Texas Western District Court
Judge:Kathleen Cardone
Case #: 3:23-cv-00437
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Dec 04, 2023
Terminated:Apr 16, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jun 01, 2024 5:29 AM CDT
Defendant
Vadim Shtivelman
Defendant
Tip Top Capital Inc
Plaintiff
Brandon L Callier
1490 A George Dieter Drive, #174
El Paso, TX 79936

GPO Mar 22 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 9 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Brandon L Callier. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (dt)
GPO Apr 16 2024
ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND REJECTING IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 10 Report and Recommendations, 9 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Brandon L Callier. Accordingly, the Court ADOPTS in part and REJECTS in part the R&R, ECF No. 10, and ORDERS that Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment, ECF No. 9, is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Motion is granted as to Plaintiffs claims against Shtivelman and denied as to Plaintiffs claims against Tip Top Capital. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Vadim Shtivelman SHALL PAY Plaintiff $500 for each of the four phone calls made in violation of § 227(c); $1,500 for each of the seventeen knowing and willful phone calls made in violation of § 227(c); and $5,000 for each of the twenty-one phone calls made in violation of Texas Business & Commerce Code § 302.101, for a total damages award of $132,500. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Vadim Shtivelman SHALL PAY Plaintiff $402 in costs of Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs claims against Tip Top Capital are DISMISSED for defective service.. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dt)

Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
11 11 8 pgs order Order Adopting/Rejecting Report and Recommendations Tue 04/16 1:24 PM
ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND REJECTING IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for10 Report and Recommendations,9 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Brandon L Callier. Accordingly, the Court ADOPTS in part and REJECTS in part the R&R, ECF No. 10, and ORDERS that Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment, ECF No. 9, is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Motion is granted as to Plaintiffs claims against Shtivelman and denied as to Plaintiffs claims against Tip Top Capital. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Vadim Shtivelman SHALL PAY Plaintiff $500 for each of the four phone calls made in violation of § 227(c); $1,500 for each of the seventeen knowing and willful phone calls made in violation of § 227(c); and $5,000 for each of the twenty-one phone calls made in violation of Texas Business & Commerce Code § 302.101, for a total damages award of $132,500. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Vadim Shtivelman SHALL PAY Plaintiff $402 in costs of Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs claims against Tip Top Capital are DISMISSED for defective service.. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dt)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
10 10 misc Report and Recommendations Fri 03/22 2:52 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re9 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Brandon L Callier. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (dt)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Mon 02/12 9:46 PM
Text Order REFERRING9 Motion for Default Judgment. REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Robert Castaneda. SO ORDERED. Entered by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (KC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
9 9 motion Default Judgment Tue 01/23 4:16 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Tip Top Capital Inc and Vadim Shtivelman by Brandon L Callier.(Callier, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Affidavit,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Friday, January 12, 2024
8 8 order Clerks Entry of Default Fri 01/12 4:21 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Vadim Shtivelman, Tip Top Capital Inc (dt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
7 7 motion Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 01/11 3:34 PM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default against Tip Top Capital and Vadim Shtivelman by Brandon L Callier. (Callier, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/21 12:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandon L Callier. Vadim Shtivelman served on 12/14/2023, answer due 1/4/2024; Tip Top Capital Inc served on 12/12/2023, answer due 1/2/2024. (Callier, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 12/06 10:52 AM
Summons Issued as to Vadim Shtivelman, Tip Top Capital Inc. (dt)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 12/06 10:11 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Brandon L Callier.(Callier, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Vadim Shtivelman Summons
3 3 cmp Complaint Wed 12/06 9:58 AM
COMPLAINT , filed by Brandon L Callier.(Callier, Brandon)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) Submitted Wed 12/06 9:53 AM
JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Brandon L Callier. (Callier, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
1 1 misc Payment of Filing Fee Mon 12/04 4:16 PM
Filing fee received in the amount of $405, receipt number ATXWDC-18165434. (Callier, Brandon)
Related: [-]