Stevenson v. Earls et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Arun Subramanian |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-10375 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332pi Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Nov 24, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 22, 2024 5:02 AM EDT |
Plaintiff
Brianna Ashleigh Stevenson
350 East Willow Grove Avenue Unit 710
Philadelphia, PA 19118 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Atlantic Recording Corporation
Terminated: 03/27/2024
|
|
Defendant
Avery Earls
Terminated: 03/27/2024
|
|
Defendant
Donald Meadows
Terminated: 03/27/2024
|
|
Defendant
Starr Island Group Inc.
Terminated: 03/27/2024
|
|
Defendant
Warner Music Group
Terminated: 04/12/2024
|
Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) BRIANNA STEVENSON and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Warner Music Group. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this case. SO ORDERED. Warner Music Group terminated. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 4/12/2024) (vfr) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
misc
Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 04/08 12:57 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Arun Subramanian for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal in a Pro Se case. (nd) |
||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Warner Music Group. Document filed by Brianna Ashleigh Stevenson. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). .(kgo) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
misc
Mail Order by USPS
Thu 03/28 12:03 PM
Mailed a copy of9 Order to Brianna Ashleigh Stevenson, 350 East Willow Grove Avenue, Unit 710, Philadelphia, PA 19118. (jwh) |
||
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() ORDER: On March 26, 2024, plaintiff filed a notice of voluntary dismissal, dismissing the case against Atlantic Recording Corporation, Avery Earls, Donald Meadows, and Starr Island Group Inc. If plaintiff intends to dismiss this case entirely, plaintiff should file another notice of voluntary dismissal to dismiss the last remaining defendant, Warner Music Group. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Atlantic Recording Corporation, Avery Earls, Donald Meadows, and Starr Island Group Inc. from this case. SO ORDERED. Donald Meadows (Founder, Owner, Operator of Starr Island Group Inc., Self Employed), Starr Island Group Inc. (Defendants #1 and #2 Production Company LLC), Atlantic Recording Corporation and Avery Earls (Self Employed, Starr Island Group Inc.) terminated. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 3/27/2024) (vfr) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Atlantic Recording Corporation, Avery Earls, Donald Meadows, Starr Island Group Inc.. Document filed by Brianna Ashleigh Stevenson. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). .(kgo) |
|
misc
Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 03/26 4:11 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Arun Subramanian for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety; the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal in a Pro Se case. (km) |
||
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ORDER OF SERVICE: Plaintiff, who is proceeding pro se, paid the filing fees to commence this action. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue summonses as to the following defendants: (1) Avery Earls; (2) Donald Meadows; (3) Starr Island Group Inc.; (4) Atlantic Recording Corporation; and (4) Warner Music Group. Plaintiff is directed to serve the summonses and complaint on Defendants within 90 days of the issuance of summonses. If within those 90 days, Plaintiff has not either served Defendants or requested an extension of time to do so, the Court may dismiss the claims against Defendants under Rules 4 and 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to prosecute. The Clerk of Court is also directed to provide Plaintiff an information package. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 3/20/2024) (vfr) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ORDER: This Court previously explained that the complaint in this case would be unsealed if no renewed sealing motion was filed by February 16, 2024. Dkt. 5. No such motion has been filed. So the Clerk of Court is directed to remove the access restrictions on the complaint. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 2/20/2024) (vfr) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() MEMO ENDORSEMENT denying without prejudice2 Motion to Seal. ENDORSEMENT: The motion to seal the complaint is denied without prejudice. The Court has taken seriously plaintiff's arguments and assertions, but there is a presumption in favor of public access and the Court does not believe that this presumption has been overcome on the present motion. Bernstein v. Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP, 814 F.3d 132, 141-45 (2d Cir. 2016); Bronx Conservatory of Music, Inc. v. Kwoka, 2021 WL 2850632, at *3 (S.D.N.Y. July 8, 2021) (explaining that "conclusory assertions of harm" are insufficient to overcome presumption of access). However, access to the complaint has been temporarily limited to court users and case participants. Plaintiff has notified the Court that an attorney will enter an appearance on her behalf after the motion to seal is dealt with. Dkt. 3. The Court will keep access to the complaint limited until February 16, 2024, to give plaintiff or her attorney a chance to make a renewed sealing motion with additional detail. If no motion, showing good cause for sealing, is filed, the Court will unseal the complaint on February 17, 2024. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Dkt. 2. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 1/19/2024) (tg) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Tue 01/16 1:48 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Arun Subramanian. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 01/16 1:48 PM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vba) |
||
Friday, January 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() LETTER from B. Stevenson, re: [URGENT MOTION TO SEAL] - Due to the nature of these details, we are requesting that a judge be assigned to expedite the sealing of this case as soon as possible. The current filing(pro se) will be amended and a legal team will be added etc. Document filed by Brianna Ashleigh Stevenson.(sc) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2023 | ||
misc
Pro Se Payment of Fee - Processed
Fri 12/15 2:35 PM
Pro Se Payment of Fee Processed: $402.00 Money Order processed by the Finance Department on 12/15/23, Receipt Number 24451. (amf) |
||
Friday, December 01, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
![]() MOTION, Re: to Seal the Complaint. Document filed by Brianna Ashleigh Stevenson.(sc) |
|
Friday, November 24, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Atlantic Recording Corporation, Avery Earls, Donald Meadows, Starr Island Group Inc., Warner Music Group. Document filed by Brianna Ashleigh Stevenson. (sac) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 11/28 2:17 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sac) |