North Carolina Middle District Court
Judge:Thomas D Schroeder
Referred: Joi Elizabeth Peake
Case #: 1:23-cv-01047
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Dec 01, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday May 29, 2024 4:33 AM EDT
Defendant
ARA AUTO SALES
Defendant
SAUDIA SEKANDARI
Plaintiff
BIANCA HIGHSMITH-PROPST
221 CHESTERTON WAY APT 1
WINSTON SALEM, NC 27104


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Saturday, April 26, 2025
37 37 misc Status Report Sat 04/26 2:33 PM
STATUS REPORT JOINT with Plaintiff by ARA AUTO SALES, SAUDIA SEKANDARI. (VAUGHAN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
36 36 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Wed 04/02 8:07 AM
ORDER that Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration (Doc.34 ) is DENIED. Signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 04/02/2025. (at)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
utility Motions Submitted Thu 03/13 10:05 AM
Motions Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER-:34 MOTION for Reconsideration re33 MEMORANDUM ORDER. (ae)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
35 35 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 02/24 10:56 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re34 MOTION for Reconsideration re33 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,, filed by BIANCA HIGHSMITH-PROPST filed by ARA AUTO SALES, SAUDIA SEKANDARI. Replies due by 3/10/2025(VAUGHAN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh A - Retail Installment Contact and Security Agreement
Thursday, February 06, 2025
34 34 9 pgs motion Reconsideration Thu 02/06 12:39 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re33 MEMORANDUM ORDER, by BIANCA HIGHSMITH-PROPST. Response to Motion due by 2/27/2025. (at)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
33 33 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 01/30 9:27 AM
MEMORANDUM ORDER that Defendants' motions (Docs.10 ,28 ), construed as motions to compel arbitration, are GRANTED to that extent only, and that pursuant to 9 U.S.C. § 4, the parties are DIRECTED to proceed to arbitration in accordance with the terms of the Retail Installment Contract and Security Agreement. FURTHER ORDERED that this action is STAYED pending the resolution of arbitration in accordance with the parties' arbitration agreement. FURTHER ORDERED that Highsmith-Propst's motions to amend the complaint (Docs.15 ,26 ) are DENIED AS MOOT. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report of arbitration every ninety (90) days and notify the court of any arbitration award within seven (7) days after arbitration has concluded. Signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 01/30/2025. (at)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
utility Motions Submitted Fri 01/24 7:38 AM
Motions Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER:28 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue ,26 MOTION to Amend Complaint. (ae)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
32 32 6 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 01/09 12:55 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition to28 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue , filed by BIANCA HIGHSMITH-PROPST. Replies due by 1/23/2025. (lg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
31 31 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 01/02 2:00 PM
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff BIANCA HIGHSMITH-PROPST, to Response to26 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by BIANCA HIGHSMITH-PROPST. (at)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
30 30 misc Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond Thu 12/19 12:38 PM
Roseboro Letter as to Plaintiff BIANCA HIGHSMITH-PROPST. Re28 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue by ARA AUTO SALES, SAUDIA SEKANDARI. (at)
Related: [-]
29 29 respm Brief Thu 12/19 10:53 AM
BRIEF re28 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Defendants ARA AUTO SALES, SAUDIA SEKANDARI filed by ARA AUTO SALES, SAUDIA SEKANDARI.(VAUGHAN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh A - Retail Installment Contact and Security Agreement
28 28 motion Dismiss Thu 12/19 10:50 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue by ARA AUTO SALES, SAUDIA SEKANDARI. Response to Motion due by 1/9/2025 (VAUGHAN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
27 27 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 12/19 10:45 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re26 MOTION to Amend/Correct Order,,,,,, filed by BIANCA HIGHSMITH-PROPST filed by ARA AUTO SALES, SAUDIA SEKANDARI. Replies due by 1/2/2025 (VAUGHAN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 12/11 4:06 PM
Set Deadlines re26 MOTION to Amend/Correct. Response to Motion due by 12/27/2024. (cb)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
26 26 motion Amend/Correct Fri 12/06 2:06 PM
MOTION to Amend Complaint by BIANCA HIGHSMITH-PROPST. (at)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Amended Complaint
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
minutes Motion Hearing Tue 12/03 12:01 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER in WS-2: Motion Hearing held on 12/3/2024 on15 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff Bianca Highsmith-Propst appeared Pro se. Attorney James Vaughan appeared on behalf of Defendants. If Plaintiff wishes to pursue her claims, she must file a new motion for leave to file an amended complaint with the amended complaint attached as an exhibit by COB Friday, December 6, 2024. Defendants are directed to respond as appropriate within the time under the rules. If no new motion for leave is filed by 12/6/2024, Defendants are to respond within 14 days to15 First Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint addressing the proposed amended complaint which was stricken. If Plaintiff decides she no longer wishes to pursue her case, she may file a stipulation of dismissal. For the reasons stated from the bench,22 Motion to Strike is DENIED. (Court Reporter Briana Chesnut.) (ae)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Strike Tue 12/03 12:03 PM
ORAL ORDER issued by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 12/3/2024. For the reasons stated from the bench,22 MOTION to Strike10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim is DENIED. (ae)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
25 25 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 12/02 12:39 PM
**STRICKEN** AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by BIANCA HIGHSMITH-PROPST.(at) Modified on 12/2/2024 to mark stricken per 12/2/2024 Text Order. (ae)
Related: [-]
order Order Mon 12/02 2:56 PM
TEXT ORDER issued by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 12/2/2024. Plaintiff has filed two documents purporting to be amended complaints without court approval. (Docs.17 ,25 .) Neither was filed within the time provided by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a) allowing Plaintiff to file them as of right. Therefore, an amended complaint can only be filed as an attachment to a proper motion. Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2); Local Rule 7.3 (j) (noting that a motion to amend does not require a brief in support). An amended complaint can be filed on the docket as a separate entry only if the court allows the motion to amend. Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2). While Plaintiff proceeds pro se , she must nevertheless follow the applicable Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and this court's local rules (which can be found on this courts public website). Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(f), the court sua sponte STRIKES both amended complaints (Docs.17 ,25 ). If Plaintiff seeks to amend her original complaint, she should file a motion to amend, with a copy of the proposed amended complaint attached as an exhibit. That way, any party wishing to respond to the motion to amend may do so within the time allowed by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Currently, the only motion to amend a complaint is Docket Entry15 . If Plaintiff intends to seek to file yet another proposed amended complaint, she should do so promptly, with the proposed amended complaint attached. SO ORDERED.(ae)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
24 24 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 11/26 12:15 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re22 MOTION to Strike10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by BIANCA HIGHSMITH-PROPST filed by ARA AUTO SALES, SAUDIA SEKANDARI. Replies due by 12/10/2024 (VAUGHAN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
23 23 respm Brief Fri 11/22 1:53 PM
BRIEF re22 MOTION to Strike10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim . (at)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Strike Fri 11/22 1:52 PM
MOTION to Strike10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by BIANCA HIGHSMITH-PROPST. Response to Motion due by 12/13/2024. (at)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
21 21 respm Brief Wed 11/20 12:40 PM
BRIEF re20 MOTION to Object to Attorney Representing Defendants due to Failure to File Notice of Appearance. (at)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 11/20 12:39 PM
MOTION to Object to Attorney Representing Defendants due to Failure to File Notice of Appearance by BIANCA HIGHSMITH-PROPST. Response to Motion due by 12/11/2024. (at)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Hearing Wed 11/20 12:37 PM
MOTION for Pretrial Hearing Prior to Motion Hearing by BIANCA HIGHSMITH-PROPST. Response due 12/11/2024. (at)
Related: [-]
order Order Filed for Hearing Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 11/20 3:35 PM
TEXT ORDER issued by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 11/20/2024. Plaintiff filed19 MOTION for Pretrial Hearing Prior to Motion Hearing and20 MOTION to Object to Attorney Representing Defendants due to Failure to File Notice of Appearance, citing the North Carolina Rules of Civil Procedure. This action is pending in federal court, and the North Carolina Rules of Civil Procedure are not applicable in this court. Even so, both motions are without merit and are DENIED.(ae)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 11/18 12:01 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2024 at 10:00 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #2 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. (ae)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
utility Motions Submitted Mon 09/09 10:50 AM
Motions Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER:10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim ,15 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (ae)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
17 17 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 08/20 9:18 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by BIANCA HIGHSMITH-PROPST.(at)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit AR-1,
Att: 2 Exhibit WS-1,
Att: 3 Exhibit N-1
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
16 16 respm Brief Wed 08/14 2:02 PM
BRIEF re15 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. (at)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Leave to File Document Wed 08/14 2:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by BIANCA HIGHSMITH-PROPST. Response to Motion due by 9/4/2024. (at)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
14 14 respm Brief Fri 08/02 1:51 PM
BRIEF re13 Response in Opposition to Motion. (at)
Related: [-]
13 13 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 08/02 1:51 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition (Entitled: Objection to Motion to Dismiss) re10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by SAUDIA SEKANDARI, ARA AUTO SALES filed by BIANCA HIGHSMITH-PROPST. Replies due by 8/16/2024. (at)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
12 12 misc Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond Tue 07/16 3:51 PM
Roseboro Letter as to Plaintiff BIANCA HIGHSMITH-PROPST. Re10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by ARA AUTO SALES, SAUDIA SEKANDARI. (at)
Related: [-]
11 11 respm Brief Tue 07/16 3:20 PM
BRIEF re10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim .(VAUGHAN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh A - Retail Installment Contact and Security Agreement
10 10 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 07/16 3:18 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by ARA AUTO SALES, SAUDIA SEKANDARI. Response to Motion due by 8/6/2024 (VAUGHAN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
9 9 service USMS Return Executed Wed 07/10 10:39 AM
USMS Return Executed for Complaint, Summons, Order, Notice served on ARA AUTO SALES, SAUDIA SEKANDARI on 07/01/2024, Answer due 07/22/2024. (at)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
misc Receipt of Funds Mon 06/24 1:18 PM
Receipt of Funds in the amount of $ 50.00., Receipt #4775. (at)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
misc Receipt of Funds Thu 05/16 4:28 PM
Receipt of Funds in the amount of $ 100.00. Receipt #4467. (lg)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Right to Consent Fri 05/03 10:02 AM
Notice of Right to Consent. USMS shall serve the attached form on all parties.(at)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent form
7 7 service Summons Issued Fri 05/03 10:01 AM
Summons Issued as to ARA AUTO SALES, SAUDIA SEKANDARI. (Copy of Complaint, Order, Summons delivered to USMS for delivery) (at)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order Wed 04/10 12:30 PM
ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 04/10/2024, that Plaintiff is responsible for preparing and delivering to the Clerk, the correct summons for service on each defendant, including the correct address and the name and title of the individual to be served on behalf of a corporation, association, infant, incompetent or government agency. Failure to prepare and deliver said summons within 30 days from the filing of this order shall result in this case being dismissed without further notice. The U.S. Marshal shall serve the summons and complaint upon defendants. Under Rule 4(m), the time for service is extended to July 9, 2024. (at)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
misc Receipt of Funds Fri 04/05 7:55 AM
Receipt of Funds in the amount of $ 100.00., Receipt #4183. (at)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
misc Receipt of Funds Fri 02/23 2:09 PM
Receipt of Funds in the amount of $ 100.00., Receipt #3872. (at)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Judge Fri 02/23 2:19 PM
CASE REFERRED RE: Receipt of Funds, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (at)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
5 5 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Application to Proceed IFP Wed 01/31 10:08 AM
ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 01/30/2024, that Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis [Doc. #1 ] is GRANTED to the extent set out above, and Plaintiff is hereby permitted to proceed in this action in forma pauperis, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a), but as a condition of further proceeding, Plaintiff must pay $350.00 to the Clerk toward the filing fee in installments set out below or this action will be dismissed without further notice to her. Plaintiff shall within 60 days from the date of this Order make payments of $100.00, and mustpay $50.00 per month thereafter until the $350.00 filing fee has been paid, or this action will be dismissed without further notice to her. This case is stayed for 60 days to allow Plaintiff to pay the initial payment. If Plaintiff elects not to make the payments, the case will be dismissed without prejudice.(lg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
utility Case Assigned Tue 12/05 1:52 PM
Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (al)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Tue 12/05 2:02 PM
Motions Referred to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE RE:1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP. (al)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Signed Pro Se Electronic Service Consent Mon 12/04 4:41 PM
Notice of Signed Pro Se Electronic Service Consent by BIANCA HIGHSMITH-PROPST biancabryan2012@yahoo.com (al)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 12/04 4:39 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (al)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
2 2 cmp Complaint Mon 12/04 4:39 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by BIANCA HIGHSMITH-PROPST. (al)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 EXHIBIT A,
Att: 2 EXHIBIT B,
Att: 3 EXHIBIT C,
Att: 4 EXHIBIT D,
Att: 5 EXHIBIT E,
Att: 6 EXHIBIT F,
Att: 7 EXHIBIT G,
Att: 8 EXHIBIT H,
Att: 9 EXHIBIT I,
Att: 10 EXHIBIT J,
Att: 11 EXHIBIT K,
Att: 12 EXHIBIT L,
Att: 13 EXHIBIT M
1 1 motion Application to Proceed IFP Mon 12/04 4:32 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by BIANCA HIGHSMITH-PROPST. (al)
Related: [-]