Mei Li v. The Individuals, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified On Schedule A
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney Smith |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-62295 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:0101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Dec 02, 2023 |
Terminated: | Feb 03, 2025 |
Last checked: Thursday May 30, 2024 5:15 AM EDT |
Defendant
fanronghuius
|
|
Defendant
Vukrtuo
|
|
Defendant
WWWEILAN
|
|
Defendant
Western Rug
|
|
Defendant
XXXClot
|
|
Defendant
YAOch
|
|
Defendant
YINGLINY-KI
|
|
Defendant
Yaosh
|
|
Defendant
YouWenJunShopp
|
|
Defendant
abel tang
|
|
Defendant
besttopstar
|
|
Defendant
Unusuall
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
gongnan0594
|
|
Defendant
gudoxiaoqiang
|
|
Defendant
hermixa
|
|
Defendant
qiangdadaqiang
|
|
Defendant
qutongshangdian
|
|
Defendant
saviya
|
|
Defendant
tracy Zhong
|
|
Defendant
yuanzhouqutingnishubaih
|
|
Defendant
zhaoxianglu
|
|
Defendant
Haibibed Official
|
|
Defendant
The Individuals, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified On Schedule A
|
|
Defendant
99% NXJSHSBX
|
|
Defendant
B-BEST
|
|
Defendant
Bawei post house
|
|
Defendant
CHENJIEUS
|
|
Defendant
EGIKI
|
|
Defendant
Elsa H Hale
|
|
Defendant
FastSun
|
|
Defendant
HomeAndHoodie
|
|
Defendant
JAMMMY
|
|
Defendant
Jeroee Technology Inc
|
|
Defendant
LilyBeaty
|
|
Defendant
ODAPTO
|
|
Defendant
Oeedsns
|
|
Defendant
Party Decorations Supplies US
|
|
Defendant
TQHMKJ
|
|
Interested Party
Caridad Perez
4004 Westhollow Pkwy
Houston, TX 77082 |
|
Plaintiff
Mei Li
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 08, 2025 | ||
63 | 63
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re62 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mei Li. Replies due by 5/15/2025. (Palmer, Andrew) |