Iowa Southern District Court
Judge:Stephanie M Rose
Referred: William P Kelly
Case #: 4:23-cv-00484
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1364 Auto Negligence
Case Filed:Dec 01, 2023
Case in other court:Nebraska, 8:23-cv-00498
Last checked: Wednesday May 29, 2024 3:20 AM CDT
Defendant
D-Trans LLC
Represented By
Stephen G. Olson, II
Engles Ketcham Olson & Keith PC
contact info
Defendant
Gino Lollio
Represented By
Conan Becknell
Engles Ketcham Olson & Keith PC
contact info
Stephen G. Olson, II
Engles Ketcham Olson & Keith PC
contact info
Defendant
Harcros Chemicals, Inc.
Plaintiff
Elizabeth A. Pepitone
Represented By
William F McGinn
Mcginn, Springer & Noethe
contact info
Thomas M. White
White & Jorgensen
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, February 14, 2025
39 39 order 1 - Terminate Hearings Order Fri 02/14 10:24 AM
TEXT ORDER re38 Joint Status Conference Report. The parties report they are awaiting settlement approval from the Nebraska Probate Court and have no current matters to discus with the Court. Accordingly, the Status Conference scheduled for 2/18/2025 is canceled. Signed by Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly on 2/14/2025. (rls)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
38 38 misc Status Report Thu 02/13 3:35 PM
STATUS REPORT by Gino Lollio, D-Trans LLC. (Olson, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
37 37 misc Designation of Expert Witnesses Fri 12/27 11:16 AM
Designation of Expert Witnesses by Gino Lollio, D-Trans LLC. (Olson, Stephen)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Notice - Other Fri 12/27 11:14 AM
NOTICE by Gino Lollio, D-Trans LLC . (Olson, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
35 35 order Status Report Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 11/22 4:40 PM
ORDER FOR STATUS REPORT AND RESETTING STATUS CONFERENCE.Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/18/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly. Counsel shall call 833-990-9400 and enter ID 667-254-134 and code 6500 to join the call. Status Report due by 2/14/2025. **This is a change in call-in information only.** Signed by Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly on 11/22/2024. (rls)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
34 34 notice Notice - Other Fri 08/30 3:44 PM
NOTICE by Elizabeth A. Pepitone NOTICE OF SERVING EXPERT DISCLOSURES . (McGinn, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
33 33 notice Notice - Other Tue 08/27 1:48 PM
NOTICE by D-Trans LLC of Serving Discovery on Plaintiff . (Olson, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
32 32 order Protective Order Wed 05/22 9:47 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly on 5/22/2024. (rls)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
31 31 motion Protective Order Tue 05/21 1:15 PM
MOTION for Protective Order by D-Trans LLC.Motions referred to William P. Kelly. Responses due by 6/4/2024.(Olson, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, April 22, 2024
30 30 notice Notice - Other Mon 04/22 4:05 PM
NOTICE by Gino Lollio of Serving Subpoena . (Becknell, Conan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
29 29 notice Notice - Other Wed 04/17 1:55 PM
NOTICE by Elizabeth A. Pepitone Notice of Serving Discovery to Defendants' . (McGinn, William)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice - Other Wed 04/17 1:54 PM
NOTICE by Elizabeth A. Pepitone Notice of Serving Discovery to Defendants' . (McGinn, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
27 27 notice Notice - Other Fri 03/15 3:19 PM
NOTICE by D-Trans LLC, Gino Lollio . (Olson, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
26 26 notice Notice - Other Thu 03/07 12:50 PM
NOTICE by D-Trans LLC Serving Supplemental Initial Disclosures . (Olson, Stephen)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice - Other Thu 03/07 12:48 PM
NOTICE by D-Trans LLC Serving Initial Disclosures . (Olson, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
24 24 notice Notice - Other Fri 03/01 1:44 PM
NOTICE by Elizabeth A. Pepitone Plaintiff's Notice of Serving Rule 26(A)(1) Disclosures . (McGinn, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 02/09 3:34 PM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/18/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly. Counsel shall call 1-877-411-9748 and enter code 1376500 at the prompt to join the call. Status Report due by 2/14/2025. See Order for particulars. Signed by Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly on 2/9/2024. (rls)
Related: [-]
22 22 2 pgs order Order Fri 02/09 3:06 PM
ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See Order for particulars. Signed by Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly on 2/9/2024. (rls)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan Fri 02/09 3:01 PM
ORDER adopting19 REGARDING PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 3/1/2024. Motions to Add Parties due by 3/29/2024. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/29/2024. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 8/30/2024. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 11/29/2024. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 1/30/2025. Discovery Deadline 3/3/2025. Dispositive Motion Deadline 4/15/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2025 at 10:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 455 - 4th Floor South before Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly. Jury Trial set for 9/15/2025 at 9:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 145 - 1st Floor South before Chief Judge Stephanie M. Rose. Estimated length of trial is 7 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly on 2/9/2024.(rls)
Related: [-]
20 20 minutes Scheduling Conference Fri 02/09 2:42 PM
TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly: Scheduling Conference held on 2/8/2024. Attorney Thomas M. White appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorney Stephen G. Olson, II appeared on behalf of Defendants. Status of case discussed. Separate Orders to follow. Total Court Time: 27 minutes.(rls)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
19 19 motion Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan Thu 02/01 4:13 PM
PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN AND CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE . (Olson, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
18 18 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 01/08 11:27 AM
TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 2/8/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly. Counsel shall call 1-877-411-9748 and enter code 1376500 at the prompt to join the call. The parties shall file a Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan as provided under Local Rule 16 by 2/1/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly on 1/8/2024. (rls)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
17 17 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/05 10:45 AM
TEXT ORDER granting16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas M. White. Signed by Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly on 1/5/2024. (nla)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear) Fri 01/05 9:56 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-5338300 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Elizabeth A. Pepitone. (McGinn, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
15 15 misc Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT Thu 12/28 2:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by D-Trans LLC. (Olson, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/21 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William F McGinn on behalf of Elizabeth A. Pepitone (McGinn, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
13 13 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 12/15 4:20 PM
Defendants ANSWER to6 Amended Complaint by D-Trans LLC, Gino Lollio.(Olson, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
12 12 notice Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Tue 12/05 2:33 PM
Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet. In compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 12/22/2023. (sml)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
11 11 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Fri 12/01 2:01 PM
Case transferred in from District of Nebraska; Case Number 8:23-cv-00498. Original file
Related: [-]
10 10 3 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Fri 12/01 10:03 AM
ORDER - Defendants' unopposed motion to transfer, Filing No.9 , is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Iowa. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LKO)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Fri 12/01 11:11 AM
Case transferred to District of Southern District of Iowa. Original electronic file sent. No 30-day hold period per JFB chambers. (LKO)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 12/01 2:08 PM
Chief Judge Stephanie M. Rose and Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly added. (nla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
9 9 MOTION to Change Venue by Attorney Stephen G. Olson, II on behalf of Defendant D-Trans LLC.(Olson, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
8 8 Summons Issued as to defendant Harcros Chemicals, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
Related: [-]
7 7 Summons Requested as to Harcros Chemicals, Inc regarding Amended Complaint6 . (White, Thomas)
Related: [-]
6 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant All Defendants, by Attorney Thomas M. White on behalf of Elizabeth A. Pepitone(White, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
5 5 Summons Issued as to defendants D-Trans LLC, Gino Lollio. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
Related: [-]
4 4 Summons Requested as to D-Trans, LLC regarding Complaint,1 . (White, Thomas)
Related: [-]
3 3 Summons Requested as to Gino Lollio regarding Complaint,1 . (White, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
2 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants, by Attorney Thomas M. White on behalf of Elizabeth A. Pepitone (White, Thomas) Modified on 11/13/2023 to reflect that the correct plaintiff and that the $402 filing fee was paid, receipt number ANEDC-4974090 (LRM).
Related: [-]