Illinois Southern District Court
Case #: 4:96-cr-40071
Case Filed:Sep 12, 1996
Terminated:Oct 24, 1997
Defendant
Charles Gunn
Defendant
Eric R Lee
Defendant
Ivan Williamson
Defendant
Kenneth A Valliant
Defendant
Lajail Berry
Defendant
Lonnie Davis
Defendant
Lonnie McKinnie
Plaintiff
USA

GPO Jul 21 2008
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION as to Lonnie McKinnie, denying 192 MOTION for Retroactive Application of Sentencing Guidelines to Crack Cocaine Offense 18 USC 3582 filed by Lonnie McKinnie. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/21/08. (dka, )
GPO May 13 2009
JUDGMENT FOR REVOCATION OF PROBATION/SUPERVISED RELEASE as to Lajail Berry. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 5/13/09. (bkl)
GPO Jul 30 2009
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER as to Lajail Berry (5), Count(s) 1,3 DENYING 215 PRO SE MOTION for Retroactive Application of Sentencing Guidelines to Crack Cocaine Offense 18 USC 3582 filed by Lajail Berry. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/30/09. (djs, )


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.