Hawaii District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00091
Case Filed:Nov 30, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Dec 02, 2023 9:25 PM HST
Defendant
Edward Caspino (1)
Represented By
William A. Harrison
Harrison & Matsuoka
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Michael F. Albanese
United States Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/02/2023 9:49 PM HST
Thursday, November 09, 2023
1 1 SEALED CRIMINAL COMPLAINT; AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Edward Caspino (1) - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 11/9/2023. (jni) Modified on 11/14/2023 to unseal pursuant to ECF No. 7 ORDER (eta). [1:23-mj-01635-WRP]
Related: [-]
3 3 SEALED EX PARTE MOTION TO SEAL COMPLAINT, AFFIDAVIT, DECLARATION AND WARRANT FOR ARREST; DECLARATION OF COUNSEL as to Edward Caspino - by USA. (jni) [1:23-mj-01635-WRP]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Counsel
4 4 SEALED ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION TO SEAL COMPLAINT, AFFIDAVIT, DECLARATION AND WARRANT FOR ARREST re3 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 11/9/2023. (jni) [1:23-mj-01635-WRP]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
Arrest of Edward Caspino on 11/13/2023. (eta) [1:23-mj-01635-WRP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
5 5 EO: as to Edward Caspino - An Initial Appearance is set for 11/15/2023 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Parties have been notified. (Added Attorney William A. Harrison for Edward Caspino) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo) [1:23-mj-01635-WRP]
Related: [-]
6 6 Ex Parte MOTION to Unseal Criminal Complaint and Agent's Affidavit in Support of Criminal Complaint - by USA as to Edward Caspino. (eta) [1:23-mj-01635-WRP]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO UNSEAL CRIMINAL COMPLAINT AND AGENT'S AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF CRIMINAL COMPLAINT re6 as to Edward Caspino (1) - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 11/14/2023. (eta) [1:23-mj-01635-WRP]
Related: [-]
8 8 MOTION to Detain Motion to Detain Defendant Without Bail by USA as to Edward Caspino. (Albanese, Michael) [1:23-mj-01635-WRP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
9 9 EP: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Defendant Edward Caspino held. AUSA Michael Albanese appeared on behalf of the United States. Mr. William Harrison appeared on behalf of Defendant. Defendant present and in custody. The Court held an Initial Appearance. The Court reviewed with the defendant that this was his first appearance in court and it was not the time to answer to the charges. Instead, an initial appearance hearing was to make sure that the defendant understood the general nature of the charges alleged in the Criminal Complaint, his Constitutional rights including his right to counsel, and to set further hearing dates in the case. Counsel represented that he reviewed the Criminal Complaint with defendant and that defendant understands the general nature of the charges alleged in the Criminal Complaint. Defendant affirmed that he understood the general nature of the charges to the Court. The Government filed a Motion to Detain Defendant Without Bail , ECF No. 8 . Detention Hearing is set for November 17, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter. Preliminary Hearing is set for December 6, 2023 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 5 before Magistrate Judge Rom Trader. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal Service. EO : The Court erroneously recited an incorrect date for the Preliminary Hearing in this matter. The Preliminary Hearing set for December 6, 2023 is ADVANCED to November 29, 2023 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter. The Court reminds the government of its obligations under Rule 5(f) and as set out in this Courts General Order dated February 1, 2021: The Court orders the prosecution to comply with its disclosure obligations under Brady v.Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Failing to do so in a timely manner mayresult in consequences, including, but not limited to: exclusion of evidence, adverse juryinstructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, court sanctions, and/or referralto disciplinary counsel. Initial Appearance as to Edward Caspino held on 11/15/2023 Detention Hearing is set for 11/17/2023 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER Preliminary Hearing is set for 11/29/2023 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER ***Procedural Interval start as to Edward Caspino (FTR-CT 7 / 10:38 am - 10:40 am) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo) [1:23-mj-01635-WRP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
10 10 13 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support by USA as to Edward Caspino re8 MOTION to Detain Motion to Detain Defendant Without Bail Government's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Detain/COS(Albanese, Michael) Modified on 11/17/2023 (eta). Exhibit 1 (disc) is retained by the Clerk's Office. [1:23-mj-01635-WRP]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (disc) ,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
11 11 17 pgs MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion to Detain MOTION for Release Pending Trial ; Declaration of Counsel; Supporting Memorandum of Law; Certificate of Service by Edward Caspino (Harrison, William) Docketing event modified on 11/17/2023 (eta). [1:23-mj-01635-WRP]
Related: [-]
13 13 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 11/13/2023 in case as to Edward Caspino. (eta) [1:23-mj-01635-WRP]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
12 12 EP: DETENTION HEARING as to Defendant Edward Caspino not held. AUSA Michael Albanese appeared on behalf of the United States. Mr. William Harrison appeared on behalf of Defendant. Defendant present and in custody. Discussion held. Mr. Harrison requests a continuance. Detention Hearing is CONTINUED to November 22, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal Service. Detention Hearing is CONTINUED to 11/22/2023 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER (FTR-CT 7 / 10:58 am - 11:03 am) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo) [1:23-mj-01635-WRP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
14 14 EP: DETENTION HEARING as to Defendant Edward Caspino held. AUSA Michael Albanese appeared on behalf of the United States. Mr. William Harrison appeared on behalf of Defendant. Defendant present and in custody. Discussion held. The Court took judicial notice of the U.S. Pretrial Services' Report, arguments of counsel, and other documents on file and found Defendant be detained as there is no condition or combination of conditions that will reasonably assure the appearance of the Defendant as required and the safety of the community. Defendant's Motion For Release Pending Trial , ECF No. 11 - DENIED. Government's Motion to Detain Defendant Without Bail , ECF No. 8 - GRANTED. Government to prepare the Order. The Court's order of detention is stayed until close of business today, pending the filing of an appeal by the Defendant. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal Service. Detention Hearing as to Edward Caspino held on 11/22/2023 Motion Hearing as to Edward Caspino held on 11/22/2023 re 11 MOTION for Release Pending Trial 8 Motion to Detain as to Edward Caspino: GRANTED 11 Motion for Bond as to Edward Caspino: DENIED (FTR-CT 7 / 10:30 am - 10:55 am) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo) [1:23-mj-01635-WRP]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
15 15 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Edward Caspino - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 11/27/2023. (jni) [1:23-mj-01635-WRP]
Related: [-]
16 16 WITNESS LIST by USA as to Edward Caspino. (Albanese, Michael) [1:23-mj-01635-WRP]
Related: [-]
17 17 EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Edward Caspino. (Albanese, Michael) [1:23-mj-01635-WRP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
18 18 EP: PRELIMINARY HEARING as to Defendant Edward Caspino held. AUSA Michael Albanese appeared on behalf of the United States. Mr. William Harrison appeared on behalf of Defendant. Defendant present and in custody. The Court held a Preliminary Hearing. Government's Witness: Gabriel Gray, DEA Special Agent called, sworn and testified. Direct examination: 2:03 - 2:06. Government's Exhibit 1 (Criminal Complaint, ECF No. 1 ) admitted and received. No objection by defense. Cross-examination of Government's Witness: 2:06 - 2:39. Argument had. Based upon the evidence adduced and all reasonable inferences therefrom, the Court finds probable cause that Defendant committed the offenses alleged in the Complaint. Defendant is bound over for grand jury action. Discussion held regarding Defendant's placement in the Special Holding Unit (SHU) at the Federal Detention Center. Mr. Albanese to check on the status of Defendant's placement in a housing unit. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal Service. Preliminary Hearing as to Edward Caspino held on 11/29/2023 (FTR-CT 7 / 2:00 pm - 2:42 pm) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo) [1:23-mj-01635-WRP]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Thursday, November 30, 2023
19 19 INDICTMENT as to Edward Caspino (1) count(s) 1-3. (eta)
Related: [-]
22 22 2 pgs NOTICE OF RELATED CASE - by USA as to Edward Caspino (eta)
Related: [-]
23 23 EO: as to Edward Caspino - An Arraignment and Plea to the Indictment is set for 12/5/2023 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo)
Related: [-]