Mississippi Southern District Court
Judge:Henry T Wingate
Referred: Lakeysha Greer Isaac
Case #: 3:23-cv-03123
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Non-Motor Vehicle
Case Filed:Dec 05, 2023
Terminated:Nov 04, 2024
Case in other court:Circuit - Hinds, 25CI1:23cv00692AHW
Last checked: Sunday Jun 02, 2024 4:53 AM CDT
Defendant
Simmons Wrecker Service, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher L. Ehresman
Guideone Insurance - West Des Moines
contact info
Eric R. Price
Perrier & Lacoste, Llc - New Orleans
contact info
Defendant
Jackson Motor Speedway, Inc.
Represented By
David L. Ayers
Watkins & Eager, Pllc - Jackson
contact info
Briana A. O'Neil
Watkins & Eager, Pllc - Jackson
contact info
Plaintiff
Andre Thomas
Represented By
Derek O. Fairchilds
Nahon, Saharovich & Trotz, Plc - Memphis
contact info


Docket last updated: 43 minutes ago
Monday, November 04, 2024
79 79 order Judgment Mon 11/04 10:59 AM
AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: that this action be dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by District Judge Henry T. Wingate on 11/4/2024 (cwl)
Related: [-]