Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:William S Stickman
Case #: 2:23-cv-02061
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Dec 04, 2023
Re-opened:Apr 16, 2024
Terminated:Oct 07, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jun 01, 2024 6:16 AM EDT
Defendant
EVEREST CONSULTING GROUP LP
Represented By
Carla M. Castello
Babst Calland Clements & Zomnir
contact info
Kathy K. Condo
Babst Calland Clements & Zomnir
contact info
Defendant
MHDM LLC
Represented By
Christopher M. Loveland
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton, LLP
contact info
Chad I. Michaelson
Meyer, Unkovic & Scott
contact info
Helen Cho Eckert
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Jason M. Yarbrough
Meyer, Unkovic & Scott LLP
contact info
Joseph Aaron Carroll
Meyer, Unkovic & Scott LLP
contact info
Leo Caseria
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Defendant
RIVER POINT REALTY LLC
Defendant
REALTY ONE GROUP HORIZON, LLC
Represented By
Christopher M. Loveland
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton, LLP
contact info
Chad I. Michaelson
Meyer, Unkovic & Scott
contact info
Helen Cho Eckert
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Jason M. Yarbrough
Meyer, Unkovic & Scott LLP
contact info
Joseph Aaron Carroll
Meyer, Unkovic & Scott LLP
contact info
Leo Caseria
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Defendant
SF, LLC
Represented By
Christopher M. Loveland
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton, LLP
contact info
Chad I. Michaelson
Meyer, Unkovic & Scott
contact info
Helen Cho Eckert
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Jason M. Yarbrough
Meyer, Unkovic & Scott LLP
contact info
Joseph Aaron Carroll
Meyer, Unkovic & Scott LLP
contact info
Leo Caseria
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Defendant
REEDSTONE, INC.
Represented By
Mitchel Zemel
Mitchel Zemel, Esq., LLC
contact info
Defendant
PRIORITY REALTY LLC
Defendant
WEST PENN MULTI-LIST, INC
Represented By
Wendelynne J. Newton
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Gretchen L. Jankowski
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Defendant
HOWARD HANNA COMPANY
Represented By
Quintin DiLucente
Pietragallo Gordon, Et Al.
contact info
Eric G. Soller
Pietragallo Gordon Alfano Bosick & Raspanti, LLP
contact info
Seth P. Waxman
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Emily Barnet
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
William Pietragallo, II
Pietragallo Gordon Alfano Bosick & Raspanti, LLP
contact info
Karin Dryhurst
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
David Gringer
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
contact info
Claire Murphy Bergeron
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Defendant
BOVARD-ANDERSON CO.
Represented By
David A. Strassburger
Strassburger, Mckenna, Gutnick & Gefsky
contact info
Patrick T Sherry
Strassburger Mckenna Gutnick & Gefsky
contact info
Plaintiff
MARIA IANNOME
Represented By
Bruce C. Fox
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Daniel McArdle Booker
Bernstein-Burkley, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
MARIA IANNONE-ALBERT
Represented By
Bruce C. Fox
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Daniel McArdle Booker
Bernstein-Burkley, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
DANIELLE KAY
Represented By
Bruce C. Fox
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Daniel McArdle Booker
Bernstein-Burkley, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
JESSIE KAY
Represented By
Bruce C. Fox
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Daniel McArdle Booker
Bernstein-Burkley, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
NANCY MORATIS
Represented By
Bruce C. Fox
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Daniel McArdle Booker
Bernstein-Burkley, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN MORATIS
Represented By
Bruce C. Fox
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Daniel McArdle Booker
Bernstein-Burkley, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
KAITLYN SLAVIC
Represented By
Bruce C. Fox
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
RUBINOFF REALTY SERVICES LLC
Terminated: 04/22/2024
Represented By
Brian C. Hill
Marcus & Shapira LLP
contact info
Moira E. Cain-Mannix
Marcus & Shapira
contact info
Defendant
NRT PHILADELPHIA LLC
Terminated: 01/25/2024
Defendant
PPSIR, LLC
Terminated: 01/25/2024
Defendant
FOUND IT PA LLC
Terminated: 05/13/2024
Represented By
Brian Maye
Adler Murphy & Mcquillen LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
NANCY WEHRHEIM
Terminated: 05/01/2024
Represented By
Bruce C. Fox
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Plaintiff
SPRING WAY CENTER, LLC
Terminated: 01/26/2024
Represented By
Andrew J. Horowitz
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel, LLP
contact info
Bruce C. Fox
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info

GPO Oct 07 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 121 Joint Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 10/07/24. (eca)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, November 08, 2024
157 157 appeal USCA Notice of Docketing (Case Number & Case Manager Assigned) Fri 11/08 5:00 PM
USCA Case Number 24-3101 for156 Notice of Appeal, filed by DANIELLE KAY, MARIA IANNOME, NANCY MORATIS, MARIA IANNONE-ALBERT, JOHN MORATIS, JESSIE KAY. USCA Case Manager James (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (gch3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
156 156 appeal Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Required) Wed 11/06 1:33 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to151 Memorandum Opinion,152 Order on Motion to Dismiss,153 Rule 58 Judgment,, Add and Terminate Parties, by DANIELLE KAY, JESSIE KAY, MARIA IANNOME, MARIA IANNONE-ALBERT, JOHN MORATIS, NANCY MORATIS. Filing fee $605, receipt number APAWDC-8546417. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. The Transcript Purchase Order form will NOT be mailed to the parties. The form is available on the Court's internet site. (Booker, Daniel)
Related: [-]