New York Northern District Court
Judge:David N Hurd
Referred: Daniel J Stewart
Case #: 1:23-cv-01511
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Nov 30, 2023
Terminated:Sep 30, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 28, 2024 4:22 AM EDT
Defendant
Claudia Andreassen
Represented By
Frank Humphrey Foster
Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley
contact info
Defendant
Fred Costello, Jr.
Represented By
Blair J. Hendricks
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Brian S. Sokoloff
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Steve C. Stern
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Defendant
Town of Saugerties, New York
Represented By
Blair J. Hendricks
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Brian S. Sokoloff
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Steve C. Stern
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Melissa Fisher
Represented By
H. Joseph Cronen
Charny & Wheeler P.C.
contact info
Stephen Girard Denigris
The Denigris Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Nathaniel K. Charny
Charny & Wheeler P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, January 10, 2025
47 47 2 pgs order Order Fri 01/10 2:21 PM
ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 1/10/2025. (ptm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
46 46 misc Stipulation Tue 01/07 5:04 PM
STIPULATION of Discontinuance by Town of Saugerties, New York, Fred Costello, Jr.. (Stern, Steve)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
45 45 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 09/30 3:54 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL BY REASON OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 9/30/2024. (ptm)
Related: [-]
adr ADR Completed Mon 09/30 2:38 PM
ADR COMPLETED - CASE HAS SETTLED. Mediator Elena DeFio Kean terminated. The mediator and attorneys who attended the mediation session are asked to complete a survey with respect to the Mandatory Mediation Program. Attorneys for parties can access the survey at https://forms.office.com/g/AGz4E8EBVa. Mediators can access the survey at https://forms.office.com/g/pfQiD2e4jy. Any questions can be directed to the ADR Coordinator.(amt)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
44 44 adr Report of Mandatory Mediation Fri 09/27 2:26 PM
REPORT OF MANDATORY MEDIATION - A Mandatory Mediation session was held on September 25, 2024. Total Hours Spent by Mediator: 10.10; The outcome of Mandatory Mediation is: CASE HAS SETTLED. The Settlement Agreement and Stipulation for Dismissal are being prepared and will be submitted for the courts consideration. (Kean, Elena)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
43 43 adr Confidentiality Agreement Wed 09/25 10:47 AM
CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT (Kean, Elena)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 08/05 3:26 PM
Pursuant to the39 Text Order, the deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 10/8/2024. (amt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
42 42 adr Stipulation Selecting Mediator Wed 07/03 5:15 PM
STIPULATION SELECTING MEDIATOR: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that Elena DeFio Kean has been selected, contacted and has agreed to serve as Mediator for this action. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that counsel will participate in the mediation session in good faith and confer with the Mediator regarding the scheduling of additional conferences, bearing in mind the deadline for completion of Mediation set forth in the Court's Order Referring the Case to Mediation. Stipulation signed by: Blair J. Hendricks and. Dated: 07/03/2024(Hendricks, Blair)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
41 41 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 06/25 3:53 PM
TEXT ORDER granting40 Letter Request: Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is extended to 7/5/2024. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 6/25/2024. (gmd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
40 40 notice Notice - Other Thu 06/20 7:09 PM
NOTICE by Fred Costello, Jr., Town of Saugerties, New York (joint status letter on selection of mediator and request for extension) (Hendricks, Blair)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
39 39 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mandatory Mediation Thu 05/23 4:18 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 6/20/2024. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 10/8/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 5/23/2024. (gmd) (gmd, )
Related: [-]
38 38 order Uniform Pretrial Scheduling Order Thu 05/23 4:17 PM
UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 6/10/2024. Amended Pleadings due by 6/10/2024. Discovery due by 2/4/2025. Plaintiffs Expert Disclosure Deadline is 11/6/2024. Defendants Expert Disclosure Deadline is 12/23/2024. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline is 1/6/2025. Motions to be filed by 4/4/2025. Anticipated length of trial: 3 Days. Preferred Trial Location: Albany. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 5/23/2024. (gmd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 05/23 12:23 PM
Text Minute Entry for a Telephone Rule 16 Conference held on 5/21/2024 before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. The Court hears from counsel as to their positions and how they intend to proceed in this matter. Court discusses potential for settlement. The Court discusses the Mandatory Mediation Program with counsel. Scheduling Order deadlines set. A Uniform Pretrial Order will be issued. Counsel may contact the court if any issues arise after attempting to resolve them without intervention of court. Appearances: H. Joseph Cronen, Esq., for plaintiff; Blair J. Hendricks, Esq., for Defendants Town of Saugerties, New York, and Fred Costello, Jr.; Frank Humphrey Foster, Esq., for defendant Claudia Andreassen. Time: 11:00 AM - 11:15 AM.(gmd)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
37 37 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 05/06 11:34 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Initial Rule 16 Conference RESET for 5/21/2024 at 11:00 AM via TELEPHONE before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. The parties are directed to dial +1 518-217-2288, and enter ID code 869 719 134 to connect to the conference. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 5/6/2024. (gmd)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
36 36 misc Civil Case Management Plan Fri 05/03 4:22 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Fred Costello, Jr., Town of Saugerties, New York. (Stern, Steve)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
35 35 3 pgs order Order Thu 03/28 11:51 AM
ORDER granting29 Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney. Attorney Nathaniel K. Charny substitutes Stephen Girard Denigris. Attorney Stephen Girard Denigri terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 3/19/2024. (gmd)
Related: [-]
34 34 order Order on Letter Request Tue 03/19 4:30 PM
TEXT ORDER granting32 Letter Request, requesting Extension of Time and Adjournment of the Rule 16 Conference: In Person Initial Rule 16 Conference RESET for 5/10/2024 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/3/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 3/19/2024. (gmd)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
33 33 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/18 10:26 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Blair J. Hendricks on behalf of Fred Costello, Jr., Town of Saugerties, New York (Hendricks, Blair)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
32 32 motion Letter Request/Motion Fri 03/15 11:45 AM
Letter Motion from H. Joseph Cronen for Melissa Fisher requesting Extension of Time and Adjournment of the Rule 16 Conference submitted to Judge Hon. Daniel J. Stewart . (Cronen, H.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/13 1:36 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by H. Joseph Cronen on behalf of Melissa Fisher (Cronen, H.)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/13 1:35 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nathaniel K. Charny on behalf of Melissa Fisher (Charny, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice - Other Wed 03/13 12:50 PM
NOTICE by Melissa Fisher Proposed Consent Order for Substitution of Attorney (Denigris, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
28 28 notice Notice - Other Thu 03/07 4:30 PM
NOTICE by Fred Costello, Jr., Town of Saugerties, New York re26 Notice of Admission Requirement, (Hendricks, Blair)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
27 27 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/04 8:16 AM
TEXT ORDER: An IN PERSON Initial Rule 16 Conference is set for 3/26/2024 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/19/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 3/4/2024. (gmd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Admission Requirement Thu 02/29 4:08 PM
NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Defendants Town of Saugerties, New York and Fred Costello, Jr.; Attorney Blair Hendricks, Esq., Phone number is (516) 334-4500. Admissions due by 3/14/2024. (Copy served via Regular Mail on Attorney Hendricks) (ztc)
Related: [-]
25 25 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 02/29 3:53 PM
ANSWER to23 Amended Complaint,, by Claudia Andreassen.(Foster, Frank)
Related: [-]
24 24 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 02/29 3:47 PM
ANSWER to23 Amended Complaint,, by Fred Costello, Jr., Town of Saugerties, New York.(Stern, Steve)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
23 23 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 02/21 12:32 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Consented To Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants filed by Melissa Fisher.(Denigris, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - Notice of Claim - 11/28/2022,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B-Saugerties Anti-Harassment Policy,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C-Saugerties Workplace Violence Program,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D-SCJC Order dated 09/28/2022,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) E-Termination Request-0902-2022,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) F-SCJC Decision & Order -0928-2022,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) G-News Story - 0928-2022,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) H-News Story - 0928-2022
22 22 order Order Wed 02/21 11:09 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Dkt. #21 Notice. Counsels request to file a Second Amended Complaint is granted. Counsel may file a consented to Second Amended Complaint. Defendant's Answer deadline remains 2/29/2024. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 2/21/2024. (gmd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
21 21 notice Notice - Other Tue 02/20 5:11 PM
NOTICE by Melissa Fisher Concerning Second Amended Complaint (Denigris, Stephen)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadlines Tue 02/20 3:24 PM
TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed on 2/15/2024, Dkt. No. 19, is hereby stricken from the record and will not be considered by the Court. Plaintiffs time to amend as a matter of course pursuant to F.R.C.P. 15 has long passed and Plaintiff also failed to seek leave to amend. Defendant's Answer to the7 Amended Complaint is due 2/29/2024. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 2/20/2024. (gmd)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Fri 02/16 10:41 AM
***Answer due date updated for Claudia Andreassen answer due 2/29/2024; Fred Costello, Jr. answer due 2/29/2024; Town of Saugerties, New York answer due 2/29/2024. (ztc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
19 19 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 02/15 5:45 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended against Claudia Andreassen, Fred Costello, Jr., Town of Saugerties, New York filed by Melissa Fisher.(Denigris, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - Notice of Claim,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B-Saugerties Anti-Harassment Policy,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C-Saugerties Workplace Violence Program,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D-SCJC Stipulation - 0902-2022,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) E-Termination Request-0902-2022,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) F-SCJC Decision & Order -0928-2022,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) G-News Story - 0928-2022,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) H-News Story - 0928-2022
Friday, February 09, 2024
18 18 order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 02/09 11:41 AM
TEXT ORDER The Rule 16 conference set for 2/29/2024 and the 2/22/2024 deadline for the submission of a joint Civil Case Management Plan and exchange of Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED WITHOUT DATE. The hearing and related deadlines will be reset, if deemed necessary, after Answers have been filed. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 2/9/2024. (gmd)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 02/09 11:25 AM
TEXT ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendant's answer due date extended to 2/20/2024. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 2/5/2024. (gmd) modified on 2/9/2024. (gmd)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk Correction of Docket Entry Fri 02/09 11:38 AM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY Dkt. # 17 Text Order: Clerk corrected the docket text to reflect that all defendants answer due date has been extended. (gmd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 02/01 3:28 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or respond to complaint filed by Claudia Andreassen. Response to Motion due by 2/22/2024 Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Foster, Frank)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/22 1:53 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steve C. Stern on behalf of Fred Costello, Jr., Town of Saugerties, New York (Stern, Steve)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 01/16 12:04 PM
TEXT ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Claudia Andreassen answer due 2/4/2024. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 1/16/2024.(gmd)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 15, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 01/15 10:51 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re7 Amended Complaint,, filed by Claudia Andreassen. Response to Motion due by 2/5/2024 Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Foster, Frank)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 01/10 2:09 PM
TEXT ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Fred Costello, Jr. answer due 2/4/2024; Town of Saugerties, New York answer due 2/4/2024. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 1/10/2024. (gmd)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Affidavit of Service Wed 01/10 12:57 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint with Exhibits A through H served on Claudia Andreassen in her Official and Individual Capacities on 01/02/2024, filed by Melissa Fisher. (Denigris, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 01/05 4:12 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,, filed by Fred Costello, Jr., Town of Saugerties, New York. Response to Motion due by 1/26/2024 Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Sokoloff, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Wed 01/03 2:11 PM
***Answer due date updated for Claudia Andreassen answer due 1/17/2024. (ztc)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 30, 2023
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Sat 12/30 2:18 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint for Damages with Exhibits A through H served on Hon. Lisa Stanley Saugerties Town Clerk and Hon Fred Costello Jr., Saugerties Town Supervisor, in his Official and Individual Capacity on 12/18/2023, filed by Melissa Fisher. (Denigris, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Fri 12/29 6:33 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Damages w/Exhibits; Civil Cover Sheet; General Order #25; Civil Case Management Plan; Consent to Magistrate; Notice, Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to Magistrate Judge;Notice Court Directed Mandatory Mediation served on Claudia Andreassen in her Official and Individual Capacity on 12/27/2023, filed by Melissa Fisher. (Denigris, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 12/15 2:13 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Fred Costello, Jr., Town of Saugerties, New York filed by Melissa Fisher.(Denigris, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - Notice of Claim - 11/28/2022,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B-Saugerties Anti-Harassment Policy,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C-Saugerties Workplace Violence Program,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D-SCJC Stipulation - 0902-2022,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) E-Termination Request-0902-2022,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) F-SCJC Decision & Order -0928-2022,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) G-News Story - 0928-2022,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) H-News Story - 0928-2022
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Fri 12/15 2:01 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Exhibits A-F served on Fred Costello, Jr - Individual Capacity on 12/15/2023, filed by Melissa Fisher. (Denigris, Stephen)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Fri 12/15 1:59 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Exhibits A-f served on Fred Costello, Jr - Official Capacity on 12/15/2023, filed by Melissa Fisher. (Denigris, Stephen)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Fri 12/15 1:57 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summon-Complaint with Exhibits A-F served on Hon. Lisa Stanley, Saugerties Town Clerk on 12/15/2023, filed by Melissa Fisher. (Denigris, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
misc Clerk Correction of Docket Entry Tue 12/05 3:30 PM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re1 Complaint, Clerk added the redacted version of Exhibit A Notice of Claim to Docket entry #1 that was filed by counsel. (ztc)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
misc Text Notice of Filing Deficiency Fri 12/01 1:12 PM
TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY as to Melissa Fisher regarding the1 Complaint, NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Counsel has submitted documents that are not in compliance with redaction requirements pursuant to Federal and NYND Local Rules 5.2 Personal Privacy Protection and General Order 22, Section 11.2. This document has been TEMPORARILY RESTRICTED. Counsel is directed to make the appropriate redactions to the above referenced document and electronically file the redacted document within 3 days of this notice using the event CORRECTED DOCUMENT(S) found under Other Filings and reference this case number. Do NOT use any other event to file your corrected document. Failure to file a redacted document by the deadline will result in the unredacted document referenced above being unrestricted. Counsel and the parties are cautioned that failure to redact these personal identifiers may subject them to the Courts full disciplinary power pursuant to NYND Local Rule 5.2. Exhibit A Notice of Claim contains plaintiff's home address on page 2. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 12/6/2023 (kck)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
3 3 misc G.O. 25 Filing Order Fri 12/01 1:08 PM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 2/29/2024 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/22/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (kck)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 12/01 1:07 PM
Summons Issued as to Town of Saugerties, New York(kck)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Issued as to Fred Costello, Jr (Individual Capacity),
Att: 2 Summons Issued as to Fred Costello, Jr (Official Capacity),
Att: 3 Summons Issued as to Claudia Andreassean (Individual Capacity),
Att: 4 Summons Issued as to Claudia Andreassean (Official Capacity)
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/01 1:00 PM
COMPLAINT w/ JURY DEMAND against Claudia Andreassen, Fred Costello, Jr., Town of Saugerties, New York (Filing fee $402 receipt number 279QAANT) filed by Melissa Fisher(kck)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A_Notice_of_Claim,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B_SCJC_Stipulation_Dated_9_22_2022,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C_Request_to_Terminate_Dated_9_02_2022,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D_SCJC_Order_Dated_9_28_2022,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) E_Hudson_News_Dated_9_28_2022,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) F_SCJC_New_Release_Dated_9_28_2022,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet