Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Edward L Morris
Case #: 4:23-bk-43737
Case Filed:Dec 04, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Jan 16, 2024

Debtor
Freed Am Corp
333 Melrose Dr Apt 35B
Richardson, TX 75080-4655
Represented By
Lindsay Daniel Steele
Steele Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Roddrick Breon Newhouse
401 Century Pkwy Unit 715
Allen, TX 75013
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 12/05/2023 12:02 AM CST
Monday, December 04, 2023
crditcrd none Mon 12/04 10:49 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (case upload)([LINK 23-43737 7] ) [caseupld,1027u] ( 338.00). Receipt number A30949505, amount $ 338.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 caseupld Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 (case upload) Mon 12/04 9:32 PM
Non-Individual Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (case upload) filed by Lindsay Daniel Steele of Steele Law Firm, PLLC on behalf of Freed Am Corp. (Steele, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of creditors 7 bus. no asset - AutoAssign Mon 12/04 9:38 PM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/16/2024 at 11:50 AM by TELEPHONE. (Steele, Lindsay)
Related: [-]