Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Anne C Conway
Referred: Daniel C Irick
Case #: 6:23-cv-02321
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2023
Terminated:Mar 13, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Jun 01, 2024 6:05 AM EDT
Defendant
Walter Basso, II
individually 1340 Chestnut Ave.
Winter Park, FL 32789
Represented By
Chesley G. Moody, Jr.
Moody & Graf, P.A.
contact info
Lana Mantooth
Moody & Graf, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
CM Glazing LLC
5505 Carder Road
Orlando, FL 32810
Represented By
Chesley G. Moody, Jr.
Moody & Graf, P.A.
contact info
Lana Mantooth
Moody & Graf, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Rochester Insulated Glass, Inc.
73 Merrick Circle
Manchester, NY 14504
Represented By
Nicholas M. Gaunce
Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott LLC
contact info
Robert P. Avolio
Eckert, Seamans, Cherin & Mellott, LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Walter Basso
Terminated: 01/23/2024
individually 7153 Basso Lane
Orlando, FL 32818
Defendant
Brett Gellein
Terminated: 01/23/2024
Represented By
Joseph A. Lane
Lowndes, Drosdick, Doster, Kantor & Reed, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, March 13, 2025
50 50 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 03/13 12:26 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
Related: [-]
49 49 order Order Thu 03/13 10:05 AM
ORDER : This case is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 3/13/2025. (Conway, Anne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
48 48 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 03/12 3:37 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Rochester Insulated Glass, Inc.. (Trien, Stacey)
Related: [-]