Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:23-bk-03496

California Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Margaret M Mann
Case #: 3:23-ap-90089
Nature of Suit71 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - imposition of stay
72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 04, 2023
Terminated:Mar 15, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Pennie McLauglhlin
Represented By
Pennie McLauglhlin
contact info
Plaintiffs
Phillip W Simon, Jr.
1910 Northstar Way #221
San Marcos, CA 92078
Represented By
Phillip W Simon, Jr.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, March 15, 2024
15 15 order Closed Adversary Proceeding Fri 03/15 3:46 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Slaughter, S.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
14 14 notice BNC Court Certificate of Notice Sun 02/11 9:05 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 02/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Thursday, February 08, 2024
13 13 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Order)(CSD 3039, 3040, other) Fri 02/09 12:05 PM
Order Denying (1) Debtor Phillip W. Simon, Jr's Request for Relief for Alleged Violations of the Automatic Stay; (2) Dismissing with Prejudice the Remaining Claims Against the Superior Court and All State Court Judges Based on Eleventh Amendment Immunity, Preclusion and, Alternatively, Judicial Immunity; and (3) Discretionary Abstaining from Hearing the Claims Against Lynette Watts and Nora Watts (Dismissing Adversary Proceeding 3:2023-ap-90089-MM) . with BNC Service signed on 2/8/2024. Relate to ECF #11 and12 (Schmitt, T.)
Related: [-]
12 12 vCal Minute Order - CHAP Thu 02/08 12:07 PM
Minute Order. Hearing DATE: 02/08/2024 , MATTER: MOTION TO DISMISS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING FILED BY DEFENDANT. DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. Related [+] (Cruz, L.)
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Dismiss
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
11 11 vCal Tentative Ruling - CHAP Tue 02/06 12:09 PM
Tentative Ruling. Department 1: Hearing Date and Time: 02/08/2024 10:00 AM, MATTER: MOTION TO DISMISS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING FILED BY DEFENDANT Related [+] (Cruz, L.)
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Dismiss
Friday, January 26, 2024
10 10 misc Report Fri 01/26 1:11 PM
Status Report by Hon. Pennie McLaughlin Re: Motion to Dismiss [ECF 3] filed by James P. Hill on behalf of Pennie McLauglhlin. Related [+] (Hill, James)
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Dismiss
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Monday, January 22, 2024
9 9 notice BNC Court Certificate of Notice Wed 01/24 9:08 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 01/24/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order
Saturday, January 20, 2024
8 8 order ~Generic~ Order Mon 01/22 8:17 AM
Order Clarifying the Extent of the Automatic Stay and the Effect of Abandonment; with BNC Service Related [+] signed on 1/20/2024. (Cruz, L.)
Related: [-] 7 Minute Order
Thursday, January 18, 2024
7 7 order Minute Order - manual entry Fri 01/19 11:46 AM
Minute Order. Hearing DATE: 01/18/2024, MATTER: 1) STATUS CONFERENCE ON CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE'S REPORT OF NO DISTRIBUTION; 2) STATUS CONFERENCE ON MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM STAY, RS # TB-1 FILED BY LYNNETTA WATTS AND NORA WATTS SIMON. DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. Related [+] (COURT NOTE: COPY of minute order entered in main case no. 23-03496 MM7 on 1/19/2024 (re ECF No. 51). (Cruz, L.)
Related: [-] 35 Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution- No Funds, 13 Motion for Relief from Stay
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
6 6 motion Hearing & Motion (Notice) (CSD 1181, 1183 & 3015) [14 day opp] Wed 01/03 4:14 PM
Notice of Hearing and Motion with Certificate of Service. filed by James P. Hill of Sullivan Hill Rez & Engel, APLC on behalf of Pennie McLauglhlin. HEARING Scheduled for 2/8/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1, Room 218, Weinberger Courthouse . Notice Served On: 1/3/2024. Opposition due on 01/17/2024 unless an objector is entitled to additional time under FRBP 9006. Related [+] (Hill, James)
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Dismiss
5 5 notice Judicial Notice (Request) Wed 01/03 4:12 PM
Request for Judicial Notice in Support of the Motion by Defendant Pennie McLaughlin to Dismiss Complaint filed by James P. Hill of Sullivan Hill Rez & Engel, APLC on behalf of Pennie McLauglhlin. Related [+] (Hill, James)
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Dismiss
4 4 ans Declaration Wed 01/03 4:08 PM
Declaration Kathleen Cashman-Kramer in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by James P. Hill of Sullivan Hill Rez & Engel, APLC on behalf of Pennie McLauglhlin. Related [+] (Hill, James)
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Dismiss
3 3 motion Dismiss (Motion) Wed 01/03 4:06 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by James P. Hill on behalf of Pennie McLauglhlin. Related [+] (Hill, James)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, December 04, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued (CSD 2500A) Mon 12/04 10:37 AM
Summons Issued on Pennie McLauglhlin Answer Due 1/3/2024; Certificate of Service (Schmitt, T.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 12/04 10:25 AM
Adversary case 23-90089 Complaint by Phillip W Simon Jr. against Pennie McLauglhlin. Nature of Suit: 14 Related [+] 71 (Injunctive relief - reinstatement of stay) 72 (Injunctive relief - other) , Fee Amount $ 0.0 Filed by Phillip W Simon Jr.. (Schmitt, T.) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/4/2023 (Schmitt, T.)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other