Texas Western District Court
Judge:Fred Biery
Referred: Elizabeth S Chestney
Case #: 5:23-cv-01490
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Dec 05, 2023
Terminated:Oct 28, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jun 02, 2024 5:12 AM CDT
Defendant
Frost & Sullivan, Inc.
Represented By
Gregory S. Hudson
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Plaintiff
Don Hays
Represented By
Joe Kendall
Kendall Law Group
contact info
Raina C Borrelli
Strauss Borrelli PLLC
contact info

GPO Aug 16 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 7 Motion to Dismiss filed by Frost & Sullivan, Inc.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
GPO Sep 04 2024
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 7 Motion to Dismiss filed by Frost & Sullivan, Inc., 24 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, October 28, 2024
41 41 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 10/29 11:24 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
Related: [-]
utility Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Tue 10/29 11:27 AM
CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
40 40 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 10/25 4:09 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Don Hays.(Borrelli, Raina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 03, 2024
39 39 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion to Quash Thu 10/03 11:03 AM
ORDER DISMISSING34 Motion to Compel; DISMISSING26 Motion to Quash. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties file a stipulation of dismissal on or before November 1, 2024.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing scheduled for 2:00 p.m. on October 3, 2024, is CANCELED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all current deadlines and settings are VACATED in light of the settlement. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
Related: [-]
38 38 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 10/03 10:16 AM
NOTICE of Settlement / Resolution & Request for Stay of Proceedings by Frost & Sullivan, Inc.(Hudson, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
37 37 respm Response to Motion Tue 10/01 5:10 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Frost & Sullivan, Inc., re34 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery filed by Plaintiff Don Hays (Hudson, Gregory)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Advisory to the Court Tue 10/01 4:38 PM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Don Hays Parties' Joint Advisory Regarding Defendant's Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Notice of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects to Stroz Friedberg, LLC . (Pigozzi, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
35 35 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion Hearings Fri 09/27 12:08 PM
ORDER re26 MOTION to Quash PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SUBPOENA TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS, INFORMATION, OR OBJECTS TO STROZ FRIEDBERG, LLC AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Frost & Sullivan, Inc.,34 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery filed by Don Hays, Set Motion Hearing for26 MOTION to Quash PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SUBPOENA TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS, INFORMATION, OR OBJECTS TO STROZ FRIEDBERG, LLC AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ,34 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery ( Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2024 2:00 PM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Compel Wed 09/25 2:03 PM
MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery by Don Hays.. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (Pigozzi, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Stephen Pigozzi
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
33 33 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/18 9:43 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Frost & Sullivan, Inc..(Hudson, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
32 32 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Tue 09/17 3:30 PM
ORDER GRANTING31 Motion to Continue. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing set for Friday, September 20, on Defendants Motion [#26] is CANCELED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the videoconference hearing on Defendants Motion [#26] is continued to 2:00 p.m. Central Time on October 3, 2024. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Continue Mon 09/16 10:39 AM
Joint MOTION to Continue Videoconference Hearing Scheduled for Sept. 20th by Frost & Sullivan, Inc... Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (Hudson, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/13 11:06 AM
Text Order GRANTING30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Entered by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lslc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
30 30 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 09/12 4:05 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joe Kendall on Behalf of Stephen J. Pigozzi ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19221866) by on behalf of Don Hays.. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (Kendall, Joe)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
29 29 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion Hearings Thu 09/12 10:29 AM
ORDER SETTING VIDEO HEARING re26 MOTION to Quash PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SUBPOENA TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS, INFORMATION, OR OBJECTS TO STROZ FRIEDBERG, LLC AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Frost & Sullivan, Inc., Set Motion Hearing for26 MOTION to Quash PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SUBPOENA TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS, INFORMATION, OR OBJECTS TO STROZ FRIEDBERG, LLC AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ( Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2024 10:30 AM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
Related: [-]
28 28 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 09/10 12:12 PM
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Don Hays, re26 MOTION to Quash PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SUBPOENA TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS, INFORMATION, OR OBJECTS TO STROZ FRIEDBERG, LLC AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Defendant Frost & Sullivan, Inc.(Borrelli, Raina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Subpoena
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
27 27 2 pgs order Order Adopting/Rejecting Report and Recommendations Wed 09/04 3:31 PM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART7 Motion to Dismiss filed by Frost & Sullivan, Inc.,24 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
26 26 motion Quash Tue 09/03 7:02 PM
MOTION to Quash PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SUBPOENA TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS, INFORMATION, OR OBJECTS TO STROZ FRIEDBERG, LLC AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Frost & Sullivan, Inc... Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (Hudson, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Subpoena
Friday, August 30, 2024
25 25 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Fri 08/30 12:05 PM
OBJECTION to24 Report and Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge by Frost & Sullivan, Inc... (Hudson, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
24 24 misc Report and Recommendations Fri 08/16 1:28 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re7 Motion to Dismiss filed by Frost & Sullivan, Inc.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
23 23 14 pgs order Order Tue 07/02 3:47 PM
ORDER re21 Stipulation filed by Don Hays. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (vl)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Protective Order Tue 07/02 3:38 PM
CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (vl)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
21 21 misc Stipulation Fri 06/21 5:12 PM
STIPULATION - Stipulated Order on ESI Protocol by Don Hays. (Borrelli, Raina)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Stipulation Fri 06/21 5:10 PM
STIPULATION - Stipulated Protective Order by Don Hays. (Borrelli, Raina)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
19 19 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/08 2:11 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 4/21/2025, Amended Pleadings due by 1/6/2025, Discovery due by 4/21/2025, Motions due by 4/21/2025,. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
18 18 minutes Pretrial Conference Thu 04/04 2:48 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney: Pretrial Conference held on 4/3/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(mgr)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
17 17 misc Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Fri 03/29 3:21 PM
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan (Joint) by Frost & Sullivan, Inc..(Hudson, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Agreed Scheduling Order
Thursday, March 07, 2024
16 16 respm Response in Support of Motion Thu 03/07 4:25 PM
RESPONSE in Support, filed by Frost & Sullivan, Inc., re7 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(b)(1) for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and 12(b)(6) Failure to State Claim filed by Defendant Frost & Sullivan, Inc. (Hudson, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
15 15 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 02/29 9:12 AM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Don Hays, re7 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(b)(1) for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and 12(b)(6) Failure to State Claim filed by Defendant Frost & Sullivan, Inc. (Borrelli, Raina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
14 14 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Wed 02/14 11:45 AM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Frost & Sullivan, Inc.. (Hudson, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
13 13 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Mon 02/12 3:41 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Don Hays. (Borrelli, Raina)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
12 12 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 02/05 2:04 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, (Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/3/2024 1:30 PM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 02/01 8:58 AM
Text Order GRANTING11 Motion entered by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall submit his response to Defendants motion to dismiss on February 9, 2024, and Defendant shall submit its reply on March 7, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hm)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 02/01 9:03 AM
Text Order GRANTING11 Motion entered by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. The Court's previous text order is amended as follows: Plaintiff shall submit his response to Defendants motion to dismiss onFebruary 29, 2024, and Defendant shall submit its reply on March 7, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
11 11 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 01/31 3:05 PM
Agreed MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by Don Hays.. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (Kendall, Joe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 26, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 01/26 9:13 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Fred Biery.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Elizabeth S. Chestney. (bt)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order Fri 01/26 9:07 AM
COURT ADVISORY CONCERNING DISCOVERY AND OTHER MATTERS. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (bt)
Related: [-]
8 8 7 pgs order Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Notice of Right to Consent to Magistrate Trial Fri 01/26 9:03 AM
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to theCourt within sixty days of the appearance of any defendant. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (bt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
7 7 motion Dismiss Thu 01/25 5:31 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(b)(1) for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and 12(b)(6) Failure to State Claim by Frost & Sullivan, Inc..(Hudson, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/24 8:47 AM
ORDER GRANTING5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Raina C Borrelli for Don Hays. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/22 8:52 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joe Kendall on Behalf of Raina Borrelli ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-18325982) by on behalf of Don Hays. (Kendall, Joe)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/11 3:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Don Hays. Frost & Sullivan, Inc. served on 12/8/2023, answer due 12/29/2023. (Kendall, Joe)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 12/08 9:12 AM
Summons Issued as to Frost & Sullivan, Inc.. (nm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
2 2 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 12/05 9:32 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Don Hays. (Kendall, Joe)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/05 9:29 AM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18166981), filed by Don Hays.(Kendall, Joe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Notice of Data Breach,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 12/06 11:32 AM
Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to SA Mag Judge Wed 12/06 11:36 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr)
Related: [-]