. Taylor.(Lowman, Brent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
27 27 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Tue 04/09 12:08 PM
AMENDED NOTICE of Agreed Mediation Conference to be held on 07/10/2024 before Gregory P. Holder. (Lowman, Brent) Modified text on 4/9/2024 (BD)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Mon 01/29 8:27 AM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 09/05/2024 at 1:30 p.m. before Gregory P. Holder. (Lowman, Brent)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order Appointing Mediator/Scheduling Mediation Fri 01/26 4:04 PM
ORDER appointing Gregory P. Holder as mediator in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 1/26/2024. (MJT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
24 24 adr Notice of selection of mediator Tue 01/23 3:47 PM
NOTICE OF SELECTION of Gregory P. Holder as mediator by Barry C. Taylor. (Lowman, Brent)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
23 23 3 pgs order Order referring case to mediation Fri 01/19 3:53 PM
ORDER referring case to mediation. The parties have 14 days to select a mediator and notify the Court of their selection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 1/19/2024. (MJT)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Case Management Scheduling Order Fri 01/19 3:51 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/29/2024, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 9/27/2024, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 10/28/2024, Conduct mediation hearing by 11/11/2024, Discovery due by 1/13/2025, Dispositive motions due by 2/10/2025, Motions in Limine due by 4/3/2025, Joint Final Pretrial statement due by 4/10/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2025 at 10:00 AM in Ocala Courtroom 1 A before Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. Jury Trial set for 5/5/2025 at 09:00 AM in Ocala Courtroom 1 A before Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 1/19/2024. (MJT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
21 21 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 01/18 3:20 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:23-cv-692-PRL. Judge James S. Moody, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (LMF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 01/17 3:29 PM
ORDER approving consent to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 1/17/2024. (SMB)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 01/17 1:43 PM
PROPOSED CONSENT to trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge by MGA Logistics, LLC. (Benson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
18 18 respoth Reply to affirmative defenses Wed 01/10 8:10 AM
REPLY to affirmative defenses by Barry C. Taylor. (Lowman, Brent)
Related: [-]
17 17 respoth Reply to affirmative defenses Wed 01/10 8:09 AM
REPLY to affirmative defenses by Barry C. Taylor. (Lowman, Brent)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
16 16 order Order Tue 01/09 3:02 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: The parties have indicated in their Case Management Report (Dkt. 15 ) that they will consent to a Magistrate Judge. The parties shall file the completed Form AO 85 "Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge" no later than January 23, 2024. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 1/9/2024. (SMB)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Case Management Report Tue 01/09 2:12 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Benson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/09 2:11 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Mohamed Ahmed.(Benson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/09 2:09 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by MGA Logistics, LLC.(Benson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of appearance Tue 12/19 4:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Alexander Lao on behalf of Barry C. Taylor (Lao, Joseph)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Jury demand Tue 12/19 4:48 PM
DEMAND for trial by jury by Barry C. Taylor. (Lowman, Brent)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 12/19 4:46 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Brent M. Lowman on behalf of Barry C. Taylor. Lead Counsel: Brent M. Lowman. (Lowman, Brent)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of a Related Action Tue 12/19 4:44 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Barry C. Taylor. Related case(s): Yes (Lowman, Brent)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of a Related Action Mon 12/18 3:49 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by MGA Logistics, LLC. Related case(s): No (Benson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/18 3:47 PM
NOTICE by MGA Logistics, LLC of Consent to Magistrate Judge (Benson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Mon 12/18 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jeffrey R. Benson on behalf of MGA Logistics, LLC. Lead Counsel: Jeffrey R. Benson. (Benson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 12/01 2:31 PM
NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LD)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 12/01 8:45 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SMB)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 12/01 8:44 AM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SMB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 11/30 4:33 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:23-cv-00692-JSM-PRL. (AM)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 11/30 3:40 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fifth Judicial Circuit, case number 23-CA-000501 filed in State Court on 03/22/2023. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-21514857 filed by MGA Logistics, LLC.(Benson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 5 State Court COMPLAINT Amended Complaint,
Att: 6 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 7 State Court Other Documents,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet