South Carolina District Court
Judge:Timothy M Cain
Referred: Kaymani D West
Case #: 5:23-cv-06109
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983pr (Other)
Case Filed:Nov 29, 2023
Terminated:Jun 14, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, June 14, 2024
43 43 misc Document Mailed Fri 06/14 1:00 PM
***DOCUMENTS MAILED:41 Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation w/NEF,42 Judgment w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Rhonda Rene Fisher Measmer, 19 Columbia Circle, Greenville, SC 29607. (prou, )
Related: [-]
42 42 misc Judgment Fri 06/14 12:57 PM
JUDGMENT: This case is dismissed. (prou, )
Related: [-]
41 41 3 pgs order Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation Fri 06/14 12:53 PM
ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Having reviewed the Report and finding no clear error, the court agrees with, and wholly ADOPTS the magistrate judge's findings and recommendations in the Report (ECF No. 37 ), which is incorporated herein by reference. Accordingly, Plaintiff's case is DISMISSED. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy M Cain on 6/14/2024. (prou, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
38 38 misc Document Mailed Thu 05/16 12:37 PM
***DOCUMENTS MAILED:36 Order w/NEF,37 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Rhonda Rene Fisher Measmer, 19 Columbia Circle, Greenville, SC 29607. (prou, )
Related: [-]
37 37 motion Report and Recommendation Thu 05/16 12:34 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The undersigned recommends this case be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Objections to R&R due by 5/30/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 5/16/2024. (prou, )
Related: [-]
36 36 3 pgs order Order - No Service - Non Inmate Thu 05/16 12:31 PM
ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 5/16/2024. (prou, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
31 31 misc Document Mailed Mon 02/26 4:04 PM
***DOCUMENTS MAILED: 30 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,29 Second Proper Form Order w/NEF, Summons, and four USM-285 Forms, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Rhonda Rene Fisher Measmer, 19 Columbia Circle, Greenville, SC 29607. (prou, )
Related: [-]
30 30 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 02/26 4:02 PM
ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per 29 Second Proper Form Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 2/26/2024.(prou, )
Related: [-]
29 29 order Proper Form Order Mon 02/26 3:57 PM
SECOND PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 3/18/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 2/26/2024. (prou, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
23 23 misc Non-Standard Item Received Wed 02/14 10:14 AM
NON-STANDARD ITEM RECEIVED: Disk from Rhonda Rene Fisher Measmer re:1 Complaint. Disk is located in the Florence Clerk's Office. (prou, )
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 02/14 10:10 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Related [+] by Rhonda Rene Fisher Measmer. Response to Motion due by 2/26/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(prou, )
Related: [-] stricted Access
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, February 01, 2024
20 20 misc Document Mailed Thu 02/01 1:25 PM
***DOCUMENTS MAILED:7 Proper Form Order,1 Complaint, 19 Text Order, pro se non prisoner form complaint, Form AO 240, Summons, and four USM-285 Forms, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Rhonda Rene Fisher Measmer, 19 Columbia Circle, Greenville, SC 29607. (prou, )
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 02/01 1:04 PM
TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff Rhonda Measmer, proceeding pro se, brought this action on November 29, 2023. (ECF No. 1 ). In accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and Local Civil Rule 73.02(B) (D.S.C.), this matter was referred to a magistrate judge for all pretrial proceedings. On December 6, 2023, the magistrate judge issued an order granting Plaintiff twenty-one (21) days in which to bring the case into proper form and advising Plaintiff of her duty to keep the court informed as to her current address. (ECF No. 7 ). The order set forth the documentation necessary to bring the case into proper form and warned Plaintiff that failure to provide the necessary information within the time permitted may subject the case to dismissal. Id. at 1, 2. The order was mailed to Plaintiff at the address she provided to the court, (ECF No. 8 ), and was not returned to the court as undeliverable. When Plaintiff failed to fully respond to the proper form order, the magistrate judge issued a Report and Recommendation ("the Report"), recommending the case be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (ECF No. 14 ). The Report notified Plaintiff of her right to file objections thereto. Id. at 4. Plaintiff filed a response to the Report, indicating that she sent her written documentation on November 13, 2023, as indicated in her enclosed certified receipt. (ECF No. 17 at 1; ECF No. 17 -2 at 1). The undersigned has reviewed the documentation Plaintiff filed with the court and finds that Plaintiff has failed to fully comply with the proper form order issued on December 8, 2023 (ECF No. 7 ). However, in light of Plaintiff's response to the Report, the court DECLINES TO ADOPT the recommendation in the Report, (ECF No. 14 ), and, instead, GRANTS Plaintiff an additional fourteen (14) days from the date of this order to submit the necessary documentation to bring her case into proper form. The court directs the Clerk's Office to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff at the address she provided to the court along with the proper form order (ECF No. 7 ) and accompanying forms. The court, however, cautions Plaintiff that failure to bring her claim into proper form with the proper documentation will result in her claim being dismissed. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 2/1/2024. (prou, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
17 17 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendation Tue 01/30 10:04 AM
OBJECTION to14 Report and Recommendation by Rhonda Rene Fisher Measmer. Reply to Objections due by 2/12/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(prou, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 NEF and Report and Recommendation,
Att: 2 Certified Mail Receipt,
Att: 3 Envelope
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
15 15 misc Document Mailed Wed 01/10 2:18 PM
***DOCUMENTS MAILED:14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION w/NEF,13 Order w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Rhonda Rene Fisher Measmer, 19 Columbia Circle, Greenville, SC 29607. (prou, )
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Report and Recommendation Wed 01/10 2:15 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The undersigned recommends this case be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Objections to R&R due by 1/24/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 1/10/2024. (prou, )
Related: [-]
13 13 3 pgs order Order - No Service - Non Inmate Wed 01/10 2:11 PM
ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 1/10/2024. (prou, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
8 8 misc Document Mailed Wed 12/06 3:11 PM
***DOCUMENTS MAILED:7 Proper Form Order w/NEF,1 Complaint, pro se non prisoner form complaint, Form AO 240, Summons, and four USM-285 Forms, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Rhonda Rene Fisher Measmer, 19 Columbia Circle, Greenville, SC 29607. (prou, )
Related: [-]
7 7 order Proper Form Order Wed 12/06 3:06 PM
PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 12/27/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 12/6/2023. (prou, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/01 3:17 PM
COMPLAINT against Thomas Colture, Lauren Hough, Law Patriot, Yunet Walker, filed by Rhonda Rene Fisher Measmer. Service due by 2/27/2024.(prou, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents,
Att: 2 Envelopes