Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Sarah E Geraghty
Case #: 1:23-cv-05494
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Dec 01, 2023
Terminated:Jul 31, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday May 29, 2024 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Mecca Benton
All Others 1625 Prospect Place
Locus Grove, GA 30248
Plaintiff
Excalibur Homes
Represented By
Ryan Leonard Young
Self & Associates, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
15 15 misc Judgment - Clerk Wed 07/31 1:00 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered dismissing action. (ane)
Related: [-]
14 14 3 pgs order Order Wed 07/31 12:56 PM
ORDER: This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Local Rule 41.3(A)(1), NDGa, for want of prosecution. As no matters remain before this Court, the Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 7/31/2024. (ane)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 07/31 12:59 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (ane)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 07/31 1:01 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Mecca Benton re14 Order,15 Clerk's Judgment. (ane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 06/12 1:42 PM
Submission of5 Order to District Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. (sap)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
13 13 appeal USCA Clerk's Entry of Dismissal Wed 05/01 3:01 PM
USCA Clerk's Entry of Dismissal for want of prosecution re6 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA 11th Circuit Case Number 24-10816 AA. (adg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Application to Appeal In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/23 11:42 AM
ORDER GRANTING10 Application to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 4/23/2024. (ane)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 04/23 11:48 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Mecca Benton re12 Order on Application to Appeal in forma pauperis. (ane)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
11 11 appeal FRAP 11 Certification Request Mon 04/22 12:39 PM
Forthwith Request by Circuit to district court for entry of Fed.R.App.P. 11 Certification re:6 Notice of Appeal filed by Mecca Benton. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 24-10816 A. (pjm)
Related: [-]
appeal Appeal Record Certified Mon 04/22 12:53 PM
Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal,6 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 24-10816 A. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 03/26 3:42 PM
Submission of10 APPLICATION to Appeal in forma pauperis, to District Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
10 10 motion Application to Appeal In Forma Pauperis Tue 03/26 3:41 PM
APPLICATION to Appeal in forma pauperis by Mecca Benton. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
9 9 appeal USCA Acknowledgment Wed 03/20 8:19 AM
USCA Acknowledgment of6 Notice of Appeal filed by Mecca Benton. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 24-10816 A. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
8 8 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Thu 03/14 12:53 PM
Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Orders and Docket Sheet to USCA - 11th Circuit re:6 Notice of Appeal. (pjm)
Related: [-]
7 7 appeal USCA Appeal Transmission Thu 03/14 12:45 PM
USCA Appeal Transmission Letter to USCA- 11th Circuit re:6 Notice of Appeal filed by Mecca Benton. (pjm) (pjm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/14/2024) Corrected USCA Transmittal Letter
Friday, March 08, 2024
6 6 appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 03/14 12:43 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to5 Order, by Mecca Benton. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. (IFP Form sent to Appellant)(cc:USCA) (pjm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
5 5 11 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Tue 02/27 2:07 PM
ORDER: The case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. If Benton intends to proceed with her case, she must file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this order. The failure to follow the instructions in this order may result in the dismissal of this action with prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this case to the undersigned in thirty-five (35) days from the entry date of this order. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 2/27/2024. (ane)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 02/27 2:08 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Mecca Benton re5 Order. (ane)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
4 4 30+ pgs order Order Mon 12/11 8:22 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 12/11/2023. (ane)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 12/11 8:23 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Mecca Benton re4 Order. (ane)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 12/04 8:14 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Mecca Benton re2 Order. (ane)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Mon 12/04 8:44 AM
Submission of3 Notice of Removal to District Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. (ane)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
3 3 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 12/04 8:43 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT and request for preliminary and permanent injunction, temporary restraining order filed by Mecca Benton.(ane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 2 pgs order Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 12/04 8:13 AM
ORDER GRANTING1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this matter to the District Court for a frivolity determination under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2), and to determine whether Defendant has established that this Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 12/1/2023. (ane)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 12/01 12:33 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mecca Benton.(ane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Removal with request for TRO and Injunctive Relief,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Fri 12/01 12:34 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (ane)
Related: [-]