California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 2:23-cv-10183
Nature of Suit870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Case Filed:Dec 04, 2023
Terminated:Jul 12, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jun 01, 2024 3:07 AM PDT
Petitioner
United States of America
Represented By
Gavin L Greene
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Respondent
Rob Mikitarian
Represented By
Chad Nardiello
Nardiello Turanchik LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, July 12, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 07/12 1:59 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: On July 9, 2024, the parties filed a notice of dismissal18 , dismissing the action pursuant to and finding good cause therefor, the court hereby ORDERS: 1. All dates and deadlines governing this action are VACATED. 2. The courts Order to Show Cause (Dkt. 7) is DISCHARGED as moot. 3. The court DISMISSES the action with prejudice. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
18 18 stip Discharge Tue 07/09 8:38 AM
STIPULATION for Discharge of Order to Show Cause issued on January 5, 2024 (ECF document number 7) filed by Petitioner United States of America.(Greene, Gavin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Discharging Order to Show Cause issued on January 5, 2024 (ECF document number 7)
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
17 17 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 02/21 8:24 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY TESTIMONY OF RESPONDENT ROB MIKITARIAN, AS REQUIRED BY THE IRS SUMMONS, SHOULD NOT BE COMPELLED (DKT.7 UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court finds that Order to Show Cause currently scheduled for hearing on February 23, 2024, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, this motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. No appearances are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) TEXT ONLY ENTRY Modified on 2/21/2024 (tf).
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
16 16 misc Reply Thu 02/15 8:26 PM
REPLY filed by Respondent Rob Mikitarian to Reply (Motion related)12 (Nardiello, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
15 15 order Leave to File Document Tue 02/13 3:44 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE FOR RESPONDENT ROB MIKITARIAN TO FILE A SURREPLY13 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: Respondent shall have leave to file a surreply, not to exceed five pages, on or before February 16, 2024. (lc)
Related: [-]
14 14 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Tue 02/13 3:35 PM
OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file File A Surreply 13 filed by Petitioner United States of America.(Greene, Gavin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Enforcing Summons
Monday, February 12, 2024
13 13 motion Leave to File Document Mon 02/12 6:29 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file File A Surreply filed by Respondent Rob Mikitarian. (Nardiello, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, February 09, 2024
12 12 respm Reply (Motion related) Fri 02/09 8:34 AM
REPLY Related [+] filed by Petitioner United States of America. (Greene, Gavin)
Related: [-] 11
Friday, January 26, 2024
11 11 misc Response Fri 01/26 5:17 PM
RESPONSE filed by Respondent Rob Mikitarianto Order to Show Cause,,,,,7 (Nardiello, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A through C
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
10 10 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 01/16 10:01 AM
IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court hereby APPROVES the parties Stipulation (Dkt. 9) and CONTINUES the deadline for Respondent to respond to the courts OSC to January 26, 2024. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
9 9 stip Continue Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 01/12 4:49 PM
STIPULATION to Continue Response Deadline to Show Cause Order from January 16, 2024 to January 26, 2024 Re: Order to Show Cause,,,,,7 , STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Respondent Rob Mikitarian.(Nardiello, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 01/12 4:45 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Chad Nardiello counsel for Respondent Rob Mikitarian. Adding Chad D. Nardiello as counsel of record for Rob Mikitarian for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Respondent Rob Mikitarian. (Attorney Chad Nardiello added to party Rob Mikitarian(pty:res))(Nardiello, Chad)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
7 7 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 01/05 2:52 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE IRS SUMMONS by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court hereby ORDERS Respondent Rob Mikitarian to appear before the court at the following date, time, and address, to SHOW CAUSE why his testimony, as required by the IRS summons, should not be compelled: February 23, 2024, 11:00 a.m.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that copies of the following documents be served on Respondent (a) by personal delivery, (b) by leaving a copy at Respondent's dwelling or usual place of abode with someone of suitable age and discretion who resides there, (c) by email to Respondent's attorney, if Respondent's attorney agrees to accept service by email, or (d) by certified mail: 1. This Order; and2. The Petition, Memorandum of Points and Authorities, and accompanying Declaration. Service may be made by any employee of the IRS or the United StatesAttorney's Office. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within ten (10) days after serviceupon Respondent of the herein described documents, Respondent shall file and serve a written response, supported by appropriate sworn statements, aswell as any desired motions. If, prior to the return date of this Order,Respondent files a response with the court stating that Respondent does notoppose the relief sought in the Petition, nor wish to make an appearance,then the appearance of Respondent at any hearing pursuant to this Order toShow Cause is excused, and Respondent shall comply with the summons within ten (10) days thereafter. (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Mon 12/11 1:52 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson to Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:23-cv-10183 FLA(KESx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
5 5 misc Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Fri 12/08 9:58 AM
DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Petitioner United States of America. (Greene, Gavin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
4 4 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-14) Reminder re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project-optional html form Wed 12/06 3:33 PM
REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (hr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
3 3 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Tue 12/05 9:47 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (et)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV11C Statement of Consent
Monday, December 04, 2023
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 12/04 3:24 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Greene, Gavin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 12/04 3:23 PM
PETITION to Enforce Internal Revenue Service Summons; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; and Declaration in Support Thereof No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Petitioner UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attorney Gavin L Greene added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pet))(Greene, Gavin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Revenue Agent Julissa Briceno with attached Exhibits 1 and 2,
Att: 2 Order to Show Cause