Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-13701

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Vincent F Papalia
Case #: 2:23-ap-01370
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Nov 30, 2023
Terminated:May 12, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Feras Jaloudi, Defendant
23 Allison Drive
Englewood cliffs, NJ 07632
Represented By
Feras Jaloudi
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Radiology Center, LLC, Plaintiff
Represented By
Nancy Isaacson
Greenbaum, Rowe, Smith & Davis, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
21 21 6 pgs order Order (Generic) Mon 05/12 4:20 PM
Stipulation and Consent Order resolving issues between and among Wayne Radiology Center, Co. and Feras Jaloudi Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 5/12/2025. (jf)
Related: [-] 20 Application re: for Entry of Stipulation and Consent Order Filed by Wayne Radiology Center, LLC.Objection deadline is 5/7/2025. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Consent Order) filed by Counter-Defendant Wayne Radiology Center, LLC, Plaintiff Wayne Radiology Center, LLC
utility Reopen AP Case Mon 05/12 4:17 PM
Adversary Case Reopened (jf)
Related: [-]
utility Close Adversary Case Mon 05/12 4:21 PM
Adversary Case 23-01370 VFP) Closed. (jf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
20 20 motion Application (Generic) - Only use if no other event is applicable Wed 04/30 7:06 PM
Application re: for Entry of Stipulation and Consent Order Filed by Wayne Radiology Center, LLC.Objection deadline is 5/7/2025. (Isaacson, Nancy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stipulation and Consent Order
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
court Hearing Withdrawn (Document) Tue 04/29 3:59 PM
Trial Withdrawn, Stipulation of Dismissal filed Related [+] (jf)
Related: [-] 15 Joint Scheduling Order. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 7/12/2024. Discovery due by 12/31/2024. Trial date set for 3/19/2025 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark.
utility Close Adversary Case Tue 04/29 4:30 PM
Adversary Case (2:23-ap-1370) Closed. (jf)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
19 19 misc Stipulation Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Mon 04/28 1:55 PM
Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding filed by Nancy Isaacson on behalf of Wayne Radiology Center, LLC. (Isaacson, Nancy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
18 18 court Determination of Adjournment Request Tue 03/18 12:50 PM
Determination of Adjournment Request Granted. Trial will be adjourned to April 30, 2025 at 10:00am. The hearing date is Not Peremptory. Related [+] (jf)
Related: [-] 15 Joint Scheduling Order
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Tue 03/18 12:51 PM
Trial Rescheduled from 3/19/2025. Related [+] Trial date set for 04/30/2025 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (jf)
Related: [-] 15 Joint Scheduling Order. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 7/12/2024. Discovery due by 12/31/2024.
Sunday, July 14, 2024
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 07/15 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 07/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 07/15 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 07/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
15 15 order Joint Scheduling Order Fri 07/12 12:00 PM
Joint Scheduling Order. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 7/12/2024. Discovery due by 12/31/2024. Trial date set for 3/19/2025 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (jf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
14 14 order Mediation Order Fri 07/12 11:56 AM
Mediation Order. Morris S. Bauer (Mediator) added to the case. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 7/11/2024. (jf)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held Thu 07/11 3:10 PM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Joint Mediation Order and Joint Scheduling Order Submitted Related [+] (mcp)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued to Wayne Radiology Center, LLC for Service on Feras Jaloudi Answer due on 1/3/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 2/8/2024 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Attachments: #1 Pre Trial Instructions)
Thursday, June 27, 2024
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 06/27 2:40 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 6/27/2024 Related [+]
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued to Wayne Radiology Center, LLC for Service on Feras Jaloudi Answer due on 1/3/2024 Pre-Trial Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2024 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mcp
Thursday, June 13, 2024
court Hearing Held and Continued Thu 06/13 5:22 PM
Minute of Hearing Held and Continued from 6/13/2024 OUTCOME: Joint Scheduling and Mediation Order to be Submitted Related [+] Pre-Trial Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2024 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mcp)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued to Wayne Radiology Center, LLC for Service on Feras Jaloudi Answer due on 1/3/2024
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
court Hearing Held Tue 05/14 2:08 PM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Order to be Submitted Related [+] (mcp)
Related: [-] 6 Motion re: to Dismiss Counterclaim Filed by Wayne Radiology Center, LLC.Hearing scheduled for 3/5/2024 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Mehreen Choudry #2 Exhibit A #3 Exhibit B #4 Exhibit C #5 Exhibit D #6 Exhibit E #7 Exhibit F #8 Exhibit G #9 Exhibit I #10 Exhibit J #11 Exhibit K #12 Exhibit L #13 Memorandum of Law #14 Proposed Order) Filed by Counter-Defendant Wayne Radiology Center, LLC, Plaintiff Wayne Radiology Center, LLC
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Tue 05/14 2:08 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 5/14/2024 Related [+]
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued to Wayne Radiology Center, LLC for Service on Feras Jaloudi Answer due on 1/3/2024 Pre-Trial Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2024 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mcp
Monday, May 13, 2024
13 13 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Mon 05/13 3:16 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by David M. Eskew on behalf of Feras Jaloudi. (Eskew, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Fri 04/19 2:14 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 4/30/2024 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2024 at 11:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (rah)
Related: [-] 6 Motion re: to Dismiss Counterclaim Filed by Wayne Radiology Center, LLC
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Fri 04/19 2:15 PM
Pre-Trial Hearing Rescheduled from 4/30/2024 Related [+] Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 05/14/2024 at 11:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (rah)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued to Wayne Radiology Center, LLC for Service on Feras Jaloudi
Sunday, March 24, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 03/25 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/24/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
utility Terminate Document Fri 03/22 12:15 PM
Reason: Motion granted (jf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 03/22 12:12 PM
Order granting Trustee's Motion to Intervene and scheduling Deadlines for Intervention and further responses to Motion of Wayne Radiology Center to Dismiss the Debtor/Defendant's Counterclaims Related [+] filed by Counter-Defendant Wayne Radiology Center, LLC, Plaintiff Wayne Radiology Center, LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/21/2024. (jf)
Related: [-] 3 Motion re: to Intervene as Counter-Claimant in the Adversary Proceeding Filed by Jeffrey A. Lester, the chapter 7 trustee for Feras Jaloudi and Hudson River Radiology Center, LLC.; AND6 Motion re: to Dismiss Counterclaim Filed by Wayne Radiology Center, LLC.
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
10 10 answer Response Tue 03/19 10:36 AM
Response to Related [+] filed by Kimberly J. Salomon on behalf of Jeffrey A. Lester, the chapter 7 trustee for Feras Jaloudi and Hudson River Radiology Center, LLC. (Salomon, Kimberly)
Related: [-] 6 Motion re: to Dismiss Counterclaim Filed by Wayne Radiology Center, LLC.Hearing scheduled for 3/5/2024 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Mehreen Choudry # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit I # 10 Exhibit J # 11 Exhibit K # 12 Exhibit L # 13 Memorandum of Law # 14 Proposed Order) filed by Counter-Defendant Wayne Radiology Center, LLC, Plaintiff Wayne Radiology Center, LLC
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
court Hearing Held Tue 03/05 2:31 PM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Granted, Without Prejudice Related [+] (mcp)
Related: [-] 3 Motion re: to Intervene as Counter-Claimant in the Adversary Proceeding Filed by Jeffrey A. Lester, the chapter 7 trustee for Feras Jaloudi and Hudson River Radiology Center, LLC.Hearing scheduled for 2/7/2024 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jeffrey A. Lester in Support #2 Memorandum of Law #3 Proposed Order #4 Certificate of Service) Filed by Trustee Jeffrey A. Lester, the chapter 7 trustee for Feras Jaloudi and Hudson River Radiology Center, LLC
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Tue 03/05 2:32 PM
Hearing Held and Continued from 3/5/2024 Related [+] Filed by Counter-Defendant Wayne Radiology Center, LLC, Plaintiff Wayne Radiology Center, LLC)bHearing scheduled for 04/30/2024 at 11:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mcp)
Related: [-] 6 Motion re: to Dismiss Counterclaim Filed by Wayne Radiology Center, LLC.
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Tue 03/05 2:36 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 3/5/2024 Related [+]
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued to Wayne Radiology Center, LLC for Service on Feras Jaloudi Answer due on 1/3/2024 Pre-Trial Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2024 at 11:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mcp
Friday, March 01, 2024
9 9 misc Exhibit Fri 03/01 3:48 PM
Exhibit Related [+] filed by Karina Pia Lucid on behalf of Feras Jaloudi. (Lucid, Karina)
Related: [-] 8 Response filed by Counter-Claimant Feras Jaloudi, Defendant Feras Jaloudi
Att: 1 Exhibit B
Att: 2 Exhibit C
Att: 3 Exhibit D
Att: 4 Exhibit E
Att: 5 Exhibits F & G
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
8 8 answer Response Tue 02/27 10:20 PM
Response to Related [+] filed by Karina Pia Lucid on behalf of Feras Jaloudi. (Lucid, Karina)
Related: [-] 6 Motion re: to Dismiss Counterclaim Filed by Wayne Radiology Center, LLC.Hearing scheduled for 3/5/2024 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Mehreen Choudry # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit I # 10 Exhibit J # 11 Exhibit K # 12 Exhibit L # 13 Memorandum of Law # 14 Proposed Order) filed by Counter-Defendant Wayne Radiology Center, LLC, Plaintiff Wayne Radiology Center, LLC
Att: 1 Certification of Feras Jaloudi in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss
Thursday, February 08, 2024
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 02/15 9:50 AM
Pre-Trial Hearing Rescheduled from 2/8/20024 Related [+] Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 03/05/2024 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (jf)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued to Wayne Radiology Center, LLC for Service on Feras Jaloudi Answer due on 1/3/2024 (Attachments: #1 Pre Trial Instructions)
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Wed 02/07 9:29 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Nancy Isaacson on behalf of Wayne Radiology Center, LLC. (Isaacson, Nancy)
Related: [-] 6 Motion re: to Dismiss Counterclaim Filed by Wayne Radiology Center, LLC.Hearing scheduled for 3/5/2024 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Mehreen Choudry # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit I # 10 Exhibit J # 11 Exhibit K # 12 Exhibit L # 13 Memorandum of Law # 14 Proposed Order) filed by Counter-Defendant Wayne Radiology Center, LLC, Plaintiff Wayne Radiology Center, LLC
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
6 6 motion Motion (Generic) - Only use if no other event is applicable Tue 02/06 6:18 PM
Motion re: to Dismiss Counterclaim Filed by Wayne Radiology Center, LLC.Hearing scheduled for 3/5/2024 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Isaacson, Nancy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 8 pgs Certification of Mehreen Choudry
Att: 2 6 pgs Exhibit A
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit B
Att: 4 Exhibit C
Att: 5 Exhibit D
Att: 6 Exhibit E
Att: 7 5 pgs Exhibit F
Att: 8 42 pgs Exhibit G
Att: 9 9 pgs Exhibit I
Att: 10 2 pgs Exhibit J
Att: 11 2 pgs Exhibit K
Att: 12 6 pgs Exhibit L
Att: 13 Memorandum of Law
Att: 14 2 pgs Proposed Order
Friday, February 02, 2024
5 5 court Determination of Adjournment Request Fri 02/02 3:51 PM
Determination of Adjournment Request Granted. Hearing will be adjourned to 3/5/2024 @ 10:00am. The hearing date is Not Peremptory. Related [+] (jf)
Related: [-] 3 Motion (Generic) filed by Trustee Jeffrey A. Lester, the chapter 7 trustee for Feras Jaloudi and Hudson River Radiology Center, LLC
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Fri 02/02 3:53 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 2/7/2024 Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 03/05/2024 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (jf)
Related: [-] 3 Motion re: to Intervene as Counter-Claimant in the Adversary Proceeding Filed by Jeffrey A. Lester, the chapter 7 trustee for Feras Jaloudi and Hudson River Radiology Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jeffrey A. Lester in Support #2 Memorandum of Law #3 Proposed Order #4 Certificate of Service) Filed by Trustee Jeffrey A. Lester, the chapter 7 trustee for Feras Jaloudi and Hudson River Radiology Center, LLC
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
4 4 answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim Tue 01/23 8:20 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by Karina Pia Lucid on behalf of Feras Jaloudi, Counterclaim by Karina Pia Lucid on behalf of Feras Jaloudi against Wayne Radiology Center, LLC . (Lucid, Karina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
3 3 motion Motion (Generic) - Only use if no other event is applicable Thu 01/11 1:06 PM
Motion re: to Intervene as Counter-Claimant in the Adversary Proceeding Filed by Jeffrey A. Lester, the chapter 7 trustee for Feras Jaloudi and Hudson River Radiology Center, LLC.Hearing scheduled for 2/7/2024 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Salomon, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Jeffrey A. Lester in Support
Att: 2 Memorandum of Law
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
Monday, December 04, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 12/04 12:27 PM
Summons Issued to Wayne Radiology Center, LLC for Service on Feras Jaloudi Answer due on 1/3/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 2/8/2024 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (dlr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pre Trial Instructions
Thursday, November 30, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/30 11:24 PM
Adversary case 23-01370 Complaint by Wayne Radiology Center, LLC, Feras Jaloudi against Feras Jaloudi. Fee Amount $ 350.. Nature of Suits:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other),62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud),67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny),68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury),41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))), (Isaacson, Nancy)
Related: [-]