Van's Aircraft, Inc.
Oregon Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David W Hercher |
Case #: | 6:23-bk-62260 |
Case Filed: | Dec 04, 2023 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 25,001-50,000 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Van's Aircraft, Inc.
14401 Keil Rd NE
Aurora, OR 97002-9467 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee, Eugene
405 E 8th Ave #1100
Eugene, OR 97401 |
1. | Van's Files For Chapter 11 Protection (avweb.com) |
Submitted Tue 12/05/2023 | |
Docket last updated: 57 minutes ago |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
122 | 122
misc
Small Business Monthly Operating Report
Mon 04/22 4:33 PM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for filing period March 2024 Filed By Debtor Van's Aircraft, Inc. Monthly Operating Report due by 5/21/2024.(CONWAY, TIMOTHY) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
121 | 121
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 04/19 8:50 AM
Supplemental Certificate of Service113 Chapter 11 Plan,114 Order Fixing Time for Acceptances or Rejections of Plan Filed By Claims Agent BMC Group Inc. (Ordaz, Steven) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
120 | 120
misc
Correspondence
Mon 04/15 2:31 PM
Correspondence Re: Informed as to Bankruptcy of Van's Aircraft Filed By Creditor Roger L Avery (jbk) |