Louisiana Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John S Hodge
Case #: 5:23-bk-11295
Case Filed:Dec 01, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Jan 05, 2024
Claims Deadline:Aug 12, 2024

Debtor
Carter Construction Company, Inc.
PO Box 238
Benton, LA 71006-0238
Represented By
Robert W. Raley
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
John W. Luster
P.O. Box 488
Natchitoches, LA 71458
Trustee
John Clifton Conine
1150 Miller Farm Rd.
Natchitoches, LA 71457
Represented By
John W. Luster
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of U. S. Trustee
300 Fannin St., Suite 3196
Shreveport, LA 71101


Docket last updated: 12/11/2024 11:12 AM CST
Friday, December 01, 2023
crditcrd Autodocket US Treasury Receipt Fri 12/01 5:02 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition Chapter 7([LINK 23-11295 ) [petdoc,volp7a] ( 338.00) Related [+]. Receipt Number A24079697, in the Amount of $ 338.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 12 pgs petdoc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Fee) Fri 12/01 4:57 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $338, Filed by Robert W. Raley on behalf of Carter Construction Company, Inc.. Declaration of ECF Filing due by 12/4/2023. Social Security Card due by 12/4/2023. Picture Identification Card due by 12/4/2023. Attorney Disclosure Statement due by 12/15/2023. Employee Income Record for Debtor due by 12/15/2023. Schedule A/B due by 12/15/2023. Schedule D due by 12/15/2023. Schedule E/F due by 12/15/2023. Schedule G due by 12/15/2023. Schedule H due by 12/15/2023. Statement of Financial Affairs due by 12/15/2023. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due by 12/15/2023. Incomplete Filings due by 12/15/2023. (Raley, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 petdoc Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID Fri 12/01 5:08 PM
Declaration Re Electronic Filing and Statement of SSN, Picture ID Copy, Filed by Robert W. Raley on behalf of Carter Construction Company, Inc. (Raley, Robert)
Related: [-]