Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:23-bk-50070

South Dakota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Laura L Kulm Ask
Case #: 5:23-ap-05007
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Dec 04, 2023
Terminated:Oct 10, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Wayne LeRoy Koistinen
P.O. Box 277
Belle Fourche, SD 57717
Represented By
Wayne LeRoy Koistinen
contact info
Plaintiff
Northern Hills Collections, Inc.
616 N 5th St.
Spearfish, SD 57783
Represented By
Jon W. Dill
Claggett & Dill Prof., LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
23 23 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Internet Payment Tue 10/22 12:22 PM
Receipt of Request for Certified Copy([LINK 23-05007 ) [crditcrd,ccpd] ( 24.00) Filing Fee (doc. 22 ). Receipt Number B3859916, Filing Fee Amount $ 24.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
22 22 crditcrd Request for Certified Copy Tue 10/22 12:18 PM
Request for 2 Certified Copy(s) Related [+]. Fee due $24.00. (Dill, Jon)
Related: [-] 19 Judgment
Thursday, October 10, 2024
utility Close Adversary Case Thu 10/10 8:49 AM
Adversary Case 5:23-ap-5007 Closed. (dbohm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
21 21 court Hearing Minutes (new) Wed 09/25 4:23 PM
Hearing Minutes re: Related [+]. APPEARANCES: None. DISPOSITION: No hearing held. On September 25, 2024, an order and a judgment were entered resolving the matter. The trial scheduled for October 1, 2024 is canceled. No further order due. (eertz)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Northern Hills Collections, Inc.
19 19 order Judgment Wed 09/25 4:20 PM
Judgment of Nondischargeability Under 11 U.S.C. §523(a)(2)(A). (dbohm)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Approve Agreement/Stipulation Wed 09/25 4:16 PM
Order Approving Agreement Between Chapter 7 Debtor and Creditor RE: Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. §523(a)(2)(A) Related [+]. (dbohm)
Related: [-] ument15
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
17 17 misc Supplement Tue 09/24 4:03 PM
Supplement filed by Northern Hills Collections, Inc. Related [+]. (Dill, Jon)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Approve Agreement
Att: 1 Affidavit
16 16 order Set Hearing/Deadlines/Trial Tue 09/24 1:03 PM
Order Directing Plaintiff to File Supplement to Motion to Approve Agreement to Prove Standing Related [+]. Pleadings due 9/25/2024. (vrein)
Related: [-] 15
Monday, September 23, 2024
15 15 motion Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation) Mon 09/23 2:21 PM
Motion to Approve Agreement filed by Northern Hills Collections, Inc.. (Dill, Jon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stipulation
Monday, September 16, 2024
14 14 court Correspondence (public entry) Mon 09/16 4:14 PM
Correspondence Sender - Claggett; Recipient - Judge Kulm Ask. . (msemm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
13 13 order Set Hearing/Deadlines/Trial Thu 03/07 1:51 PM
Order Setting Trial and Certain Deadlines Related [+]. Trial date set for 10/1/2024 at 10:00 AM (Central) Assigned Courtroom, Rapid City. Brief due 9/16/2024. (dbohm)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, February 29, 2024
12 12 court Hearing Minutes and ORDER (text order) Thu 02/29 4:25 PM
Hearing Minutes and ORDER re: Related [+] APPEARANCES (telephonic): David L. Claggett for Plaintiff and Stan H. Anker for Debtor-Defendant. DISPOSITION: The parties consented on the record to a final order or judgment by the bankruptcy court in this case. The parties requested that an evidentiary hearing be set. Pursuant to the Court's discussion with the parties; and for cause shown; now, therefore, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED discovery will be completed by June 3, 2024. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED dispositive motions must be filed on or before June 17, 2024, and any reply to the dispositive motion by July 1, 2024. The parties requested one full day for the trial to be held, which the Court tentatively scheduled for either September 24 or 25, 2024. The Court will contact the parties when a date has been finalized. If at any time the parties reach a settlement in the matter or determine that no such evidentiary hearing is necessary and that the matter can be decided on the briefs, or if they wish to stipulate to the facts, they should advise the Court accordingly by contacting the law clerk. The Court will enter a scheduling order consistent with the dates discussed on the record today. SO ORDERED: /s/ Laura L. Kulm Ask, Bankruptcy Judge. (sstro)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Northern Hills Collections, Inc.
Monday, February 05, 2024
11 11 order Set Hearing/Deadlines/Trial Mon 02/05 10:29 AM
Order Setting Telephonic Initial Pre-Trial Conferenc Related [+]. Initial Pre-trial Conference set for 2/29/2024 at 11:30 AM (Central) (telephonic). (msemm)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, December 29, 2023
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/29 3:21 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Wayne LeRoy Koistinen. (Anker, Stan)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 12/29 3:20 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Stan H. Anker filed on behalf of Wayne LeRoy Koistinen (Anker, Stan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
6 6 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Wed 12/06 10:12 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed by Northern Hills Collections, Inc. Related [+]. (Dill, Jon)
Related: [-] 5 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Tue 12/05 4:06 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Northern Hills Collections, Inc.. (Dill, Jon)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Monday, December 04, 2023
3 3 court Summons Issued Mon 12/04 3:54 PM
Summons issued on: Wayne LeRoy Koistinen with answer due 1/3/2024. (msemm)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Internet Payment Mon 12/04 3:24 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 23-05007 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee (doc.1 ). Receipt Number A3668662, Filing Fee Amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/04 3:21 PM
Adversary case 23-05007 Complaint by Northern Hills Collections, Inc. against Wayne LeRoy Koistinen. Fee due of 350.00. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Dill, Jon)
Related: [-]