Arizona District Court
Case #: 3:23-mj-04320
Case Filed:Nov 30, 2023
Terminated:Dec 01, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Dec 03, 2023 12:21 AM MST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Paul V Stearns
Us Attorneys Office - Flagstaff, Az
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Leonardo Calderon (1)
Terminated: 12/01/2023
Represented By
Daniel Benjamin Kaiser
Kaiser Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/03/2023 12:44 AM MST
Friday, September 01, 2023
Arrest of Leonardo Calderon on 9/1/2023. (NSH) Modified on 11/30/2023 to correct the appropriate date (NSH).
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
1 1 REDACTED COMPLAINT as to Leonardo Calderon. (NSH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
2 2 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles: Initial Appearance, Plea and Sentence as to Leonardo Calderon held on 11/30/2023, see attached PDF. Defendant enters a plea of guilty and is sentenced as to Citation E2057159, Citation E2057161 and Citation E2057163. Citation E205160 and Citation E2057162 are dismissed with prejudice on motion of the United States. Related [+] Hearing held 9:36 AM to 10:32 AM. (NSH)
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
3 3 WAIVER OF VENUE AND CONSENT TO PROCEED in the District of Arizona for a Guilty Plea Proceeding as to Leonardo Calderon. (NSH)
Related: [-]
5 5 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Leonardo Calderon. (NSH)
Related: [-]