Member Case
Lead case is: 4:23-bk-90907

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher M Lopez
Case #: 4:23-bk-90914
Case Filed:Dec 04, 2023
Terminated:May 09, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $500,000,001 to $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Container Recycling Alliance, LLC
17220 Katy Fwy Ste 150
Houston, TX 77094-2699
Represented By
Matthew David Struble
Vinson & Elkins
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


Docket last updated: 51 minutes ago
Saturday, May 11, 2024
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/11 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Final Decree
Thursday, May 09, 2024
4 4 order Final Decree (No Form) Thu 05/09 3:14 PM
Final Decree Closing Each of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases Signed on 5/9/2024. (rgs4)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/07 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/07/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order for Joint Administration
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
2 2 order Joint Administration Tue 12/05 2:29 PM
Order for Joint Administration under 23-90907 Signed on 12/5/2023 (RosarioSaldana)
Related: [-]
utility Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY) Tue 12/05 2:29 PM
An order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 23-90907 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (RosarioSaldana)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
1 1 28 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Mon 12/04 6:21 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Container Recycling Alliance, LLC. (Struble, Matthew)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Mon 12/04 7:23 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-90914 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A24904865. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]