California Northern District Court
Judge:Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Case #: 3:23-cv-06211
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Dec 01, 2023
Terminated:Nov 12, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday May 29, 2024 1:18 AM PDT
Defendant
Amazon.com Services, LLC
Represented By
Megan M. Cooney
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Katie Magallanes
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jennifer Roges
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Monay Jones
Represented By
Walter Haines
United Employees Law Group
contact info
Lisa Rose Brevard
The Markham Law Firm
contact info
Maggie Realin
Cohelan Khoury & Singer
contact info
David Roger Markham
The Markham Law Firm
contact info
Maggie K. Realin
The Markham Law Firm
contact info
Isam Charles Khoury
Cohelan Khoury & Singer
contact info
Michael David Singer
Cohelan Khoury & Singer
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Ridgway
Represented By
Walter Haines
United Employees Law Group
contact info
Lisa Rose Brevard
The Markham Law Firm
contact info
Maggie Realin
Cohelan Khoury & Singer
contact info
David Roger Markham
The Markham Law Firm
contact info
Maggie K. Realin
The Markham Law Firm
contact info
Isam Charles Khoury
Cohelan Khoury & Singer
contact info
Michael David Singer
Cohelan Khoury & Singer
contact info


Docket last updated: 88 minutes ago
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
39 39 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 11/12 8:55 AM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin GRANTING 38 Stipulation to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of California.(amolc1, COURTSTAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Tue 11/12 12:14 PM
Remark: Case transferred from California Northern has been opened in EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA as case 1:24-cv-01378, filed 11/12/2024. (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
38 38 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 11/07 4:00 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Transfer Action to the Eastern District of California Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) re37 Order to Show Cause, Terminate Hearings filed by Amazon.com Services, LLC. (Magallanes, Katie) Modified on 11/8/2024 (kmm2, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
37 37 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause 1 - Terminate Hearings Thu 10/24 2:35 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE TRANSFERRED. Show Cause Response due by 11/8/2024. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on October 24, 2024. (amolc1, COURTSTAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
36 36 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Tue 10/22 3:44 PM
Clerk's Notice RE Zoom Instructions for Plaintiff's Counsel Only. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2024 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco/ Videoconference before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1603329440?pwd=OW1ZZWlZcklySHBMcStTVDZvZDJoUT09] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at amocrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than November 5, 2024 at 12:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
35 35 2 pgs order Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Tue 10/22 11:55 AM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting 34 Administrative Motion for Remote Appearance at November 7, 2024 Hearing.(amolc1, COURTSTAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
34 34 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Mon 10/21 4:19 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Remote Appearance re23 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Action filed by Monay Jones, Matthew Ridgway. Responses due by 10/25/2024. Related [+]
Related: [-] alin, Maggie
Att: 1 Declaration of Maggie Realin,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Leave for Remote Appearance at November 7, 2024 Hearing,
Att: 3 Certificate/Proof of Service
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
33 33 oth_evt 1 - Terminate Hearings Clerk's Notice Continuing Motion Hearing ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Tue 06/11 12:02 PM
Clerk's Notice Continuing Motion Hearing.23 Motion to Dismiss or Stay Action Hearing set for 11/7/2024 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
32 32 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 05/20 5:28 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amazon.com Services, LLC re31 Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Stay Action (Roges, Jennifer) Modified on 5/21/2024 (kmm2, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
31 31 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Mon 05/20 2:47 PM
REPLY in Support of (23 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Action ) filed byAmazon.com Services, LLC. (Cooney, Megan) Modified on 5/21/2024 (kmm2, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-] 23 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Action
Monday, April 29, 2024
30 30 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Mon 04/29 2:29 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re29 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byMonay Jones, Matthew Ridgway. Related [+]
Related: [-] 29 alin, Maggie
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Proposed Order,
Att: 5 Certificate/Proof of Service
29 29 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Mon 04/29 2:22 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byMonay Jones, Matthew Ridgway.
Related: [-] 23 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Action alin, Maggie
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
28 28 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 03/27 3:23 PM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting as modified 27 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference and Set Briefing Schedule. Response to motion to dismiss or stay due by 4/29/2024. Reply due by 5/20/2024. Within 7 days of the Court's ruling on the motion to dismiss or stay, the parties shall submit a stipulation and proposed order with two suggested dates for a case management conference.(amolc1, COURTSTAFF)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 03/27 12:23 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference and Set Briefing Schedule filed by Amazon.com Services, LLC., Monay Jones, Matthew Ridgway (Magallanes, Katie) Modified on 3/29/2024 (kmm2, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
26 26 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Wed 03/27 11:38 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RE DOCKET NO. 39 in case no. 4:21-cv-02147-HSG. The court has reviewed the motion and determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
25 25 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 03/25 4:30 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amazon.com Services, LLC re24 Request for Judicial Notice,,23 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Cooney, Megan)
Related: [-]
24 24 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Mon 03/25 4:28 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re23 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byAmazon.com Services, LLC. Related [+] (Cooney, Megan)
Related: [-] 23
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Exhibit N,
Att: 15 Proposed Order
23 23 motion Dismiss Mon 03/25 4:22 PM
MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Amazon.com Services, LLC. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 7/11/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. Responses due by 4/8/2024. Replies due by 4/15/2024.(Cooney, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Megan Cooney,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/25 4:15 PM
NOTICE by Amazon.com Services, LLC re20 Notice (Other) Supplemental Notice of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Cooney, Megan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
21 21 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 03/13 5:03 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Amazon.com Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com, Inc. for Amazon.com Services, LLC. (Cooney, Megan)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/13 4:58 PM
NOTICE by Amazon.com Services, LLC of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Cooney, Megan)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
19 19 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 03/08 10:58 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Monay Jones, Matthew Ridgway. Related [+]
Related: [-] alin, Maggie
Att: 1 Exhibit A - PAGA Notice,
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 02/14 1:33 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Maggie Realin for Counsel for Plaintiffs Related [+]
Related: [-] alin, Maggie
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/14 1:28 PM
NOTICE of Association of Counsel for Plaintiffs by Monay Jones, Matthew Ridgway (Singer, Michael) Modified text on 2/14/2024 to conform to filing (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/26 10:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Roges (Roges, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/26 10:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Megan M. Cooney (Cooney, Megan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
14 14 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 01/24 8:05 AM
ORDER GRANTING 13 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines. Case Management Statement due by noon on 4/4/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on January 24, 2024. (amolc1, COURTSTAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
13 13 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 01/23 3:41 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines filed by Amazon.com Services, LLC. (Magallanes, Katie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
12 12 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Thu 12/28 1:47 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint to Extend Time to Respond filed by Amazon.com Services, LLC. (Magallanes, Katie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 12/20 1:07 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Monay Jones, Matthew Ridgway. Amazon.com Services, LLC served on 12/19/2023, answer due 1/9/2024. (Markham, David)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Certificate/Proof of Service Wed 12/20 9:52 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monay Jones, Matthew Ridgway re1 Complaint,5 Summons Issued (Markham, David)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Wed 12/20 1:02 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety as Summons Returned Executed. Re: 10 Certificate of Service filed by Monay Jones, Matthew Ridgway (sfb, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Mon 12/18 8:34 AM
Clerk's Notice on Reassignment. You are noticed that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Martinez-Olguin's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at[LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/martinez-olguin-araceli-amo/] . This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 3/14/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 12/15 12:24 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 12/15/2023.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Fri 12/15 11:03 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 12/15 9:11 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Monay Jones, Matthew Ridgway.. (Markham, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 12/01 2:50 PM
Summons Issued as to Amazon.com Services, LLC. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 12/01 2:41 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 2/22/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/29/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 12/01 12:21 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/15/2023. (cjl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Fri 12/01 11:55 AM
Proposed Summons. (Markham, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 12/01 11:51 AM
COMPLAINT against Amazon.com Services LLC ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-18893467.). Filed by Monay Jones, Matthew Ridgway.(Markham, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet