Spokane County v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Brian R Martinotti |
Referred: | Rukhsanah L Singh |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-22847 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 04, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Washington Eastern, 2:23-cv-00324 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 01, 2024 6:17 AM EDT |
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY INC.
|
|
Defendant
UnitedHealth Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Cigna Group
|
|
Defendant
SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Optumrx Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Optum Inc.
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
|
|
Defendant
MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.
|
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Inc.
1 Express Way
St. Louis, MO 63121 |
|
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC.
|
|
Defendant
EVERNORTH HEALTH INC.
|
|
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
CVS PHARMACY INC.
|
|
Defendant
CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
|
|
Defendant
CAREMARKPCS HEALTH LLC
|
|
Defendant
CAREMARK RX L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
CAREMARK L.L.C.
|
|
Plaintiff
Spokane County
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, February 27, 2025 | ||
23 | 23
![]() ORDER granting21 Motion to Substitute Attorney Devin C. Curda in place of Christopher A. Anderson.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 2/27/2025. (ld) |
|
utility
Motions Referred
Thu 02/27 9:33 AM
21 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Christopher A. Anderson for Devin C. Curda REFERRED to Rukhsanah L. Singh. (lr, ) |
||
Wednesday, February 26, 2025 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney Christopher A. Anderson terminated. (KO, DAVID) |
|
21 | 21
![]() MOTION to Substitute Attorney Christopher A. Anderson for Devin C. Curda by Spokane County. (KO, DAVID) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT Spokane County against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by Spokane County.(KO, DAVID) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() NOTICE of Change of Address by DAVID J. KO (KO, DAVID) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Spokane County. Optum Inc. waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024; Optumrx Inc. waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024; UnitedHealth Group Inc waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. (KO, DAVID) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Spokane County. EVERNORTH HEALTH INC. waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024; EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC. waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024; EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY INC. waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024; Express Scripts Inc. waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024; MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC. waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024; The Cigna Group waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. (KO, DAVID) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Spokane County. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY waiver sent on 11/29/2023. (KO, DAVID) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Spokane County. SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C. waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. (KO, DAVID) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Spokane County. CAREMARK L.L.C. waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024; CAREMARK RX L.L.C. waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024; CAREMARKPCS HEALTH LLC waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024; CVS HEALTH CORPORATION waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024; CVS PHARMACY INC. waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. (KO, DAVID) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW GEREND on behalf of Spokane County (GEREND, MATTHEW) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by JULI FARRIS on behalf of Spokane County (FARRIS, JULI) |
|
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID J. KO on behalf of Spokane County (KO, DAVID) |
|
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA R GERBER on behalf of Spokane County (GERBER, LAURA) |
|
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by RACHEL C BOWANKO on behalf of Spokane County (BOWANKO, RACHEL) |
|
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by DEREK W LOESER on behalf of Spokane County (LOESER, DEREK) |
|
misc
QC - Generic Message
Fri 12/08 4:57 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The court is in receipt of the Notices of Appearance filed on 12/08/2023. Additionally, the court asks that you please file your Notices of Request by Pro Hac Vice to Receive Notices of Electronic Filings in the Master case; 23-md-03080. (sms2) |
||
Monday, December 04, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Spokane County. NOVO NORDISK INC. waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. (KO, DAVID) |
|
6 | 6
![]() SUMMONS ISSUED as to CAREMARK L.L.C., CAREMARK RX L.L.C., CAREMARKPCS HEALTH LLC, CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY INC., ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, EVERNORTH HEALTH INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY INC., Express Scripts Inc., MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., NOVO NORDISK INC., Optum Inc., Optumrx Inc., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C., The Cigna Group, UnitedHealth Group Inc. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (krg, ) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Clerk's Notice to Counsel: Pursuant to CTO-6 entered in MDL No. 3083, Eastern District of Washington case number 2:23-cv-324 has been transferred to the District of New Jersey and assigned civil action number: 2:23-cv-22847. In Re: Insulin Pricing Litigation, MDL 3080. (krg, ) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Washington Eastern; Case Number 2:23-cv-00324. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 12/04 9:04 AM
Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (krg, ) |
||
utility
Create Case Association
Mon 12/04 9:05 AM
Cases associated to 2:23-md-03080-BRM-RLS. (krg, ) |
||
order
Case Management Order
Mon 12/04 9:14 AM
This case is part of MDL 3080. Parties are expected to review and abide by all prior orders entered in this MDL, which can be found[LINK:here] . (krg, ) |
||
Tuesday, November 28, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Monday, November 13, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (WMK, Case Administrator) | ||
Thursday, November 09, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |