Connecticut District Court
Judge:Sarala V Nagala
Referred: Thomas O Farrish
Case #: 3:23-cv-01579
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Dec 01, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday May 29, 2024 4:18 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Acme Markets, Inc.
Represented By
Michael D Kaminski
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Jeanne Gills
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Richard Spencer Montei
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Ariba Ahmad
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
This, LLC
Represented By
Bryan Louis Wein
Gilbride, Tusa, Last, & Spellane LLC
contact info
Todd S. Sharinn
Tannenbaum Helpern Syracuse & Hirschtritt LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ya Lan Yang
Represented By
Michael M Ahmadshahi
Ahmadshahi Law Offices
contact info
Kevin Ebrahim Dehghani
Kevin E. Dehghani, Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Acme Markets, Inc.
Represented By
Michael D Kaminski
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Jeanne Gills
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Richard Spencer Montei
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Ariba Ahmad
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Defendant
John Does
Defendant
ABC Corporations
Defendant
Stop & Shop Supermarket Co LLC
Represented By
Seth R. Klein
Izard Kindall & Raabe
contact info
John Gary Maynard, III
Hunton Andrews Kurth
contact info
Craig A. Raabe
Izard, Kindall & Raabe LLP
contact info
Michael R Shebelskie
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Matthew Joseph Ricciardi
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Defendant
HolaBelle, Inc.
Represented By
Michael M Ahmadshahi
Ahmadshahi Law Offices
contact info
Kevin Ebrahim Dehghani
Kevin E. Dehghani, Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Todd Glonek
Represented By
Michael M Ahmadshahi
Ahmadshahi Law Offices
contact info
Kevin Ebrahim Dehghani
Kevin E. Dehghani, Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
This, LLC
Gilbride, Tusa, Last & Spellane LLC 986 Bedford Street
Stamford, CT 06905
Represented By
Bryan Louis Wein
Gilbride, Tusa, Last, & Spellane LLC
contact info
Todd S. Sharinn
Tannenbaum Helpern Syracuse & Hirschtritt LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Vons Companies, Inc.
Terminated: 02/02/2024
Represented By
Michael D Kaminski
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Jeanne Gills
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Richard Spencer Montei
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Ariba Ahmad
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc.
Terminated: 02/02/2024
Represented By
Seth R. Klein
Izard Kindall & Raabe
contact info
John Gary Maynard, III
Hunton Andrews Kurth
contact info
Craig A. Raabe
Izard, Kindall & Raabe LLP
contact info
Michael R Shebelskie
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Matthew Joseph Ricciardi
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Defendant
Safeway, Inc.
Terminated: 02/02/2024
Represented By
Michael D Kaminski
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Jeanne Gills
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Richard Spencer Montei
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Ariba Ahmad
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kings Food Markets
Terminated: 02/23/2024
Represented By
Michael D Kaminski
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Jeanne Gills
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Richard Spencer Montei
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Ariba Ahmad
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Defendant
Balducci's Food Lover's Market
Terminated: 02/23/2024
Represented By
Michael D Kaminski
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Jeanne Gills
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Richard Spencer Montei
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Ariba Ahmad
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Defendant
Albertsons Companies, Inc.
Terminated: 02/02/2024
Represented By
Michael D Kaminski
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Jeanne Gills
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Richard Spencer Montei
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Ariba Ahmad
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info

GPO Jun 12 2024
ORDER denying without prejudice 19 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. For the reasons described in the attached order, the HolaBelle Defendants' motion to dismiss is DENIED without prejudice to refiling following a ninety-day period of jurisdictional and venue-related discovery, which shall end on September 10, 2024. Following the period of jurisdictional discovery, the HolaBelle Defendants must either answer the amended complaint or renew their motion to dismiss by September 24, 2024. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 6/12/2024. (Parfenoff, I)
GPO Nov 22 2024
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 144 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 11/22/24. (Wood, R.)
GPO Feb 20 2025
ORDER granting 187 Joint Motion for Stipulated Preliminary Injunction. The terms of the injunction are outlined in the attached order. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 2/20/2025. (Vo, C)
GPO Mar 27 2025
November 10, 2025.All further deadlines are set forth in the attached scheduling order. Note that some of the dates in the scheduling order differ from those proposed by the parties' Rule 26(f) Report. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 3/27/2025. (Vo, C)SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial disclosures due by April 11, 2025. Discovery due by November 3, 2025. Dispositive motions due by December 1, 2025. Initial Status Report due by August 1, 2025. Second Status Report due by
GPO Mar 27 2025
ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY ORDER. The parties shall abide by the terms of the attached order. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 3/27/2025. (Vo, C)

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
211 211 utility Calendar Entry Wed 04/02 3:43 PM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Settlement Conference is set for 6/9/2025 at 10:00 a.m. in Magistrate Judge Courtroom, 4th Floor, Room 435, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge S. Dave Vatti. (Ellis, B)
Related: [-]
210 210 minutes Status Conference Wed 04/02 3:40 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge S. Dave Vatti: Status Conference held on 4/2/2025. Total Time: 11 minutes. Plaintiff shall submit a damages analysis and initial settlement demand by May 27, 2025. Defendants Holabelle, Yang and Glonek shall submit a rebuttal along with an initial settlement offer to plaintiff by June 3, 2025. These materials shall not be filed on the docket and are to be exchanged between counsel only. Supplemental ex parte memos are due to the Court by June 4, 2025. The required content for the memos and the email address to which the memos are to be submitted are contained in the Settlement Conference Order at ECF 116 . (Ellis, B)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
209 209 utility Calendar Entry Thu 03/27 2:12 PM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. A pre-settlement telephonic status conference between Plaintiff and Defendants HolaBelle, Inc., Ya Lan Yang, and Todd Glonek has been set for 4/2/2025 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge S. Dave Vatti. The purpose of the call is to discuss scheduling and any information exchange/discovery necessary to make the conference most meaningful. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. As the Court will require parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend the settlement conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next ninety days and have their own calendars available to aid in scheduling. If either counsel/party develops a firm, unavoidable conflict on 4/2/2025 at 2:00 p.m., s/he should not file a motion for continuance but rather should call Chambers (203) 579-5593 as soon as possible with opposing counsel on the line to work out an alternate day and time for the pre-settlement telephonic status conference. Parties should dial 646-828-7666 , to connect to the conference Meeting ID: 160 724 3835 , and enter Passcode: 734597 . (Ellis, B) Modified year on 3/27/2025 (Pesta, J.)
Related: [-]
208 208 6 pgs order Order Thu 03/27 9:38 AM
ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY ORDER. The parties shall abide by the terms of the attached order. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 3/27/2025. (Vo, C)
Related: [-]
207 207 3 pgs order Order Thu 03/27 9:32 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial disclosures due by April 11, 2025 . Discovery due by November 3, 2025. Dispositive motions due by December 1, 2025. Initial Status Report due by August 1, 2025. Second Status Report due by November 10, 2025. All further deadlines are set forth in the attached scheduling order. Note that some of the dates in the scheduling order differ from those proposed by the parties' Rule 26(f) Report. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 3/27/2025. (Vo, C)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/27 2:34 PM
Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 11/3/2025; Dispositive Motions due by 12/1/2025; Initial Status Report due by 8/1/2025; Second Status Report due by 11/10/2025 (Bergeson, S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
206 206 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Wed 03/26 4:54 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Dave Vatti for a settlement conference between Plaintiff and Defendants HolaBelle, Inc., Ya Lan Yang, and Todd Glonek. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on March 26, 2025. (Bergeson, S)
Related: [-]