Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Paul Sala
Case #: 2:23-bk-08639
Case Filed:Nov 30, 2023
Dismissed:Dec 15, 2023
Terminated:Jan 23, 2024

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$50,001 to $100,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
ARCITERRA COMPANIES, LLC, Debtor
Attn: Gerald Shelley 2394 E. Camelback Rd., Ste. 600
Phoenix, AZ 85016
Represented By
GERALD L. SHELLEY
Fennemore Craig, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE 230 NORTH FIRST AVENUE SUITE 204
PHOENIX, AZ 85003


Docket last updated: 24 minutes ago
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
20 20 court Close Bankruptcy Case (ALL) (DISMISSED) Tue 01/23 11:57 AM
The case having been dismissed; IT IS ORDERED that the case is closed and if a trustee has been appointed, the trustee is discharged from and relieved of his trust. Judge Paul Sala (WES)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
19 19 vCal Virtual Minute Entry Mon 12/18 8:33 AM
Minutes of Hearing held on: 01/10/2024 Subject: CHAPTER 11 STATUS CONFERENCE TATUS Appearances: NONE Proceedings: VACATED: CASE DISMISSED. (vCal Hearing ID (1605831)). Related [+](MMK)
Related: [-] 6
Friday, December 15, 2023
18 18 court zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE) Sun 12/17 10:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal Order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order Dismissing Case
17 17 order oDismissing Case - VAN Form Fri 12/15 8:38 AM
ORDER Dismissing Case Debtor Related [+] . (WES)
Related: [-] 14 Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules and Statements
Friday, December 08, 2023
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 12/10 10:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules and Statements
15 15 court 2Set Missing Filings Deadlines Fri 12/08 11:24 AM
Master Mailing List due by 12/14/2023, (WES)
Related: [-]
14 14 order oExtend Time to File Schedules and Statements (Motion to) Fri 12/08 11:24 AM
ORDER Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules and Statements Related [+] signed on 12/8/2023 Schedules/Statements due by 12/28/2023, Master Mailing List due by 12/14/2023 . (WES)
Related: [-] 11
13 13 order oJoint Administration Fri 12/08 9:18 AM
ORDER Granting Motion for Joint Administration Related [+] signed on 12/8/2023 . (WES)
Related: [-] 9
Thursday, December 07, 2023
12 12 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Thu 12/07 10:03 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by Stacy Porche of Fennemore Craig, P.C. on behalf of ARCITERRA COMPANIES, LLC Related [+].(Porche, Stacy)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules and Statements
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
11 11 3 pgs motion Extend Time to File Schedules and Statements (Motion to) Thu 12/07 9:58 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules and Statements and Creditor Master Mailing List filed by Stacy Porche of Fennemore Craig, P.C. on behalf of ARCITERRA COMPANIES, LLC Related [+]. (Porche, Stacy)
Related: [-] 3 Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)
10 10 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Thu 12/07 3:22 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by GERALD L. SHELLEY of FENNEMORE CRAIG, P.C. on behalf of ARCITERRA COMPANIES, LLC Related [+].(SHELLEY, GERALD)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Joint Administration
9 9 3 pgs motion Joint Administration (Motion for) Thu 12/07 3:19 PM
Motion for Joint Administration MOTION FOR JOINT ADMINISTRATION WITH CASE 2:23-BK-08640-DPC filed by GERALD L. SHELLEY of FENNEMORE CRAIG, P.C. on behalf of ARCITERRA COMPANIES, LLC. (SHELLEY, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 12/06 10:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order Setting Chapter 11 Status Conference
7 7 notice Appearance (Notice of) Mon 12/04 3:12 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by BENJAMIN WILLIAM REEVES of Snell & Wilmer LLP on behalf of Argent Institutional Trust Company.(REEVES, BENJAMIN)
Related: [-]
6 6 order oChapter 11 Status Conference (BKM/MCW/PS Form) Mon 12/04 7:52 AM
ORDER Setting Chapter 11 Status Conference signed on 12/4/2023 Status Hearing set for 1/10/2024 at 11:00 AM at 230 N. First Ave., Crtrm 601, Phoenix, AZ (PS) . (MMK)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 12/03 10:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)
4 4 notice Appearance (Notice of) Fri 12/01 8:43 AM
Notice of Appearance & Request for Notices filed by EDWARD K. BERNATAVICIUS of UNITED STATES TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE.(BERNATAVICIUS, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form) Fri 12/01 8:08 AM
Deficiency Notice to Debtor and Attorney for Debtor That All Required Documents Were Not Filed. (ETS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 11 (Business) Thu 11/30 7:31 PM
Meeting of Creditors scheduled for 1/2/2024 at 09:00 AM as a Telephonic Hearing (341). (EMD)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs other 2Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (1738.00 fee) Thu 11/30 5:02 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual, Schedules and Statements (except for those listed below). Failure to timely upload the list of creditors, may result in dismissal of the case without further notice. Electronic Filing Declaration due 12/21/2023, Master Mailing due 12/7/2023, Schedules A/B-J due 12/14/2023. Statement of Financial Affairs due 12/14/2023, Attorney Disclosure Statement due 12/14/2023, Chapter 11 Statement of Current Monthly Income due by 12/14/2023, Payment Advices Declaration Required by 11 USC Section 521(a)(1)(B)(iv) due by 12/14/2023, filed by GERALD L. SHELLEY of FENNEMORE CRAIG, P.C. on behalf of ARCITERRA COMPANIES, LLC (SHELLEY, GERALD)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment Thu 11/30 5:04 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:2:23-bk-08639] ) [other,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A36140941. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]