Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Scott L Palk
Case #: 5:23-cv-01101
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 01, 2023
Terminated:Feb 13, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday May 29, 2024 3:26 AM CDT
Defendant
City of Lawton
Defendant
Lawton Police Department
Defendant
Sgt. Adam Rowland
Defendant
James Smith
Defendant
Charlie Whittington
Defendant
Matthew Whittington
non-party
Shon T Erwin
Represented By
Shon T Erwin
Us District Courthouse-Okc
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Stanley Crawford
1605 NW Taft
Lawton, OK 73507


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
9 9 order Judgment Tue 02/13 10:16 AM
JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL . In accordance with the Order entered this 13th day of February, 2024, this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 2/13/2024. (cps)
Related: [-]
8 8 4 pgs order Order Tue 02/13 10:04 AM
ORDER . IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this action re1 Complaint, is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with Rule 8 and pursuant to Rule 41(b). A separate judgment of dismissal shall be entered contemporaneously herewith. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 2/13/2024. (cps)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 01/03 3:49 PM
ORDER granting in part6 Motion to Extend Deadline. Plaintiff shall have thirty(30) days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint which cures the deficiencies discussed in the Courts December 11, 2023 Order5 . Failure to do so within the time permitted may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 1/3/24. (mjs)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
6 6 motion Extension of Time Fri 12/22 8:41 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time by Richard Stanley Crawford. (rp)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
5 5 6 pgs order Order Mon 12/11 9:42 AM
ORDER This action will be dismissed without prejudice unless Plaintiff files an amended complaint within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order which cures the deficiencies set forth herein. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 12/11/23. (mjs)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 12/04 9:10 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. See Order as more fully set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 12/4/2023. (mc)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
3 3 1 pgs order Order Referring Motion Fri 12/01 5:31 PM
ENTER ORDER REFERRING MOTION:2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Richard Stanley Crawford Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. Signed at the direction of Judge Scott L. Palk on 12/01/2023. (dtb)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 12/01 5:05 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard Stanley Crawford. (dtb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/01 5:02 PM
COMPLAINT against City of Lawton, Lawton Police Department, Adam Rowland, James Smith, Charlie Whittington, Matthew Whittington filed by Richard Stanley Crawford.(dtb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Official Oklahoma Traffic Collision Report,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2- Case Report,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3- Oklahoma Uniform Violations Complaint,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet